Silvestri et al v. Martinez Refining Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicolle Ayers, Tamara AlJada, Marisela Argenal, Tony Aires, Elizabeth Silvestri, Zahra Alizada, Mark Anderson, Tricia Aires, Sicily Baughman, Joseph Bautista, LYNDSEY COOPER, AMY GUTHRIE, VIVIAN RAMIREZ, Jose Limon, ELVIN SEIDENSPINNER, RICHARD GAHR, SYLVIA CARMONA, ERICA CALLOWAY, MEI LIA STORELEE, BARBARA PENNEY, AURORA RUBALCAVA, SUNNIE CRADER, MARCHEAL REED, RODRICK SMALLY, NIKA RAMSEY, RYAN FIERNER, SHERRY ANDROYNA, YESENIA GONZALEZ, EILEEN TUMLIN, CHRISTOPHER PIXTON, DELIA RUBALCAVA, Shari Bryce, LINDA TELLSWORTH, NANCY PARISI, MARIELENA BENAVIDES, MATTHEW DOYLE, RONALD KNOPOFF, MARKEASHA KEETON, NANCY NOONAN, James Lancaster, JAMES JOACHIM, AMIE JAMES, Patricia Sanchez, MOHAMAD HAMMOUDEH, Alicia Hamilton, BILLIE BRELAND, DOUG SCHRAMM, JANICE OLIVER, STEVIN MIKESELL, JESS MARKHAM, Jose Martinez, JOSE CONCHA-ROBLES, JENNY STEWARD, MILES SMITH, BRETT TURNER, DAVION PHILLIPS, MEGAN ARCIGA, AARON GINKENS, Brenda Hall, TIMOTHY VEITE, TYRONNE BREWER, SHARHONDA JOHNSON, BRANDI LYNN PIXTON, MARY RENEE KEETON, DANIELLE WHITE, RIHANNA PEREZ, ANNY WAHEED, BARTON HAMILTON, LINDE YOEONO, EUGENE BROCK, DARIUSZ KNIECIK, CONNIE ARIETA SORIA, LAINE PEARSON, BRYCE CALDWELL, PATSY SILVERFOOTE, LUCIANA MORRIS, BRIEN FRAZIER, ERIN DEMERRITT, Katie Jones, MARK FIERNER, Debra Jones, Samuel Sweeley, JAMES MAXWELL, Tiffany Taylor, Elias Martinez, KIMBERLY LOPEZ, DARLA WINTERMANTEL, BLAKE GRAY, BETTY STEELE, GLORIA GARCIA, ELISA OVRAHIM, ROSA NEWTON, KEVIN REYNA, MARNIQUE INGRAM, CURTIS CONRAD, ELIZABETH OLSON, LACY HENRY, VANESSA PIPKINS, Kerry Smith, SAMUEL BETHELL, KELLIE SCHRAMM, Sara Orrick, CHRISTINA CARTER HODGES, ARIYA QUINTERO, MANUEL MALDONADO-HERNANDEZ, Steve Eriksen, FRANK PEREZ, PAUL TRZEBIATOWSKI, BARBARA TURCIOS, ELAINE GLOVER HARRINGTON, SEAN HARRISON, MICHELLE GRIFFTH, TITAN SMITH, MARC DUDLEY, Laura Redfern, VICKI DIMAGGIO, JONATHAN STROHL, DEBORAH MIKESELL, Erica Thomas, KEVIN HILL, JR., ANDREE NATTKEMPER, JOSE A GONZALEZ, Rick Krutilla, TONI ERNY, ELENITA DE LUCCA, MOHMOD MANGAL, Jose Jacinto, ISABEL RODRIQUEZ, Felix Sanchez, Sandra Rogers, JAY SCHNEIDER, Oscar Ramos, CRYSTAL QUARLES, Susan Stewart, KERRY O'HARE, AMBER DUNCAN, VIRGINIA MATTHEWS, NYASHA BOYETTE, LARRY VASQUEZ, KELLY HALLMAN, NICOLE SMALLY, CHRISTINA CASTLE-BARBER, Darren Bobrosky, BLANCHE BREWER, DAMARIZ VARGAS, ERICK ROACH, EMMA HAWKSWORTH, AJANI CAMPBELL, HARRY WILSON, Lara Zanzucchi, DAVID DAHME, MARTINA PERRY, MONICA MOORE, JULIE DE SMET, ERIC HOGAN, MINA SHAHAB, Juan Guerra, ANTHONY NEAL, Tiffany Washington, AVEDIS BUYUKER, LEAH KEYES, James Matthews, BRIAN BRODIE, MARVA PERCY, RICHARD MCDONALD, JR., STEPHEN DOCKERTY, TOLUPENE TAVAI, Christopher Lopez, KEVIN TYSON, CONNIE ZAGORSKY, YOHANA KAHASSAI, RENA BLAKE, Roberto Lopez, MANUEL NEWTON, LUIS URIARTE, ALI CEPEDA, CANDACE GARCIA, RYAN OXFORD, Charles Perry, ADRIAN SCOTT, GINA SOBRERO, BENNIE KENNEDY, CARLOS DE LEON, SHELNIKA JACKSON, JOSEPH JOHANSEN, JOHANNA MADEROS, CARRYE JOE, NIKOLA GRCIC, SADEY CARDENAS, Michelle Guthrie, Francisco Garcia, Jack Robinson, TYISHA TILLIS, ANNETTE OREJUELA and Maria Rubalcava
Defendant: Martinez Refining Company LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv08241
Filed: November 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #16 Stipulation to Continue Date to Respond to Complaint. Motions due by 2/12/2025 Responses due by 3/19/2025 Replies due by 4/9/2025(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2024)
December 13, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Date to Respond to Complaint filed by Martinez Refining Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duginski, Jacob) (Filed on 12/13/2024)
December 13, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jacob Duginski on behalf of Martinez Refining Company LLC (Duginski, Jacob) (Filed on 12/13/2024)
December 10, 2024 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference via a Zoom webinar has been set for February 25, 2025, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by February 18th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-08241-HSG. All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2024)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2024)
December 9, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2024)
