Griffin v. Gomez, et al

Plaintiff: Robert Lee Griffin
Defendant: James Gomez, Charles D. Marshall, C.A. Terhune and Robert Ayers
Case Number: 5:1998cv21038
Filed: March 31, 1992
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2014 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE. Since there are no further matters pending in this action subsequent to the remand from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the Clerk of Court shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/4/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 1, 2014 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. In accord with the opinion filed by Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals 264 , the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
November 12, 2010 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vadas denying 233 Motion to Strike. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
July 19, 2010 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS re 211 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Request to File Confidential Document Under Seal for In Camera Review filed by James Gomez. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 19, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
March 12, 2010 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension of time until March 15, 2010 for Respondent to File Response Brief. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 8, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 191 Errata filed by James Gomez. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/5/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
November 20, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE NANDOR VADAS FOR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 20, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
August 4, 2009 171 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to File Bill of Costs re 169 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
September 30, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving stipulation re 152 Stipulation filed by Robert Lee Griffin. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/30/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Gomez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Griffin
Represented By: Pamela Jo Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gomez
Represented By: Stephen P. Acquisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Marshall
Represented By: Stephen P. Acquisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.A. Terhune
Represented By: Stephen P. Acquisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ayers
Represented By: Stephen P. Acquisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?