Stokes v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Shanteldle M Stokes
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv09356
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2024 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference via a Zoom webinar has been set for April 1, 2025, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by March 25th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-09356-HSG. All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2024)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2024. (exl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2024)
December 27, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2024)
December 27, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 12/27/2024)
December 27, 2024 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2024)
December 26, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/9/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 Answer to 1 Removal Complaint by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Greg Gruzman on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz North America Corporation, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz Group AG, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz Capital Nederland B.V. for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV100598. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20173455). Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of GG ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 12/23/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanteldle M Stokes
Represented By: Luis A. Serrano
Represented By: Kevin Y. Jacobson
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?