December 2, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SUNNIE CRADER, MARCHEAL REED, RODRICK SMALLY, NIKA RAMSEY, RYAN FIERNER, Joseph Bautista, SHERRY ANDROYNA, YESENIA GONZALEZ, EILEEN TUMLIN, CHRISTOPHER PIXTON, DELIA RUBALCAVA, Shari Bryce, LINDA TELLSWORTH, NANCY PARISI, MARIELENA BENAVIDES, MATTHEW DOYLE, RONALD KNOPOFF, MARKEASHA KEETON, NANCY NOONAN, James Lancaster, JAMES JOACHIM, AMIE JAMES, Patricia Sanchez, MOHAMAD HAMMOUDEH, Alicia Hamilton, BILLIE BRELAND, DOUG SCHRAMM, JANICE OLIVER, STEVIN MIKESELL, JESS MARKHAM, Jose Martinez, JOSE CONCHA-ROBLES, JENNY STEWARD, MILES SMITH, BRETT TURNER, DAVION PHILLIPS, MEGAN ARCIGA, AARON GINKENS, Brenda Hall, TIMOTHY VEITE, TYRONNE BREWER, SHARHONDA JOHNSON, BRANDI LYNN PIXTON, MARY RENEE KEETON, DANIELLE WHITE, RIHANNA PEREZ, ANNY WAHEED, BARTON HAMILTON, LINDE YOEONO, EUGENE BROCK, DARIUSZ KNIECIK, Elizabeth Silvestri, CONNIE ARIETA SORIA, LAINE PEARSON, BRYCE CALDWELL, PATSY SILVERFOOTE, LUCIANA MORRIS, BRIEN FRAZIER, ERIN DEMERRITT, Katie Jones, MARK FIERNER, Debra Jones, Samuel Sweeley, JAMES MAXWELL, Tiffany Taylor, Elias Martinez, KIMBERLY LOPEZ, DARLA WINTERMANTEL, BLAKE GRAY, BETTY STEELE, GLORIA GARCIA, ELISA OVRAHIM, ROSA NEWTON, KEVIN REYNA, MARNIQUE INGRAM, CURTIS CONRAD, ELIZABETH OLSON, LACY HENRY, VANESSA PIPKINS, Kerry Smith, SAMUEL BETHELL, KELLIE SCHRAMM, Sara Orrick, CHRISTINA CARTER HODGES, ARIYA QUINTERO, MANUEL MALDONADO-HERNANDEZ, Steve Eriksen, FRANK PEREZ, PAUL TRZEBIATOWSKI, BARBARA TURCIOS, ELAINE GLOVER HARRINGTON, SEAN HARRISON, MICHELLE GRIFFTH, TITAN SMITH, MARC DUDLEY, Laura Redfern, VICKI DIMAGGIO, JONATHAN STROHL, DEBORAH MIKESELL, Erica Thomas, KEVIN HILL, JR., ANDREE NATTKEMPER, Tony Aires, JOSE A GONZALEZ, Rick Krutilla, TONI ERNY, ELENITA DE LUCCA, MOHMOD MANGAL, Jose Jacinto, ISABEL RODRIQUEZ, Felix Sanchez, Sandra Rogers, JAY SCHNEIDER, Oscar Ramos, CRYSTAL QUARLES, Susan Stewart, KERRY O'HARE, AMBER DUNCAN, VIRGINIA MATTHEWS, NYASHA BOYETTE, LARRY VASQUEZ, KELLY HALLMAN, NICOLE SMALLY, CHRISTINA CASTLE-BARBER, Darren Bobrosky, BLANCHE BREWER, DAMARIZ VARGAS, ERICK ROACH, EMMA HAWKSWORTH, AJANI CAMPBELL, HARRY WILSON, Lara Zanzucchi, DAVID DAHME, MARTINA PERRY, MONICA MOORE, JULIE DE SMET, ERIC HOGAN, MINA SHAHAB, Juan Guerra, ANTHONY NEAL, Tiffany Washington, AVEDIS BUYUKER, LEAH KEYES, James Matthews, BRIAN BRODIE, MARVA PERCY, RICHARD MCDONALD, JR., STEPHEN DOCKERTY, TOLUPENE TAVAI, Christopher Lopez, KEVIN TYSON, CONNIE ZAGORSKY, YOHANA KAHASSAI, Tricia Aires, RENA BLAKE, Roberto Lopez, MANUEL NEWTON, LUIS URIARTE, ALI CEPEDA, CANDACE GARCIA, RYAN OXFORD, Charles Perry, ADRIAN SCOTT, GINA SOBRERO, BENNIE KENNEDY, CARLOS DE LEON, SHELNIKA JACKSON, JOSEPH JOHANSEN, JOHANNA MADEROS, CARRYE JOE, NIKOLA GRCIC, SADEY CARDENAS, Michelle Guthrie, Francisco Garcia, Jack Robinson, TYISHA TILLIS, ANNETTE OREJUELA, Maria Rubalcava, Zahra Alizada, Tamara Aljada, Mark Anderson, LYNDSEY COOPER, Marisela Argenal, AMY GUTHRIE, VIVIAN RAMIREZ, Jose Limon, ELVIN SEIDENSPINNER, RICHARD GAHR, Nicolle Ayers, SYLVIA CARMONA, ERICA CALLOWAY, MEI LIA STORELEE, BARBARA PENNEY, AURORA RUBALCAVA, Sicily Baughman.. (Griffith, Wesley) (Filed on 12/2/2024)
December 2, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by YOHANA KAHASSAI, MARVA PERCY, SYLVIA CARMONA, ELAINE GLOVER HARRINGTON, PATSY SILVERFOOTE, DELIA RUBALCAVA, MARCHEAL REED, RICHARD MCDONALD, JR., DAVID DAHME, CONNIE ARIETA SORIA, AVEDIS BUYUKER, ERIC HOGAN, Jose Limon, PAUL TRZEBIATOWSKI, ANNY WAHEED, ANDREE NATTKEMPER, LINDE YOEONO, SHELNIKA JACKSON, MINA SHAHAB, RENA BLAKE, Samuel Sweeley, Sandra Rogers, BILLIE BRELAND, LUCIANA MORRIS, LYNDSEY COOPER, SADEY CARDENAS, Erica Thomas, NIKA RAMSEY, DEBORAH MIKESELL, LEAH KEYES, EMMA HAWKSWORTH, Tiffany Washington, JAMES JOACHIM, TYISHA TILLIS, EILEEN TUMLIN, Elias Martinez, BRIAN BRODIE, NIKOLA GRCIC, ELVIN SEIDENSPINNER, CHRISTINA CASTLE-BARBER, MARC DUDLEY, BRYCE CALDWELL, DARIUSZ KNIECIK, DAMARIZ VARGAS, Tony Aires, Oscar Ramos, DANIELLE WHITE, VIVIAN RAMIREZ, SHERRY ANDROYNA, GINA SOBRERO, MICHELLE GRIFFTH, KIMBERLY LOPEZ, GLORIA GARCIA, Steve Eriksen, DAVION PHILLIPS, LAINE PEARSON, Debra Jones, MARY RENEE KEETON, ERICK ROACH, YESENIA GONZALEZ, AARON GINKENS, TYRONNE BREWER, Tiffany Taylor, AMIE JAMES, MANUEL NEWTON, NANCY PARISI, RODRICK