American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation
Defendant: Kenneth Reginald Walker as Guardian ad Litem for K.W., a minor, Kenneth Reginald Walker, Kenvada Walker and Yu Hu
Case Number: 4:2024cv07515
Filed: October 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 1/27/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 31, 2025, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2024)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the clerk on November 15, 2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2024)
November 14, 2024 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2024)
November 13, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation.. (Galt, Hugh) (Filed on 11/13/2024)
November 13, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation. Yu Hu served on 11/9/2024, answer due 12/2/2024. (Galt, Hugh) (Filed on 11/13/2024)
October 31, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Yu Hu, Kenneth Reginald Walker as Guardian ad Litem for K.W., a minor, Kenneth Reginald Walker, Kenvada Walker. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2024)
October 31, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation identifying Corporate Parent American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation for American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation. re #1 Complaint, (Galt, Hugh) (Filed on 10/31/2024)
October 31, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Galt, Hugh) (Filed on 10/31/2024)
October 30, 2024 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2024)
October 30, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2024)
October 30, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Please re-file in its entirety. Please refile Summons as separate ECF Entry "Proposed Summons." Please also file as a single document with all Defendants listed. If not enough room on face sheet put additional Defendants on an Attachment page. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2024)
October 30, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Please refile Certificate of Interested Parties as separate ECF Event "Certificate of Interested Entities"Re: #1 Complaint, filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2024)
October 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19998840.). Filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Coversheet, #2 Summons as to Yu Hu, #3 Summons as to Kenyada Walker, #4 Summons as to Kenneth Reginald Walker, #5 Summons as to Kenneth Reginald Walker as Guardian as litem, #6 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Galt, Hugh) (Filed on 10/29/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Reginald Walker as Guardian ad Litem for K.W., a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Reginald Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenvada Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yu Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a corporation
Represented By: Hugh Douglas Galt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?