SJ Char Hells Angels, et al v. City of San Jose, et al Featured Case

Case Number: 5:1999cv20022
Filed: January 11, 1999
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2009 SEALED DOCUMENTS LOCATED AT FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER (FRC) San Bruno, CA. Accession #:021-09-5150 Box #:11. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 26, 2007 FILE located at Federal Records Center, San Bruno, CA: Accession No: 021-07-0061, Location No: 735358-735362, Box No: 8-12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
August 25, 2006 301 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by City of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
June 19, 2006 300 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/19/2006 before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter: Peter Torreano.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 19, 2006 299 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/19/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 15, 2006 298 STIPULATION and Proposed Order To Continue Hearing Date by The San Jose Charter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club. (Dyer, Kate) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
May 19, 2006 297 Corrected Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2006 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/19/2006). (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/19/2006)
May 19, 2006 Minute Entry: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment hearing held on 5/19/2006 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/19/2006). The motion is denied without prejudice. The Court sets the case for motion hearing on 7/14/2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/19/2006)
May 19, 2006 295 Featured Case ORDER DENYINIG 277 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR RENEWED MOTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/19/06. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2006)
May 18, 2006 294 DEFENDANTS' SURREPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDCATION. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 18, 2006 293 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 288 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/18/06. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 16, 2006 292 NOTICE by The San Jose Charter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY (Snell, Karen) (Filed on 5/16/2006)
May 12, 2006 288 NOTICE by City of San Jose Defendants' Application for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael R. Groves# 3 Proposed Order)(Greenberg, Clifford) (Filed on 5/12/2006)
May 5, 2006 291 EXHIBIT B to 290 Declaration of Karen L. Snell in Support of Reply to Opposition filed byThe San Jose Charter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club. (Related document(s) 290 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 290 Declaration of Karen L. Snell in Support of 289 Reply to Opposition filed byThe San Jose Charter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club. (Related document(s) 289 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 289 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication as to the First Cause of Action filed byThe San Jose Charter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 3, 2006 287 Declaration of William Manion CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 285 filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
April 28, 2006 286 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 285 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 287 . *** Declaration of WILLIAM MANION in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2006) Modified on 5/8/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2006 284 Declaration of ROBERT CARNEY in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 283 Declaration of RAFAEL NIEVES in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 282 Declaration of PETER DECENA in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 281 Declaration of PAUL MESSIER in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 280 Declaration of Michael Knox in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 279 Declaration of Dave Newman in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Jose. (Groves, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 14, 2006 278 Declaration of Kate Dyer in Support of 277 Memorandum in Support of Motion for summary adjudiction filed byThe San Jose Charter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club. (Related document(s) 277 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2006)
April 14, 2006 277 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for summary adjudication as to the first cause of action against Defendants Decena, Newman, Manion, Knox, Carney, Messier and Nieves filed byThe San Jose Charter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2006)
March 23, 2006 276 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Linderman re 274 Stipulation and Order, Terminated Case (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006)
March 22, 2006 275 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 3/22/2006). (Court Reporter not reported.) Settlement discussions ongoing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2006)
March 21, 2006 274 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER, *** dismissal with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/20/2006. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2006)
March 17, 2006 Received Stipulation and Order for dismissal with prejudice and entry of Judgment by Robert Linderman. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
February 16, 2006 273 Featured Case ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/20/2006 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/16/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2006)
February 3, 2006 272 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 2/3/2006). (Court Reporter not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/3/2006)
January 4, 2006 271 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by The San Jose Charter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club. (Dyer, Kate) (Filed on 1/4/2006)
December 27, 2005 270 Featured Case SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2006 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/27/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2005)
