Asyst Technologies v. Empak Corporation, et al

Case Number: 5:1998cv20451
Filed: October 28, 1996
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2009 1158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 1134 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TAXED COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/13/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
October 3, 2008 1148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 1147 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE ON ASYST TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF THE CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/3/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 11, 2008 1146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 1145 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE ON ASYST TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF THE CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2008 09:00 AM.Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/11/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asyst Technologies v. Empak Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?