DURHAM PUBLIC SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION v. META PLATFORMS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DURHAM PUBLIC SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc., Facebook Payments Inc., Facebook Holdings LLC, Siculus Inc., Facebook Operations LLC, Meta Payments Inc, Instagram LLC, Snap Inc., TikTok Inc., TIKTOK,LTD., TikTok LLC, Bytedance Ltd, ByteDance Inc., Google LLC and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv03448
Filed: June 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:24-cv-00343. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 7, 2024 Filing 8 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record to be transferred to individual courts Per MDL re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-32) which became effective on 6/7/2024 and to be transferred to Northern District of California. (cb)
June 7, 2024 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER re: (CTO-32) re: Transferring this action to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 6, 2022. Received and filed June 7, 2024. (Taylor, Abby) (cb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION). (cc)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to FACEBOOK PAYMENTS, INC., #2 Summons issued to FACEBOOK HOLDINGS, LLC, #3 Summons issued to SICULUS, INC., #4 Summons issued to FACEBOOK OPERATIONS, LLC, #5 Summons issued to META PAYMENTS, INC., #6 Summons issued to INSTAGRAM, LLC, #7 Summons issued to SNAP, INC., #8 Summons issued to TIKTOK INC., #9 Summons issued to TIKTOK,LTD., #10 Summons issued to TIKTOK, LLC, #11 Summons issued to BYTEDANCE LTD., #12 Summons issued to BYTEDANCE INC., #13 Summons issued to GOOGLE LLC, #14 Summons issued to YOUTUBE, LLC). (cc)
May 3, 2024 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (cc)
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney EMILY J. BEESON on behalf of Plaintiff DURHAM PUBLIC SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (BEESON, EMILY)
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JANET WARD BLACK on behalf of Plaintiff DURHAM PUBLIC SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (BLACK, JANET WARD)
May 1, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BLACK, JANET WARD)
May 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3823584.), filed by DURHAM PUBLIC SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BLACK, JANET WARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURHAM PUBLIC SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION v. META PLATFORMS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DURHAM PUBLIC SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Emily Jeanette Beeson
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Payments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIKTOK,LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bytedance Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?