December 20, 2005 269 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/16/2005 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 12/20/2005). Case set for hearing Summary Judgment motions on 3/17/06 at 9:00 a.m., Jury trial set on 9/8/06 at 1:30 p.m. and Pretrial conference set on 9/1/06 at 11:00 a.m. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Richard seeborg for settlement conference, to occur in January, 2006. (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2005)
November 17, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2005 10:30 AM. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2005)
November 17, 2005 268 Letter confirming Status Conferenc hearing for 12/16/2005 at 10:30 from Kate Dyer. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2005)
August 24, 2005 Docket Modification (Administrative) to Case Management Conference set for 10:30 10/7/05 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2005 267 RECORD ON APPEAL RETURNED FROM USCA [245-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 24, 2005 266 NOTICE by defendant City of San Jose, defendant San Jose Police Dept of change of address for Office of the City Attorney [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
May 10, 2005 265 MINUTES: ( C/R Peter Torreano) ( Hearing Date: 5/6/05) Status Review conference held. Counsel for both the City and County advised the Court that there are no further proceedings in the 9th Circuit. Counsel for the plaintiffs advised the Court that remaining litigation is with respect to liability. This Court has not adjudicated liability. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 10/7/05 at 10:30 am. [5:99-cv-20022] (cv, COURT STAFF) Modified on 08/24/2005
April 27, 2005 RECEIVED certified copy of the Decree of the Court [5:99-cv-20022] (lrb, COURT STAFF)
February 3, 2005 264 CLERK'S NOTICE Status Review hearing set for 10:30 5/6/05 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 13, 2005 263 CLERK'S NOTICE Status conference set for 10:30 2/4/05 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 15, 2004 262 CLERK'S NOTICE Status conference set for 10:30 1/28/04 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 3, 2004 261 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2:30 9/17/04 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 19, 2004 260 NOTICE by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels of change of address [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 12, 2004 259 CLERK'S NOTICE Status conference set for 10:30 9/13/04 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
November 18, 2003 258 RECEIPT from USCA of clerk's record on appeal [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
November 5, 2003 RECORD on Appeal to USCA, cnsl notified. re appeal [245-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2003 257 CLERK'S NOTICE Status conference set for 10:30 12/8/03 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 11, 2003 RECEIVED Supplemental excerpts of recor submitted by defendant City of San Jose re: [245-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 11, 2003 RECEIVED Opening Brief submitted by defendant D. Newman, defendant William Manion, defendant Knox, defendant Carney, defendant Nieves re: [245-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 5, 2002 CERTIFICATE of Record mailed to USCA, counsel notified. [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 2, 2002 CERTIFICATE of Record mailed to USCA, counsel notified. [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
November 26, 2002 256 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Robert Linderman of document appeal [255-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
November 26, 2002 255 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form filed by defendant Robert Linderman for dates 4/22/02 and 5/28/02 ; C/R: Peter Torreano and Lee-Anne Shortridge; appeal [253-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
November 4, 2002 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 02-17132 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2002 Copy of notice of appeal and docket sheet to all counsel [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2002 Docket fee notification form and case information sheet to USCA [253-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 25, 2002 254 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by defendant Robert Linderman [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 25, 2002 253 INTERLOCUTORY NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant Robert Linderman from Dist. Court decision order [249-1], order [237-1] Fee status paid [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2002 CERTIFICATE of Record mailed to USCA, counsel notified. [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2002 252 NOTICE by defendant Robert Linderman [249-1] order [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2002 251 NOTICE by defendant Robert Linderman [237-1] order [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2002 250 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form filed requested by Michael R. Groves for dates 6/28/02 ; ; appeal [245-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lrb, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2002 249 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration [239-1] ( Date Entered: 9/30/02) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2002 248 MEMORANDUM by defendant Robert Linderman in support of motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration [239-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2002 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 02-16329 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2002 247 DECLARATION by Kate Dyer on behalf of Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of opposition [246-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2002 246 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels to motion for reconsideration order dated 7/24/01, on plaintiffs' application for leave to argue; to modify motion briefing schdule; and to schedule teleconference [167-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2002 Copy of notice of appeal and docket sheet to all counsel [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2002 Docket fee notification form and case information sheet to USCA [245-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2002 245 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by defendant City of San Jose, defendant Dacena, defendant D. Newman, defendant William Manion, defendant Knox, defendant Carney, defendant Messier, defendant Nieves, defendant Michael Fernandez from Dist. Court decision order [237-1] Fee status paid [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2002 