Edgecombe County Board of Education v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edgecombe County Board of Education
Defendant: TikTok Inc., Google LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., TikTok Ltd, ByteDance Inc., Facebook Operations, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Meta Payments, Inc., Snap, Inc., ByteDance Ltd., Facebook Holdings, LLC, TikTok, LLC and YouTube, LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv06713
Filed: September 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2024 Filing 15 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants. Filed by Edgecombe County Board of Education. (Legg, Matthew) (Filed on 9/25/2024)
September 24, 2024 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3047: District of North Carolina Eastern, 4:24-cv-00078, Edgecombe County Board of Education v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-06713-YGR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 35 cc: JPMDL (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2024)
September 24, 2024 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00078. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 24, 2024 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 6, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Marcella R. Lockert, Acting Clerk of the Panel, on 9/24/2024. (Collins, S)
September 24, 2024 Filing 12 Document: Text Minute Order - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 6, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Collins, S)
September 24, 2024 Filing 11 Document: Email of Text Order from Marcella R. Lockert, Acting Clerk of the Panel, regarding MDL 3047 advising our court of the conditional transfer order filed by the Panel and inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. (Collins, S)
September 11, 2024 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel of Failure to Make Service Within 90 Days. (McNally, Kimberly)
June 5, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok LTD, TikTok, LLC, YouTube, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
May 31, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily J. Beeson on behalf of Edgecombe County Public Schools. (Beeson, Emily)
May 31, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Janet Ward Black on behalf of Edgecombe County Public Schools. (Black, Janet Ward)
May 31, 2024 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Edgecombe County Public Schools (Black, Janet Ward)
May 31, 2024 Filing 5 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7625998.), filed by Edgecombe County Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Meta Platforms, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Facebook Payments, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Siculus, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons Facebook Operations, LLC, #6 Proposed Summons Instagram, LLC, #7 Proposed Summons Snap Inc., #8 Proposed Summons TikTok Inc., #9 Proposed Summons TikTok, LTD., #10 Proposed Summons TikTok, LLC, #11 Proposed Summons Bytedance LTD, #12 Proposed Summons Bytedance Inc., #13 Proposed Summons Google LLC, #14 Proposed Summons Youtube, LLC, #15 Proposed Summons Facebook Holdings, LLC, #16 Proposed Summons Meta Payments, Inc.) (Black, Janet Ward) Modified on 6/3/2024 to reflect that this is a corrected complaint. (Rudd, D.)
May 29, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily J. Beeson on behalf of Edgecombe County Public Schools. (Beeson, Emily)
May 29, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Janet Ward Black on behalf of Edgecombe County Public Schools. (Black, Janet Ward)
May 29, 2024 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Edgecombe County Public Schools (Black, Janet Ward)
May 29, 2024 Filing 1 CORRECTED COMPLAINT filed at #5 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7625998.), filed by Edgecombe County Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Meta Platforms, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Facebook Payments, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Siculus, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons Facebook Operations, LLC, #6 Proposed Summons Instagram, LLC, #7 Proposed Summons Snap Inc., #8 Proposed Summons TikTok Inc., #9 Proposed Summons TikTok, LTD., #10 Proposed Summons TikTok, LLC, #11 Proposed Summons Bytedance LTD, #12 Proposed Summons Bytedance Inc., #13 Proposed Summons Google LLC, #14 Proposed Summons Youtube, LLC, #15 Proposed Summons Facebook Holdings, LLC, #16 Proposed Summons Meta Payments, Inc.) (Black, Janet Ward) Modified on 6/3/2024 to reflect that a corrected complaint was filed at [DE #5]. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgecombe County Board of Education v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Payments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgecombe County Board of Education
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Represented By: Emily J. Beeson
Represented By: Matthew P. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?