Hawkins v. Skates et al
Plaintiff: Brian Hawkins
Defendant: Elisa Steele, Spenser Skates, Neeraj Agrawal, Eric Vishria, Erica Schultz, James Whitehurst, Ron Gill, Hoang Vuong, Catherine Wong, Amplitude, Inc., Pat Grady and Curtis Liu
Case Number: 4:2024cv03460
Filed: June 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2024 Filing 9 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Plaintiff's Counsel was also notified via email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2024)
July 15, 2024 Filing 8 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2024)
June 25, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2024)
June 14, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Hawkins (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2024)
June 12, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Neeraj Agrawal, Amplitude, Inc., Ron Gill, Pat Grady, Curtis Liu, Erica Schultz, Spenser Skates, Elisa Steele, Eric Vishria, Hoang Vuong, James Whitehurst, Catherine Wong. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2024)
June 12, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in Oakland, via Videoconference Only. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2024)
June 10, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2024)
June 10, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Neeraj Agrawal, Amplitude, Inc., Ron Gill, Pat Grady, Curtis Liu, Erica Schultz, Spenser Skates, Elisa Steele, Eric Vishria, Hoang Vuong, James Whitehurst, Catherine Wong . Filed by Brian Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moest, Robert) (Filed on 6/10/2024) Modified on 6/12/2024 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Complaint missing. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Proposed Summons filed by Brian Hawkins (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2024)
June 9, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number ACANDC-19500446. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2024)
June 9, 2024 Filing 1 Proposed Summons. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 6/9/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Skates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisa Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spenser Skates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neeraj Agrawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Vishria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoang Vuong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amplitude, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hawkins
Represented By: Robert Charles Moest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?