244 AFFIDAVIT of Winifred Botha regarding motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration [239-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2002 243 MEMORANDUM by defendant Robert Linderman in support of motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration [239-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 26, 2002 242 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 5/28/02 ( C/R: Lee-Anne Shortridge) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 24, 2002 241 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel : brief will be filed no 6/27/02, opposition on 7/8/02 and reply on 7/15/02 (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2002 240 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration [239-1] ( Date Entered: 6/18/02) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2002 239 MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant Robert Linderman for leave to file a motion for reconsideration [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2002 238 MINUTES: ( C/R Lee-Anne Shortridge) ( Hearing Date: 5/28/02) that the motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity [216-1] is submitted [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
May 31, 2002 237 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity [216-1] ( Date Entered: 6/4/02) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 29, 2002 236 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 4/22/02 ( C/R: Peter Torreano) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2002 235 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel : dismissing with prejudice party City of Gilroy, party Roy Sumisaki, party Becerra, party Detective Ashley (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2002 234 RESPONSE by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels re objection [230-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 22, 2002 233 MINUTES: Motion for Qualified Immunity. The Court takes the matter under submission. ( C/R Peter Torreano) ( Hearing Date: 4/22/02) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 22, 2002 RECEIVED Stipulation and Proposed Order of dismissal of City of Gilroy defendants ( defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra ) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2002 232 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part motion for partial summary judgment pertaining to cliams of plaintiff San Jose chapter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club [195-1] ( Date Entered: 4/22/02) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 231 REPLY by defendant James Greer re opposition [225-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 230 OBJECTIONS by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer to evidence in or attached to the declaration [226-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 229 AFFIDAVIT of Winifred Botha in support of reply [228-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 228 REPLY by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer re opposition [225-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 227 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY by defendant City of San Jose to opposition [225-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2002 226 DECLARATION by Marc H. Axelbaum on behalf of Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of opposition [225-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2002 225 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels to motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity [216-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 224 MEMORANDUM by defendant City of San Jose in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 223 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Linderman in support of memorandum [222-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 222 MEMORANDUM by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer in support of motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity [216-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 221 AFFIDAVIT of Winifred Botha in support of motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity [216-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 220 DECLARATION by Mark A. Gonzalez on behalf of defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer in support of motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity [216-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 219 DECLARATION by James Greer on behalf of defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer in support of motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity [216-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 218 NOTICE by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer [217-1] memorandum [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 217 MEMORANDUM by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer in support of motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity [216-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 216 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer for summary judgment based on qualified immunity with Notice set for 4/29/02 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 28, 2002 215 Featured Case ORDER for relief from page limitation for defendant Sergeant Greer's memorandum in support of motion by Judge Jeremy Fogel ( Date Entered: 2/28/02) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 28, 2002 214 Featured Case ORDER for lelief from page limitation for defendant Linderman's memorandum in support of motion by Judge Jeremy Fogel ( Date Entered: 2/28/02) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2002 213 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel : setting hearing on motion for partial summary judgment pertaining to cliams of plaintiff San Jose chapter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club [195-1] 9:00 4/22/02 (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF) Modified on 02/28/2002
