Espinoza v. Wong
Plaintiff: Delroy Espinoza, Jr.
Defendant: Jenny Wong
Case Number: 4:2024cv06427
Filed: September 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2024 Mailed to plaintiff copies of ECF Nos. 1, 8 and a courtesy copy of his docket sheet with letter. (aea, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2024)
November 1, 2024 Filing 8 COMPLAINT by a Prisoner Under the Civil Rights Act against Jenny Wong (Filing fee not paid). Filed by Delroy Espinoza, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2024)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE CASE-INITIATING DOCUMENTS BY MAIL; SUA SPONTE GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 76 by Judge Jon S. Tigar re #4 Letter filed by Delroy Espinoza, Jr. Complaint due by 12/2/2024. (dms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 24, 2024 Entry was made in error.
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(kxo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 22, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 30, 2024 Filing 4 Letter dated 9/25/2024 from Delroy Espinoza, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2024)
September 17, 2024 Remark: Case Documents sent via email to PBSP. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2024)
September 12, 2024 Filing 3 Letter from Delroy, Jr. Espinoza. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2024)
September 12, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2024)Plaintiff has been served by email at PBSP Modified on 9/17/2024 (mbc, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2024 Filing 1 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff failed to submit this S.1983 complaint and Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis through the email procedures required by General Order No. 76. If Plaintiff does not, by the deadline below, either resubmit the documents through the email procedures or file a motion seeking permission to file the complaint by mail, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Email resubmission deadline: 9/26/2024 (Attachments: #1 Lodged Complaint, #2 Lodged IFP, #3 Envelope) (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by email to plaintiff at PBSP. Modified on 9/17/2024 (mbc, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delroy Espinoza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?