SMALLY, RYAN OXFORD, BETTY STEELE, TITAN SMITH, Felix Sanchez, BENNIE KENNEDY, CHRISTINA CARTER HODGES, ERIN DEMERRITT, STEVIN MIKESELL, AJANI CAMPBELL, BLANCHE BREWER, BARBARA PENNEY, STEPHEN DOCKERTY, JULIE DE SMET, MARIELENA BENAVIDES, ELISA OVRAHIM, JOSEPH JOHANSEN, KERRY O'HARE, JOSE CONCHA-ROBLES, TIMOTHY VEITE, Nicolle Ayers, AURORA RUBALCAVA, SAMUEL BETHELL, MARK FIERNER, ANTHONY NEAL, FRANK PEREZ, Tamara Aljada, MEGAN ARCIGA, JOHANNA MADEROS, Marisela Argenal, AMY GUTHRIE, VICKI DIMAGGIO, KELLY HALLMAN, SHARHONDA JOHNSON, Susan Stewart, MARNIQUE INGRAM, JENNY STEWARD, ARIYA QUINTERO, CANDACE GARCIA, ROSA NEWTON, CURTIS CONRAD, LARRY VASQUEZ, Jack Robinson, BRANDI LYNN PIXTON, RYAN FIERNER, DARLA WINTERMANTEL, CARRYE JOE, ERICA CALLOWAY, Charles Perry, BLAKE GRAY, Joseph Bautista, JANICE OLIVER, Patricia Sanchez, VIRGINIA MATTHEWS, Darren Bobrosky, MANUEL MALDONADO-HERNANDEZ, KEVIN TYSON, Francisco Garcia, MARTINA PERRY, Brenda Hall, ANNETTE OREJUELA, Katie Jones, CARLOS DE LEON, JONATHAN STROHL, TONI ERNY, BRIEN FRAZIER, LUIS URIARTE, CONNIE ZAGORSKY, KELLIE SCHRAMM, Rick Krutilla, ISABEL RODRIQUEZ, Maria Rubalcava, Sara Orrick, BARBARA TURCIOS, ELENITA DE LUCCA, Juan Guerra, RIHANNA PEREZ, CRYSTAL QUARLES, Roberto Lopez, Elizabeth Silvestri, BRETT TURNER, RICHARD GAHR, James Lancaster, CHRISTOPHER PIXTON, ADRIAN SCOTT, MOHAMAD HAMMOUDEH, NICOLE SMALLY, James Matthews, SUNNIE CRADER, JAMES MAXWELL, JOSE A GONZALEZ, MATTHEW DOYLE, VANESSA PIPKINS, Shari Bryce, Laura Redfern, JESS MARKHAM, NANCY NOONAN, Jose Jacinto, BARTON HAMILTON, LACY HENRY, MOHMOD MANGAL, Christopher Lopez, Kerry Smith, SEAN HARRISON, DOUG SCHRAMM, RONALD KNOPOFF, AMBER DUNCAN, LINDA TELLSWORTH, Jose Martinez, HARRY WILSON, JAY SCHNEIDER, Mark Anderson, Michelle Guthrie, Tricia Aires, MEI LIA STORELEE, TOLUPENE TAVAI, ELIZABETH OLSON, NYASHA BOYETTE, Sicily Baughman, Alicia Hamilton, ALI CEPEDA, Lara Zanzucchi, Zahra Alizada, MONICA MOORE, KEVIN HILL, JR., MILES SMITH, MARKEASHA KEETON, EUGENE BROCK, KEVIN REYNA. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 12/2/2024)
November 27, 2024 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. The first page of this filing should be the summons that was issued. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: #9 Summons Returned Executed filed by all plaintiffs. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by YOHANA KAHASSAI, MARVA PERCY, SYLVIA CARMONA, ELAINE GLOVER HARRINGTON, PATSY SILVERFOOTE, DELIA RUBALCAVA, MARCHEAL REED, RICHARD MCDONALD, JR., DAVID DAHME, CONNIE ARIETA SORIA, AVEDIS BUYUKER, ERIC HOGAN, Jose Limon, PAUL TRZEBIATOWSKI, ANNY WAHEED, ANDREE NATTKEMPER, LINDE YOEONO, SHELNIKA JACKSON, MINA SHAHAB, RENA BLAKE, Samuel Sweeley, Sandra Rogers, BILLIE BRELAND, LUCIANA MORRIS, LYNDSEY COOPER, SADEY CARDENAS, Erica Thomas, NIKA RAMSEY, DEBORAH MIKESELL, LEAH KEYES, EMMA HAWKSWORTH, Tiffany Washington, JAMES JOACHIM, TYISHA TILLIS, EILEEN TUMLIN, Elias Martinez, BRIAN BRODIE, NIKOLA GRCIC, ELVIN SEIDENSPINNER, CHRISTINA CASTLE-BARBER, MARC DUDLEY, BRYCE CALDWELL, DARIUSZ KNIECIK, DAMARIZ VARGAS, Tony Aires, Oscar Ramos, DANIELLE WHITE, VIVIAN RAMIREZ, SHERRY ANDROYNA, GINA SOBRERO, MICHELLE GRIFFTH, KIMBERLY LOPEZ, GLORIA GARCIA, Steve Eriksen, DAVION PHILLIPS, LAINE PEARSON, Debra Jones, MARY RENEE KEETON, ERICK ROACH, YESENIA GONZALEZ, AARON GINKENS, TYRONNE BREWER, Tiffany Taylor, AMIE JAMES, MANUEL NEWTON, NANCY PARISI, RODRICK SMALLY, RYAN OXFORD, BETTY STEELE, TITAN SMITH, Felix Sanchez, BENNIE KENNEDY, CHRISTINA CARTER HODGES, ERIN DEMERRITT, STEVIN MIKESELL, AJANI CAMPBELL, BLANCHE BREWER, BARBARA PENNEY, STEPHEN DOCKERTY, JULIE DE SMET, MARIELENA BENAVIDES, ELISA OVRAHIM, JOSEPH JOHANSEN, KERRY O'HARE, JOSE CONCHA-ROBLES, TIMOTHY VEITE, Nicolle Ayers, AURORA RUBALCAVA, SAMUEL BETHELL, MARK FIERNER, ANTHONY NEAL, FRANK PEREZ, Tamara Aljada, MEGAN ARCIGA, JOHANNA MADEROS, Marisela Argenal, AMY GUTHRIE, VICKI DIMAGGIO, KELLY HALLMAN, SHARHONDA JOHNSON, Susan Stewart, MARNIQUE INGRAM, JENNY STEWARD, ARIYA QUINTERO, CANDACE GARCIA, ROSA NEWTON, CURTIS CONRAD, LARRY VASQUEZ, Jack Robinson, BRANDI LYNN PIXTON, RYAN FIERNER, DARLA WINTERMANTEL, CARRYE JOE, ERICA CALLOWAY, Charles Perry, BLAKE GRAY, Joseph Bautista, JANICE OLIVER, Patricia Sanchez, VIRGINIA MATTHEWS, Darren Bobrosky, MANUEL