Hirani v. Kothandaraman et al
Plaintiff: Abdul Hirani
Defendant: Thurman John Rodgers, Jamie Haenggi, Richard Mora, Badrinarayanan Kothandaraman, Enphase Energy, Inc., Steven J. Gomo, Benjamin Kortlang, Raghuveer Belur and Joseph Malchow
Interested Party: Greg Hanowski
Case Number: 4:2024cv09532
Filed: December 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2025 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Greg Hanowski. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 2/20/2025)
February 19, 2025 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ZOOM HEARING. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 05/12/2025 at 2:00PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2025)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See #General Order 65 and #cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2025)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar re #11 Notice. Case no. 24-cv-9038-JST is related to Case no. 24-cv-9532-VC and 25-cv-652-VC. (dms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2025)
January 31, 2025 Filing 11 Notice of Filing of The Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Abdul Hirani (Tramontano, Alex) (Filed on 1/31/2025) Modified on 2/3/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2025 Filing 10 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2025 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, March 28, 2025, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2025)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 01/14/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(kxo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abdul Hirani.. (Tramontano, Alex) (Filed on 1/13/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Raghuveer Belur, Enphase Energy, Inc., Steven J. Gomo, Jamie Haenggi, Benjamin Kortlang, Badrinarayanan Kothandaraman, Joseph Malchow, Richard Mora, Thurman John Rodgers. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/16/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
December 31, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Abdul Hirani (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 12/31/2024)
December 31, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 12/31/2024)
December 31, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20187069.). Filed by Abdul Hirani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 12/31/2024) Modified on 1/2/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirani v. Kothandaraman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thurman John Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Haenggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badrinarayanan Kothandaraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enphase Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Gomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Kortlang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raghuveer Belur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Malchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Hirani
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Stephanie Aviles
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Represented By: Alex J. Tramontano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Greg Hanowski
Represented By: Robert Charles Moest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?