February 22, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order to continue motions for summary judgment and amended briefing schedule ( defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer ) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 13, 2002 212 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel re: briefing/hearing schedule (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 8, 2002 211 ADDENDUM filed by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer to affidavit [209-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order re: briefing/hearing schedule ( defendant San Jose Police, defendant The San Jose Police ) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2002 210 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer of affidavit [209-1], affidavit [208-1], brief [207-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 25, 2002 209 AFFIDAVIT of Aryn P. Harris in support of brief [207-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 25, 2002 208 AFFIDAVIT of Jorge Gil-Blanco in support of brief [207-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 25, 2002 207 FRURTHER BRIEFING pursuant to the Court's order of 1/15/02 by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant Mark Tracy [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 25, 2002 206 FURTHER BRIEFING IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels to motion for partial summary judgment pertaining to cliams of plaintiff San Jose chapter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club [195-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 15, 2002 205 Featured Case ORDER requesting further briefing re standing ot the SJC by Judge Jeremy Fogel ( Date Entered: 1/17/02) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 14, 2002 204 MINUTES: ( C/R Peter Torreano) ( Hearing Date: 1/14/02) that the motion for partial summary judgment pertaining to cliams of plaintiff San Jose chapter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club [195-1] is submitted [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 14, 2002 203 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting motion for partial summary judgment [180-1], denying motion for partial summary judgment [173-1] ( Date Entered: 1/14/02) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
January 2, 2002 202 REPLY by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer re opposition [199-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2001 201 DECLARATION by Marc H. Axelbaum on behalf of Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of opposition [199-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2001 200 DECLARATION by Jeffrey Pettigrew on behalf of Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of opposition [199-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2001 199 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels to motion for partial summary judgment pertaining to cliams of plaintiff San Jose chapter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club [195-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 21, 2001 198 JOINDER by defendant re motion for partial summary judgment [173-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lrb, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2001 197 AFFIDAVIT of Winifred Botha in support of motion for partial summary judgment pertaining to cliams of plaintiff San Jose chapter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club [195-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2001 196 MEMORANDUM by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer in support of motion for partial summary judgment pertaining to cliams of plaintiff San Jose chapter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club [195-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2001 195 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer for partial summary judgment pertaining to cliams of plaintiff San Jose chapter of the Hells Angels Motorcycle Club with Notice set for 1/14/02 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
December 5, 2001 194 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 18, 2001 193 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel : dismissing party Dennis Bacon, party M. Flood, party Robert Garcia, party Francisco Lopez, party Earl Pennington, party Lawrence St. Denis, party Mark Faler, party David Tomlinson, with prejudice; Each of the plaintiff's shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (cv, COURT STAFF)
October 18, 2001 192 MINUTES: ( C/R P. Torreano) ( Hearing Date: 10/15/01) filing of all qualified immunity issues is due by 2/11/02; motions by any dft re: Qualified Immunity issues set for 3/18/02 at 9:00. [5:99-cv-20022] (cv, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2001 RECEIVED Stipulation & Proposed Order ( defendant) for dismissal [5:99-cv-20022] (dhm, COURT STAFF)
September 25, 2001 191 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Agent Crkovich, defendant D. McCracken of order [187-2] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2001 190 DECLARATION by Kate Dyer on behalf of Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of opposition [189-1], in support of reply [189-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2001 189 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels to motion for partial summary judgment [180-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2001 189 REPLY by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of motion for partial summary judgment [170-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2001 188 REPLY by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels re opposition [185-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2001 187 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel : dismissing party M. LaPlant, party Agent Crkovich (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order of dismissal of Federal Defendants ( defendant Agent Crkovich, defendant M. LaPlant ) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 186 AFFIDAVIT of Jorge Gil-Blanco in support of motion for partial summary judgment [180-1], and in support of opposition [178-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 185 OPPOSITION by defendant City of San Jose and San Jose Police Officers to motion for partial summary judgment [173-1]; and joinder in County's opposition [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 184 AFFIDAVIT of Winifred Botha in support of motion for partial summary judgment [180-1], and in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [173-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 183 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Linderman in support of motion for partial summary judgment [180-1], and in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [173-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 182 MEMORANDUM by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [173-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 182 MEMORANDUM by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer in support of motion for partial summary judgment [180-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 181 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer