Clark v. Ayers

Petitioner: Richard Dean Clark
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 5:1997cv20618
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 557 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS REGARDING PETITIONER'S EVIDENTIARY HEARING REPLY by Judge William Alsup finding as moot 551 Stipulation; finding as moot 552 Stipulation; granting 554 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 555 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
August 22, 2012 528 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY AND EVIDENTIARY SUBMISSION re 527 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Richard Dean Clark. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on August 22, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
July 23, 2012 505 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 504 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 23, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 10, 2012 502 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 501 Status Report. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 10, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
April 4, 2012 498 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CONCLUSION OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/4/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
October 13, 2011 494 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CONCLUSION OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/11/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 22, 2010 488 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTIONS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME AND TO FILE OVERSIZED BRIEF. Motions terminated: 482 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse and reply filed by Richard Dean Clark, 480 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse and Reply filed by Richard Dean Clark, 486 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Richard Dean Clark, 481 MOTION for Extension of Time to File traverse and reply filed by Richard Dean Clark, 478 MOTION for Ext ension of Time to File Traverse and Reply filed by Richard Dean Clark, 477 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse and Reply filed by Richard Dean Clark, 476 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse and Reply. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING BRIEFING OF PETITIONER'S SECOND MOTION FOR DISCOVERY. Respondent shall file his opposition to Petitioner's Second Motion for Discovery on or before July 19, 2010. Petitioner shall file his traverse and any reply to Respon dent's opposition on or before August 23, 2010. The present order resolves all pending motions in this action; the clerk therefore shall terminate all pending motions. Motions terminated: 470 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl y Respondent's Application To Extend Time To File Response To Second Motion For Discovery filed by Robert L. Ayers, Jr., 466 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motion filed by Richard Dean Clark, 464 MOTION f or Extension of Time to File filed by Richard Dean Clark, 467 Second MOTION for Discovery filed by Richard Dean Clark, 471 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Traverse filed by Richard Dean Clark, 468 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Discovery filed by Richard Dean Clark. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
May 28, 2010 469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING BRIEFING OF PETITIONER'S DISCOVERY MOTION re 466 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File, 464 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Petitioner shall move for discovery on or before 5/24/2010, Petitioner shall file his traverse and Respondent shall file opposition to the Motion for Discovery on or before 7/12/2010, Petitioner shall file any reply on or before 8/2/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
November 23, 2009 455 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Date for Submission of Answer to Fifth Amended Petition re 454 Stipulation. Answer due 12/7/2009. Please see Order for further scheduling deadlines. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
August 14, 2009 444 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO CONTINUE DATE FOR SUBMISSION OF AMENDED PETITION AND ANSWER re 443 Stipulation. The Fifth Amended Petition be extended to August 28, 2009, and the time to file the Answer be extended to September 30, 2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/13/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009) Modified on 9/17/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Dean Clark
Represented By: Lynne S. Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?