Delossa v. Riley et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Rose, John Riley and Heriberto Hernandez Delossa
Defendant: E. Simpson, Bass, M. Taylor and E. Castillo
Case Number: 4:2024cv06285
Filed: September 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Case no. 24-cv-3599-TLT, 24-cv-2621-TLT, 24-cv-5348-TLT, 24-cv-6262-EKL, 24-cv-6285-JST, 24-cv-6286-TLT, 24-cv-6420-JST, 24-cv-6428-HSG, 24-cv-6667-RMI, 24-cv-7502-VKD is related to case 23-cv-671-JST. (dms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 1, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Heriberto Hernandez Delossa.. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2024)
October 21, 2024 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable (Jesse Rose) re #4 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment,. Mail Returned; response required by 12/20/2024. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2024)
October 21, 2024 Filing 9 Mail returned as undeliverable (Jesse Rose) re #5 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,,. Mail Returned; response required by 12/20/2024. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2024)
October 21, 2024 Filing 8 Mail returned as undeliverable (John Riley) re #5 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,,. Mail Returned; response required by 12/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2024)
October 16, 2024 Filing 7 CDCR Prisoner Statement of Account. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2024)
October 15, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, Heriberto Hernandez Delossa BN3122, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 9, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 6, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2024) Document emailed to CDCR (NEF) Modified on 9/6/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Delossa Heriberto Hernandez, CDCR # BN 3122.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2024)
September 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bass, E. Castillo, Delossa Heriberto Hernandez, John Riley, E. Simpson, M. Taylor. Filed by Jesse Rose. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2024)
September 6, 2024 Copy of docket sheet and #3 emailed to CDCR. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delossa v. Riley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Hernandez Delossa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?