in support of motion for partial summary judgment [180-1], and in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [173-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 180 CROSS-MOTION by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 10/1/01 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 179 OBJECTIONS by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer to evidence offered by plaintiffs in support of motion for partial summary judgment [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2001 178 OPPOSITION by defendant Robert Linderman, defendant James Greer to motion for partial summary judgment [173-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2001 177 Featured Case ORDER for relief from page limitation by Judge Jeremy Fogel ( Date Entered: 9/7/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2001 RECEIVED Ex Parte application for relief submitted by defendant Dennis Bacon, defendant Mark Faler, defendant M. Flood, defendant Robert Garcia, defendant James Greer, defendant Francisco Lopez, defendant Earl Pennington, defendant David Tomlinson, defendant Lawrence St. Denis [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2001 176 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 8/8/01 ( C/R: Peter Torreano) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2001 175 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 6/11/01 ( C/R: Peter Torreano) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2001 174 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff James Souza in support of motion for partial summary judgment [173-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2001 173 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by Plaintiff James Souza for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 10/1/01 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2001 172 DECLARATION by Marc H. Axelbaum on behalf of Plaintiff in support of motion for partial summary judgment [170-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2001 171 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff in support of motion for partial summary judgment [170-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2001 170 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by Plaintiff for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 10/1/01 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 6, 2001 169 Featured Case ORDER granting ex parte application to file reply brief in excess of 25 pages by Judge Jeremy Fogel ( Date Entered: 8/7/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 2, 2001 168 AFFIDAVIT of Winifred Botha in support of motion for reconsideration order dated 7/24/01, on plaintiffs' application for leave to argue; to modify motion briefing schdule; and to schedule teleconference [167-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
August 2, 2001 167 MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant Dennis Bacon, defendant Mark Faler, defendant M. Flood, defendant Robert Garcia, defendant James Greer, defendant Robert Linderman, defendant Francisco Lopez, defendant Earl Pennington, defendant Lawrence St. Denis, defendant David Tomlinson for reconsideration order dated 7/24/01, on plaintiffs' application for leave to argue; to modify motion briefing schdule; and to schedule teleconference [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2001 166 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion for leave to argue [161-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 25, 2001 165 OBJECTIONS by defendant City of San Jose to motion for leave to argue [161-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 25, 2001 164 REQUEST by defendant Santa Clara Police for the court and parties to take the City of Santa Clara defendants off of the proof of service [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 24, 2001 163 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting motion for leave to argue [161-1] ( Date Entered: 7/31/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 23, 2001 162 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting motion reply brief to exceed page limitation [146-1] ( Date Entered: 7/31/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 23, 2001 161 MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels for leave to argue [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 20, 2001 160 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant Dennis Bacon, defendant M. Flood, defendant Robert Garcia, defendant James Greer, defendant Francisco Lopez, defendant Earl Pennington, defendant Lawrence St. Denis, defendant David Tomlinson, defendant Mark Faler, defendant Robert Linderman for relief from local rule page limitation [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
July 13, 2001 159 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part motion for partial summary judgment [110-1], granting in part and denying in part motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] and deferring motions related to immunities ( Date Entered: 7/18/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 14, 2001 158 NOTICE by defendant Coffman, defendant R. Keyarts, defendant F. Saunders, defendant Santa Clara Police, [156-2] order [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 11, 2001 157 MINUTES: ( C/R Peter Torreano) ( Hearing Date: 6/11/01) In court law and motion hearing will be held 9:00 9/17/01 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2001 156 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel : granting motion to dismiss with prejudice of the Santa Clara defendants [155-1] dismissing party City of Santa Clara, Charles Arolla, Paul Kofman, Santa Clara Police, party Santa Clara Police, party F. Saunders, party R. Keyarts, party A. Zigon (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2001 155 MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant Santa Clara Police, defendant Santa Clara Police, defendant R. Keyarts, defendant F. Saunders, defendant A. Zigon, defendant Coffman to dismiss with prejudice of the Santa Clara defendants [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2001 154 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel dismissing party Hendrix, party C. Johnson, party P. Craft, party K. Pham, party E. Quan, party R. Imobertsteg, party M. Archer, party A. Paz, party P. Ramirez, party P. Cook, party T. Simpson, party S. Pryor, party King, party Lem, party Cusseaux, party Mizgorski, party Pedreira, party Kelly, party B. Harris, party Montano, party Barcelona, party Byers, party Thomas, party Almason, party M. Lane, party H. Langley, party Cahill, party Lofvendahl, party Keith Lowry, party Patrice Cardott, party Shirley Shelangoski, party Bob Hamilton, party Tom Johnson, party Kevin Smith, party Sharron Mouras, party Bob Traskowski, party Don Van Gundy, party G. Cunningham, party J. Cole, party D. Notari, party J. Mollo, party T. Murphy, party B. Lucich, party R. Bynum, party Dan Corley, party G. Longoria, party Patricia O'Donovan, party A. Holborn, party F. Hernandez, party Jim Lewis, party Richard Rutman, party J. Officer Kropp, party Dan Bouchet, party Agent Gaztambide, party Sung Agent Maeng, party R. Martinez, party P. Stokes, party D. Amrhein, party Tuan Payton, party FBI Alvarez , ( Date Entered: 6/8/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