MALDONADO-HERNANDEZ, KEVIN TYSON, Francisco Garcia, MARTINA PERRY, Brenda Hall, ANNETTE OREJUELA, Katie Jones, CARLOS DE LEON, JONATHAN STROHL, TONI ERNY, BRIEN FRAZIER, LUIS URIARTE, CONNIE ZAGORSKY, KELLIE SCHRAMM, Rick Krutilla, ISABEL RODRIQUEZ, Maria Rubalcava, Sara Orrick, BARBARA TURCIOS, ELENITA DE LUCCA, Juan Guerra, RIHANNA PEREZ, CRYSTAL QUARLES, Roberto Lopez, Elizabeth Silvestri, BRETT TURNER, RICHARD GAHR, James Lancaster, CHRISTOPHER PIXTON, ADRIAN SCOTT, MOHAMAD HAMMOUDEH, NICOLE SMALLY, James Matthews, SUNNIE CRADER, JAMES MAXWELL, JOSE A GONZALEZ, MATTHEW DOYLE, VANESSA PIPKINS, Shari Bryce, Laura Redfern, JESS MARKHAM, NANCY NOONAN, Jose Jacinto, BARTON HAMILTON, LACY HENRY, MOHMOD MANGAL, Christopher Lopez, Kerry Smith, SEAN HARRISON, DOUG SCHRAMM, RONALD KNOPOFF, AMBER DUNCAN, LINDA TELLSWORTH, Jose Martinez, HARRY WILSON, JAY SCHNEIDER, Mark Anderson, Michelle Guthrie, Tricia Aires, MEI LIA STORELEE, TOLUPENE TAVAI, ELIZABETH OLSON, NYASHA BOYETTE, Sicily Baughman, Alicia Hamilton, ALI CEPEDA, Lara Zanzucchi, Zahra Alizada, MONICA MOORE, KEVIN HILL, JR., MILES SMITH, MARKEASHA KEETON, EUGENE BROCK, KEVIN REYNA. Martinez Refining Company LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUNNIE CRADER, MARCHEAL REED, RODRICK SMALLY, NIKA RAMSEY, RYAN FIERNER, Joseph Bautista, SHERRY ANDROYNA, YESENIA GONZALEZ, EILEEN TUMLIN, CHRISTOPHER PIXTON, DELIA RUBALCAVA, Shari Bryce, LINDA TELLSWORTH, NANCY PARISI, MARIELENA BENAVIDES, MATTHEW DOYLE, RONALD KNOPOFF, MARKEASHA KEETON, NANCY NOONAN, James Lancaster, JAMES JOACHIM, AMIE JAMES, Patricia Sanchez, MOHAMAD HAMMOUDEH, Alicia Hamilton, BILLIE BRELAND, DOUG SCHRAMM, JANICE OLIVER, STEVIN MIKESELL, JESS MARKHAM, Jose Martinez, JOSE CONCHA-ROBLES, JENNY STEWARD, MILES SMITH, BRETT TURNER, DAVION PHILLIPS, MEGAN ARCIGA, AARON GINKENS, Brenda Hall, TIMOTHY VEITE, TYRONNE BREWER, SHARHONDA JOHNSON, BRANDI LYNN PIXTON, MARY RENEE KEETON, DANIELLE WHITE, RIHANNA PEREZ, ANNY WAHEED, BARTON HAMILTON, LINDE YOEONO, EUGENE BROCK, DARIUSZ KNIECIK, Elizabeth Silvestri, CONNIE ARIETA SORIA, LAINE PEARSON, BRYCE CALDWELL, PATSY SILVERFOOTE, LUCIANA MORRIS, BRIEN FRAZIER, ERIN DEMERRITT, Katie Jones, MARK FIERNER, Debra Jones, Samuel Sweeley, JAMES MAXWELL, Tiffany Taylor, Elias Martinez, KIMBERLY LOPEZ, DARLA WINTERMANTEL, BLAKE GRAY, BETTY STEELE, GLORIA GARCIA, ELISA OVRAHIM, ROSA NEWTON, KEVIN REYNA, MARNIQUE INGRAM, CURTIS CONRAD, ELIZABETH OLSON, LACY HENRY, VANESSA PIPKINS, Kerry Smith, SAMUEL BETHELL, KELLIE SCHRAMM, Sara Orrick, CHRISTINA CARTER HODGES, ARIYA QUINTERO, MANUEL MALDONADO-HERNANDEZ, Steve Eriksen, FRANK PEREZ, PAUL TRZEBIATOWSKI, BARBARA TURCIOS, ELAINE GLOVER HARRINGTON, SEAN HARRISON, MICHELLE GRIFFTH, TITAN SMITH, MARC DUDLEY, Laura Redfern, VICKI DIMAGGIO, JONATHAN STROHL, DEBORAH MIKESELL, Erica Thomas, KEVIN HILL, JR., ANDREE NATTKEMPER, Tony Aires, JOSE A GONZALEZ, Rick Krutilla, TONI ERNY, ELENITA DE LUCCA, MOHMOD MANGAL, Jose Jacinto, ISABEL RODRIQUEZ, Felix Sanchez, Sandra Rogers, JAY SCHNEIDER, Oscar Ramos, CRYSTAL QUARLES, Susan Stewart, KERRY OHARE, AMBER DUNCAN, VIRGINIA MATTHEWS, NYASHA BOYETTE, LARRY VASQUEZ, KELLY HALLMAN, NICOLE SMALLY, CHRISTINA CASTLE-BARBER, Darren Bobrosky, BLANCHE BREWER, DAMARIZ VARGAS, ERICK ROACH, EMMA HAWKSWORTH, AJANI CAMPBELL, HARRY WILSON, Lara Zanzucchi, DAVID DAHME, MARTINA PERRY, MONICA MOORE, JULIE DE SMET, ERIC HOGAN, MINA SHAHAB, Juan Guerra, ANTHONY NEAL, Tiffany Washington, AVEDIS BUYUKER, LEAH KEYES, James Matthews, BRIAN BRODIE, MARVA PERCY, RICHARD MCDONALD, JR., STEPHEN DOCKERTY, TOLUPENE TAVAI, Christopher Lopez, KEVIN TYSON, CONNIE ZAGORSKY, YOHANA KAHASSAI, Tricia Aires, RENA BLAKE, Roberto Lopez, MANUEL NEWTON, LUIS URIARTE, ALI CEPEDA, CANDACE GARCIA, RYAN OXFORD, Charles Perry, ADRIAN SCOTT, GINA SOBRERO, BENNIE KENNEDY, CARLOS DE LEON, SHELNIKA JACKSON, JOSEPH JOHANSEN, JOHANNA MADEROS, CARRYE JOE, NIKOLA GRCIC, SADEY CARDENAS, Michelle Guthrie, Francisco Garcia, Jack Robinson, TYISHA TILLIS, ANNETTE OREJUELA, Maria Rubalcava, Zahra Alizada, Tamara Aljada, Mark Anderson, LYNDSEY COOPER, Marisela Argenal, AMY GUTHRIE, VIVIAN RAMIREZ, Jose Limon, ELVIN SEIDENSPINNER, RICHARD GAHR, Nicolle Ayers, SYLVIA CARMONA, ERICA CALLOWAY, MEI LIA STORELEE, BARBARA PENNEY, AURORA RUBALCAVA, Sicily Baughman re #1 Complaint, (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 23, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint, and have been added to this case: Maria Rubalcava. (This is a text-only entry.) (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 11/23/2024)
