Richards v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al
Plaintiff: G. Richards
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 4:2024cv09229
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #25 Stipulation for Extension to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2025)
February 6, 2025 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Extension to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Thomas, Kaleigh) (Filed on 2/6/2025)
February 5, 2025 Filing 24 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byRushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Cooper, Neil) (Filed on 2/5/2025)
January 30, 2025 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of First, Second, Third, Fourth, and Sixth Causes of Action as to Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC Only by G. Richards (Shapero, Sarah) (Filed on 1/30/2025)
January 30, 2025 Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byG. Richards. (Shapero, Sarah) (Filed on 1/30/2025)
January 28, 2025 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (Thomas, Kaleigh) (Filed on 1/28/2025)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #13 Stipulation Re #7 Second Amended Complaint. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference via a Zoom webinar has been set for March 25, 2025, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by March 18th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-09229-HSG. All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Cooper, Neil) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 01/24/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 24, 2025 Reset Hearing as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss, See Docket No. #18 : Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2025)
January 23, 2025 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2025)
January 23, 2025 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G. Richards.. (Shapero, Sarah) (Filed on 1/23/2025)
January 23, 2025 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Thomas, Kaleigh) (Filed on 1/23/2025)
January 22, 2025 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #7 Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Thomas, Kaleigh) (Filed on 1/22/2025)
January 16, 2025 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/23/2025. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
January 16, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/20/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. Responses due by 1/30/2025. Replies due by 2/6/2025. (Cooper, Neil) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
January 16, 2025 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC.. (Cooper, Neil) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
January 14, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by William Jason Scott on behalf of Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Scott, William) (Filed on 1/14/2025)
January 14, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Kaleigh Thomas on behalf of Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Thomas, Kaleigh) (Filed on 1/14/2025)
January 8, 2025 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed by G. Richards. (Shapero, Sarah) (Filed on 1/8/2025)
December 27, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Cooper, Neil) (Filed on 12/27/2024)
December 26, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2024)
December 20, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Cooper, Neil) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Other Affiliate Vanguard Group Inc. for Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Cooper, Neil) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CV0001752. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20160981). Filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 copy of First Amended Complaint attached - Exhibits A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Neil) (Filed on 12/19/2024) Modified on 12/26/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Richards
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Neil Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Kaleigh Thomas
Represented By: William Jason Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?