June 1, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order re: dismissal of parties and identification of Doe defendants ( Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels ) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2001 153 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting motion reply brief to exceed page limitation [146-1] ( Date Entered: 5/3/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2001 151 REPLY by defendant City of San Jose re opposition [131-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2001 150 DECLARATION by Mark A. Gonzalez in support of memorandum [149-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2001 149 COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM in support of reply [148-1], of reply [147-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2001 148 REPLY by Plaintiff Gregory Wilkins, Plaintiff Denise Wilkins in support of motion for partial summary judgment [110-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2001 147 PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED REPLY by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2001 152 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant City of Gilroy of order re: to file under seal [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2001 146 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels reply brief to exceed page limitation [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra ) re: motion for partial summary judgment [110-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2001 145 AUTHORITIES CITED to by Westlaw Citation by defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra [142-1] in support of opposition memorandum [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2001 144 DECLARATION by Corporal Kurt Ashley on behalf of defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra in support of opposition memorandum [142-1] (FILED UNDER SEAL) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2001 143 DECLARATION by Kenneth D. Simoncini on behalf of defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra in support of opposition memorandum [142-1] (FILED UNDER SEAL) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2001 142 MEMORANDUM by defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [110-1] (FILED UNDER SEAL) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2001 141 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting motion to file documents under seal [138-1] ( Date Entered: 4/26/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2001 140 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra of declaration [139-1], motion to file documents under seal [138-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2001 139 DECLARATION by Marlilynn Winters on behalf of defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra in support of motion to file documents under seal [138-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2001 138 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant City of Gilroy, defendant Roy Sumisaki, defendant Detective Ashley, defendant Becerra to file documents under seal [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 137 OPPOSITION by defendant San Jose Police, defendant The San Jose Police to motion for partial summary judgment [110-1], motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 136 JOINDER by defendant re motion for summary adjudication [121-1], opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [110-1], opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 135 AFFIDAVIT of Mark A. Gonzalez in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [110-1], regarding motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 134 PARTIAL OPPOSITION by defendant to motion for partial summary judgment [110-1], motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 133 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion for partial summary judgment [110-1], motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 132 DECLARATION by Marc H. Axelbaum on behalf of Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of opposition [131-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 131 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels to motion for summary adjudication [117-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 130 DECLARATION by Kate Dyer on behalf of Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of opposition [129-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2001 129 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels to motion for summary adjudication [121-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2001 128 JOINDER by defendant City of San Jose re motion for summary adjudication [121-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2001 127 JOINDER in Santa Clara Countyt defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by defendant City of San Jose [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 6, 2001 126 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant City of San Jose, defendant San Jose Police Dept of order [125-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 3, 2001 125 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting motion to extend page limit [116-1] ( Date Entered: 4/5/01) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 124 AFFIDAVIT of Winifred Botha regarding motion for summary adjudication [121-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 123 AFFIDAVIT of Sergeant Robert C. Linderman regarding motion for summary adjudication [121-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 122 MEMORANDUM by defendant Santa Clara Co. in support of motion for summary adjudication [121-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant Santa Clara Co. for summary adjudication with Notice set for 5/7/01 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 120 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant