Garrett v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Samuel Garrett
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2024cv03588
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to United States of America (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2024)
August 2, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States of America (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2024)
August 1, 2024 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 8/1/2024) Modified on 8/2/2024 (hdj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2024 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2024 Filing 7 ***error***Proposed Summons. (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 8/1/2024) Modified on 8/5/2024 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Samuel Garrett.. (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 8, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/22/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2024)
June 21, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2024)
June 20, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2024)
June 20, 2024 Filing 2 FEE PAID (Filing fee$405,receipt number ACANDC-19538254). (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 6/20/2024)
June 14, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Samuel Garrett (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2024)
June 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samuel Garrett. Filed by Samuel Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marks, Lia) (Filed on 6/13/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Garrett
Represented By: Lyle C. Cavin, Jr.
Represented By: Lia Trelease Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?