Wei v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.
Plaintiff: Tzyhlih Wei
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.
Case Number: 4:2025cv01896
Filed: February 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2025 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tzyhlih Wei. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2025)
March 25, 2025 Filing 5 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2025. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 10, 2025 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/24/2025. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 27, 2025 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 21, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2025)
February 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 405 PAID.). Filed by Tzyhlih Wei. Consent/Declination due by 3/7/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2025)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wei v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tzyhlih Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?