FoiaConsciousness.com LLC v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Plaintiff: FoiaConsciousness.com LLC
Defendant: Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Archives and Records Administration and US ATTORNEY OFFICE NORTHERN DIST OF CA CIVIL PROCESS CLERK
Case Number: 4:2025cv00408
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Archives and Records Administration. Filed by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y)(Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 3/5/2025)
February 24, 2025 Filing 14 STIPULATION Continuing Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Department of State, Department of Defense, National Archives and Records Administration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 2/24/2025)
February 12, 2025 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC. Central Intelligence Agency served on 2/7/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 2/12/2025)
February 5, 2025 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC. Department of Defense served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/26/2025; Department of State served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/26/2025; Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/26/2025; National Archives and Records Administration served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/26/2025. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 2/5/2025)
February 5, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC. US ATTORNEY OFFICE NORTHERN DIST OF CA CIVIL PROCESS CLERK served on 1/30/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 2/5/2025)
January 16, 2025 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Archives and Records Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
January 15, 2025 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 4/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 11, 2025, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2025)
January 15, 2025 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 1/15/2025)
January 15, 2025 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 1/15/2025)
January 15, 2025 #Electronic filing error. ]. Submit one proposed summons listing all defendants. Attach additional pages if needed for multiple parties/addresses. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #7 Proposed Summons filed by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC, #2 Proposed Summons filed by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2025)
January 14, 2025 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kam2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC (None) (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 1/13/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC.. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 1/13/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 1/13/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20228573.). Filed by FoiaConsciousness.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-S)(Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 1/13/2025)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FoiaConsciousness.com LLC v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FoiaConsciousness.com LLC
Represented By: Mark Louis Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Archives and Records Administration
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US ATTORNEY OFFICE NORTHERN DIST OF CA CIVIL PROCESS CLERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?