November 22, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint, and have been added to this case: LYNDSEY COOPER, AMY GUTHRIE, VIVIAN RAMIREZ, Jose Limon, ELVIN SEIDENSPINNER, RICHARD GAHR, SYLVIA CARMONA, ERICA CALLOWAY, MEI LIA STORELEE, BARBARA PENNEY, AURORA RUBALCAVA, SUNNIE CRADER, MARCHEAL REED, RODRICK SMALLY, NIKA RAMSEY, RYAN FIERNER, SHERRY ANDROYNA, YESENIA GONZALEZ, EILEEN TUMLIN, CHRISTOPHER PIXTON, DELIA RUBALCAVA, Shari Bryce, LINDA TELLSWORTH, NANCY PARISI, MARIELENA BENAVIDES, MATTHEW DOYLE, RONALD KNOPOFF, MARKEASHA KEETON, NANCY NOONAN, James Lancaster, JAMES JOACHIM, AMIE JAMES, Patricia Sanchez, MOHAMAD HAMMOUDEH, Alicia Hamilton, BILLIE BRELAND, DOUG SCHRAMM, JANICE OLIVER, STEVIN MIKESELL, JESS MARKHAM, Jose Martinez, JOSE CONCHA-ROBLES, JENNY STEWARD, MILES SMITH, BRETT TURNER, DAVION PHILLIPS, MEGAN ARCIGA, AARON GINKENS, Brenda Hall, TIMOTHY VEITE, TYRONNE BREWER, SHARHONDA JOHNSON, BRANDI LYNN PIXTON, MARY RENEE KEETON, DANIELLE WHITE, RIHANNA PEREZ, ANNY WAHEED, BARTON HAMILTON, LINDE YOEONO, EUGENE BROCK, DARIUSZ KNIECIK, CONNIE ARIETA SORIA, LAINE PEARSON, BRYCE CALDWELL, PATSY SILVERFOOTE, LUCIANA MORRIS, BRIEN FRAZIER, ERIN DEMERRITT, Katie Jones, MARK FIERNER, Debra Jones, Samuel Sweeley, JAMES MAXWELL, Tiffany Taylor, Elias Martinez, KIMBERLY LOPEZ, DARLA WINTERMANTEL, BLAKE GRAY, BETTY STEELE, GLORIA GARCIA, ELISA OVRAHIM, ROSA NEWTON, KEVIN REYNA, MARNIQUE INGRAM, CURTIS CONRAD, ELIZABETH OLSON, LACY HENRY, VANESSA PIPKINS, Kerry Smith, SAMUEL BETHELL, KELLIE SCHRAMM, Sara Orrick, CHRISTINA CARTER HODGES, ARIYA QUINTERO, MANUEL MALDONADO-HERNANDEZ, Steve Eriksen, FRANK PEREZ, PAUL TRZEBIATOWSKI, BARBARA TURCIOS, ELAINE GLOVER HARRINGTON, SEAN HARRISON, MICHELLE GRIFFTH, TITAN SMITH, MARC DUDLEY, Laura Redfern, VICKI DIMAGGIO, JONATHAN STROHL, DEBORAH MIKESELL, Erica Thomas, KEVIN HILL, JR., ANDREE NATTKEMPER, JOSE A GONZALEZ, Rick Krutilla, TONI ERNY, ELENITA DE LUCCA, MOHMOD MANGAL, Jose Jacinto, ISABEL RODRIQUEZ, Felix Sanchez, Sandra Rogers, JAY SCHNEIDER, Oscar Ramos, CRYSTAL QUARLES, Susan Stewart, KERRY OHARE, AMBER DUNCAN, VIRGINIA MATTHEWS, NYASHA BOYETTE, LARRY VASQUEZ, KELLY HALLMAN, NICOLE SMALLY, CHRISTINA CASTLE-BARBER, Darren Bobrosky, BLANCHE BREWER, DAMARIZ VARGAS, ERICK ROACH, EMMA HAWKSWORTH, AJANI CAMPBELL, HARRY WILSON, Lara Zanzucchi, DAVID DAHME, MARTINA PERRY, MONICA MOORE, JULIE DE SMET, ERIC HOGAN, MINA SHAHAB, Juan Guerra, ANTHONY NEAL, Tiffany Washington, AVEDIS BUYUKER, LEAH KEYES, James Matthews, BRIAN BRODIE, MARVA PERCY, RICHARD MCDONALD, JR., STEPHEN DOCKERTY, TOLUPENE TAVAI, Christopher Lopez, KEVIN TYSON, CONNIE ZAGORSKY, YOHANA KAHASSAI, RENA BLAKE, Roberto Lopez, MANUEL NEWTON, LUIS URIARTE, ALI CEPEDA, CANDACE GARCIA, RYAN OXFORD, Charles Perry, ADRIAN SCOTT, GINA SOBRERO, BENNIE KENNEDY, CARLOS DE LEON, SHELNIKA JACKSON, JOSEPH JOHANSEN, JOHANNA MADEROS, CARRYE JOE, NIKOLA GRCIC, SADEY CARDENAS, Michelle Guthrie, Francisco Garcia, Jack Robinson, TYISHA TILLIS and ANNETTE OREJUELA. (This is a text-only entry.) (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 11/22/2024)
November 22, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2024)
November 22, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Martinez Refining Company LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2024)
November 22, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2024)
November 22, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Not all parties listed in the Complaint have been added to the docket. Please add the missing parties using the event Notice of Additional Parties. The event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Notice of Additional Parties. [err401] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Tony Aires, Joseph Bautista, Sicily Baughman, Marisela Argenal, Mark Anderson, Tamara Aljada, Elizabeth Silvestri, Zahra Alizada, Tricia Aires, Nicolle Ayers. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2024)
November 21, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 11/21/2024)
