Kolta v. Anagnost et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Kolta
Defendant: Autodesk, Inc., Rami Rahim, Andrew Anagnost, Deborah Clifford, Karen Blasing, Stephen Milligan, Blake Irving, Betsy Rafael, Reid French, Dr. Ayanna Howard, Lorrie Norrington, Stacy Smith and Mary McDowell
Case Number: 4:2024cv03804
Filed: June 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 10/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2024, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 25, 2024, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2024)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER. 24-cv-2431-YGR is related to 24-cv-3804-SK. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/10/2024. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
June 28, 2024 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Andrew Anagnost, Autodesk, Inc., Karen Blasing, Deborah Clifford, Reid French, Dr. Ayanna Howard, Blake Irving, Mary McDowell, Stephen Milligan, Lorrie Norrington, Betsy Rafael, Rami Rahim, Stacy Smith identifying Other Affiliate Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Hudson Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Markel American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group Inc., Other Affiliate Lloyd's of London Beazley Insurance Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Other Affiliate AXA XL Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Samsung Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd., Other Affiliate ACE American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company for Andrew Anagnost, Autodesk, Inc., Betsy Rafael, Blake Irving, Deborah Clifford, Dr. Ayanna Howard, Karen Blasing, Lorrie Norrington, Mary McDowell, Rami Rahim, Reid French, Stacy Smith, Stephen Milligan. (Hashemi, Caz) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 28, 2024 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Autodesk, Inc. (Hashemi, Caz) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 28, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Bruce Strain for Defendants Andrew Anagnost, Karen Blasing, Reid French, Dr. Ayanna Howard, Blake Irving, Mary McDowell, Stephen Milligan, Lorrie Norrington, Betsy Rafael, Rami Rahim, Stacy Smith, Deborah Clifford and Autodesk, Inc. (Strain, Stephen) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 28, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Snorgrass for Defendants Andrew Anagnost, Karen Blasing, Reid French, Dr. Ayanna Howard, Blake Irving, Mary McDowell, Stephen Milligan, Lorrie Norrington, Betsy Rafael, Rami Rahim, Stacy Smith, Deborah Clifford and Autodesk, Inc. (Snorgrass, Jessica) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Caz Hashemi for Defendants Andrew Anagnost, Karen Blasing, Reid French, Dr. Ayanna Howard, Blake Irving, Mary McDowell, Stephen Milligan, Lorrie Norrington, Betsy Rafael, Rami Rahim, Stacy Smith, Deborah Clifford and Autodesk, Inc. (Hashemi, Caz) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Anagnost, Autodesk, Inc., Karen Blasing, Deborah Clifford, Reid French, Dr. Ayanna Howard, Blake Irving, Mary McDowell, Stephen Milligan, Lorrie Norrington, Betsy Rafael, Rami Rahim, Stacy Smith. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2024)
June 26, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2024)
June 26, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2024)
June 25, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2024)
June 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19555699.). Filed by Lisa Kolta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moest, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolta v. Anagnost et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autodesk, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rami Rahim
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Anagnost
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Clifford
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Blasing
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Milligan
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Irving
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Rafael
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reid French
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ayanna Howard
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorrie Norrington
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Smith
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McDowell
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Jessica L. Snorgrass
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kolta
Represented By: Robert Charles Moest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?