Lopatiouk v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Marina Victorovna Lopatiouk
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2025cv00008
Filed: January 2, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sepehr Daghighian on behalf of Marina Victorovna Lopatiouk (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 1/9/2025)
January 9, 2025 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marina Victorovna Lopatiouk identifying Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC for Marina Victorovna Lopatiouk. (Rosenstein, Michael) (Filed on 1/9/2025)
January 9, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Michael Harris Rosenstein on behalf of Marina Victorovna Lopatiouk (Rosenstein, Michael) (Filed on 1/9/2025)
January 6, 2025 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ZOOM HEARING. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 03/31/2025 at 2:00PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 01/03/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2025)
January 3, 2025 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/16/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by James P. Mayo on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Mayo, James) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz North America Corporation, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz Group AG, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz Capital Nederland B.V. for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV098932. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20189723). Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Atty Declaration ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Answer to Removal Complaint (Removal #1 Exhibit C) by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2025)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopatiouk v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Victorovna Lopatiouk
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Represented By: Brian Tate Shippen-Murray
Represented By: Michael Harris Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?