November 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) Martinez Refining Company LLC (Filing fee $405, receipt number ACANDC-20071760). Filed by Mark Anderson, Tricia Aires, Marisela Argenal, Sicily Baughman, Tony Aires, Nicolle Ayers, Elizabeth Silvestri, Zahra Alizada, Joseph Bautista, Tamara AlJada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 11/21/2024) Modified on 11/22/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvestri et al v. Martinez Refining Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolle Ayers
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara AlJada
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisela Argenal
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Aires
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Silvestri
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahra Alizada
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anderson
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Aires
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sicily Baughman
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bautista
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Scott Nolan King
Represented By: Reza Torkzadeh
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNDSEY COOPER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY GUTHRIE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIVIAN RAMIREZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Limon
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELVIN SEIDENSPINNER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD GAHR
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA CARMONA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICA CALLOWAY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEI LIA STORELEE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA PENNEY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA RUBALCAVA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNNIE CRADER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCHEAL REED
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODRICK SMALLY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIKA RAMSEY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN FIERNER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY ANDROYNA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YESENIA GONZALEZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EILEEN TUMLIN
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER PIXTON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELIA RUBALCAVA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Bryce
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA TELLSWORTH
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY PARISI
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIELENA BENAVIDES
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW DOYLE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD KNOPOFF
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARKEASHA KEETON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY NOONAN
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lancaster
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES JOACHIM
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMIE JAMES
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Sanchez
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMAD HAMMOUDEH
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Hamilton
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLIE BRELAND
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUG SCHRAMM
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE OLIVER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVIN MIKESELL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESS MARKHAM
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE CONCHA-ROBLES
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNY STEWARD
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILES SMITH
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT TURNER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVION PHILLIPS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN ARCIGA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON GINKENS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Hall
