CSP Logistics v. K18, Inc.
Plaintiff: CSP Logistics
Defendant: K18, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv09143
Filed: December 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2025 Filing 29 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Defendant K18, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byK18, Inc.. (Lesnick, Matthew) (Filed on 2/14/2025)
February 7, 2025 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Plaintiff CSP Logistics' Opposition Defendant K18, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed byCSP Logistics. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/7/2025)
February 7, 2025 Filing 27 REPLY (re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCSP Logistics. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/7/2025)
February 3, 2025 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CSP Logistics of the Civil Pretrial and Trial Standing Order for Cases Before District Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.; Standing Order for Civil Cases Before District Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.; and Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/3/2025)
January 31, 2025 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) - Defendant K18, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff CSP Logistics' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byK18, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Ashiru ISO Opposition, #2 Declaration of M. Lesnick ISO Opposition)(Lesnick, Matthew) (Filed on 1/31/2025)
January 27, 2025 Reset Hearing as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, See Docket No. #24 : Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2025)
January 24, 2025 Filing 24 Renotice motion hearing re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCSP Logistics. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Filing 23 Renotice motion hearing re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCSP Logistics. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Filing 22 Renotice motion hearing re #20 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byK18, Inc.. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Lesnick, Matthew) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #20 motion to dismiss. Hearing date of March 13, 2025, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. March 13th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. If counsel would like to request an earlier date, an administrative motion or a stipulation and proposed order should be e-filed after the motion is re-noticed. And if granted, the Court will advance the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by K18, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/13/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. Responses due by 2/7/2025. Replies due by 2/14/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lesnick, Matthew) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE. Docket No. 15 advised, "ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED." Therefore docket no. #12 should have been re-noticed not re-filed as a new motion (docket no. #18 ). If docket no. #18 is in fact a duplicate filing of no. #12 . A re-notice needs to be e-filed indicating that and re-noticing docket no. #12 for hearing and docket no. #18 will be TERMINATED as a duplicate filing. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. February 27th was not the Court's next available hearing date when docket no. #18 was e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 *** #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TERMINATED, Re-Filed as a Duplicate Filing of Docket No. #12 .*** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Reset Hearing as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss, See Docket No. #22 : Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 23, 2025 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CSP Logistics. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/6/2025. Replies due by 2/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emilie Chich, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Declaration of Aaron S. Craig, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Proposed Order)(Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 1/23/2025)
January 23, 2025 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference via a Zoom webinar has been set for March 25, 2025, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by March 18th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-09143-HSG. All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2025)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2025)
January 23, 2025 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2025)
January 22, 2025 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by K18, Inc... (Pappas, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2025)
January 21, 2025 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination:Plaintiff CSP Logistics has filed a Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Accordingly, Defendant K`18, Inc., shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/28/2025. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2025)
January 17, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CSP Logistics. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2025 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 1/31/2025. Replies due by 2/7/2025. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emilie Chich, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Declaration of Aaron S. Craig, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Proposed Order)(Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 1/17/2025)
January 17, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Stavroula Kyriazis on behalf of CSP Logistics (Kyriazis, Stavroula) (Filed on 1/17/2025)
January 9, 2025 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant K18, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by K18, Inc.. (Lesnick, Matthew) (Filed on 1/9/2025)
December 31, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CSP Logistics.. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 12/31/2024)
December 26, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CSP Logistics. K18, Inc. served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 12/26/2024)
December 18, 2024 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2024)
December 18, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to K18, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2024)
December 18, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2024)
December 17, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by CSP Logistics identifying Corporate Parent CSP for CSP Logistics. re #1 Complaint, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Proposed Summons (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 12/17/2024)
December 17, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSP Logistics identifying Corporate Parent CSP for CSP Logistics. re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 12/17/2024)
December 17, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 12/17/2024)
December 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against K18, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20153633.). Filed by CSP Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 12/17/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSP Logistics v. K18, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K18, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Emmanuel Pappas
Represented By: Matthew Alan Lesnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSP Logistics
Represented By: Aaron S Craig
Represented By: Stavroula Kyriazis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?