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY VEITE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONNE BREWER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARHONDA JOHNSON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDI LYNN PIXTON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY RENEE KEETON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE WHITE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIHANNA PEREZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNY WAHEED
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTON HAMILTON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDE YOEONO
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE BROCK
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARIUSZ KNIECIK
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONNIE ARIETA SORIA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAINE PEARSON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYCE CALDWELL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATSY SILVERFOOTE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCIANA MORRIS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIEN FRAZIER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN DEMERRITT
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Jones
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK FIERNER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Jones
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Sweeley
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MAXWELL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Taylor
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Martinez
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY LOPEZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLA WINTERMANTEL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE GRAY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY STEELE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA GARCIA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISA OVRAHIM
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA NEWTON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN REYNA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARNIQUE INGRAM
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS CONRAD
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH OLSON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LACY HENRY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA PIPKINS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Smith
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL BETHELL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLIE SCHRAMM
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Orrick
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA CARTER HODGES
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIYA QUINTERO
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL MALDONADO-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Eriksen
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK PEREZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL TRZEBIATOWSKI
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA TURCIOS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELAINE GLOVER HARRINGTON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN HARRISON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE GRIFFTH
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TITAN SMITH
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC DUDLEY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Redfern
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI DIMAGGIO
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN STROHL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH MIKESELL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Thomas
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN HILL, JR.
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREE NATTKEMPER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE A GONZALEZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Krutilla
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONI ERNY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELENITA DE LUCCA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHMOD MANGAL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jacinto
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISABEL RODRIQUEZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Sanchez
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rogers
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY SCHNEIDER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Ramos
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL QUARLES
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Stewart
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY O'HARE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER DUNCAN
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA MATTHEWS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYASHA BOYETTE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY VASQUEZ
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY HALLMAN
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE SMALLY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA CASTLE-BARBER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Bobrosky
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLANCHE BREWER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMARIZ VARGAS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICK ROACH
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA HAWKSWORTH
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJANI CAMPBELL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY WILSON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lara Zanzucchi
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID DAHME
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTINA PERRY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONICA MOORE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE DE SMET
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC HOGAN
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINA SHAHAB
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Guerra
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY NEAL
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Washington
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVEDIS BUYUKER
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH KEYES
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Matthews
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BRODIE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARVA PERCY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MCDONALD, JR.
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN DOCKERTY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOLUPENE TAVAI
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lopez
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN TYSON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONNIE ZAGORSKY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOHANA KAHASSAI
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENA BLAKE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Lopez
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL NEWTON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS URIARTE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALI CEPEDA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDACE GARCIA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN OXFORD
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Perry
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN SCOTT
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA SOBRERO
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENNIE KENNEDY
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS DE LEON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELNIKA JACKSON
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH JOHANSEN
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHANNA MADEROS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRYE JOE
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIKOLA GRCIC
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SADEY CARDENAS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Guthrie
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Garcia
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Robinson
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYISHA TILLIS
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE OREJUELA
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rubalcava
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez Refining Company LLC
Represented By: Jacob Duginski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?