for relief from page limitation [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 119 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant City of San Jose of declaration [118-1], motion for summary adjudication [117-1], order received [0-0], motion to extend page limit [116-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 118 DECLARATION by Michael R. Groves on behalf of defendant City of San Jose, defendant Jorge Gil-Blanco re motion for summary adjudication [117-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 117 MOTION with memorandum in support before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant City of San Jose for summary adjudication with Notice set for 5/7/01 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant City of San Jose ) re: motion to extend page limit [116-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 116 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by defendant City of San Jose to extend page limit [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 115 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels, Plaintiff Gregory Wilkins, Plaintiff Denise Wilkins of order received [0-0], declaration [114-1], declaration [113-1], declaration [112-1], memorandum [111-1], motion for partial summary judgment [110-1], order received [0-0], declaration [109-1], memorandum [108-1], motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Gregory Wilkins, Plaintiff Denise Wilkins ) re: motion for partial summary judgment [110-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 114 DECLARATION by Gregory Wilkins on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Wilkins, Plaintiff Denise Wilkins in support of motion for partial summary judgment [110-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 113 DECLARATION by Denise Wilkins on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Wilkins, Plaintiff Denise Wilkins in support of motion for partial summary judgment [110-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 112 DECLARATION by Kate Dyer on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Wilkins, Plaintiff Denise Wilkins in support of motion for partial summary judgment [110-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 111 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Gregory Wilkins, Plaintiff Denise Wilkins in support of motion for partial summary judgment [110-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by Plaintiff Gregory Wilkins, Plaintiff Denise Wilkins for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 5/7/01 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels ) re: motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 109 DECLARATION by Kate Dyer on behalf of Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 108 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels in support of motion for partial summary judgment [107-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2001 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Jeremy Fogel by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 5/7/01 at 9:00 [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2001 106 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel re : briefing/hearing schedule (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order re: briefing/hearing schedule ( defendant City of San Jose, defendant San Jose Police Dept ) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2001 105 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant FBI Alvarez, defendant D. McCracken, defendant Agent Crkovich, defendant Agent Gaztambide, defendant M. LaPlant, defendant Sung Agent Maeng, defendant R. Martinez, defendant Tuan Payton, defendant P. Stokes of order [104-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 15, 2001 104 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel re: briefinghearing schedule (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 12, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order re: (briefing/hearing schedule ) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
February 12, 2001 103 LETTER dated 2/12/01 from Alison E. Daw [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2000 102 MINUTES: ( C/R Peter Torreano) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. law and motion hearing date 9:00 3/26/01 ; In court law and motion hearing will be held 9:00 4/30/01 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2000 101 NOTICE of Attorney list by Plaintiff [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2000 100 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and PROPOSED ORDER filed. [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 20, 2000 99 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 9/12/00 ( C/R: George Palmer) [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
October 11, 2000 98 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10:30 11/20/00 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 29, 2000 97 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating as counsel for by defendant FBI Alvarez, defendant D. Amrhein, defendant Agent Crkovich, defendant Agent Gaztambide, defendant M. LaPlant, defendant Sung Agent Maeng, defendant R. Martinez, defendant Tuan Payton, defendant M. LaPlant, defendant P. Stokes and substituting attorney Alison E. Daw [5:99-cv-20022] (gm, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 2000 95 Featured Case ORDER by Executive Committee to reassign to Judge Jeremy Fogel ( Date Entered: 9/27/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 19, 2000 96 Featured Case ORDER by Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying motion for protective order [81-1] for protective order ( Date Entered: 9/27/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 13, 2000 94 MINUTES: ( C/R E/R George Palmer;Tape #076) ( Hearing Date: 9/12/00) that the motion for protective order [81-1] is submitted [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 11, 2000 93 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams recusing ( Date Entered: 9/12/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 5, 2000 92 REPLY by Plaintiff to opposition to motion for protective order [81-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 1, 2000 91 Featured Case ORDER by Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting motion to compel production of documents [66-1] ( Date Entered: 9/7/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2000 90 OPPOSITION by defendant P. Stokes, defendant D. Amrhein, defendant M. LaPlant & Federal Defendants to motion for protective order [81-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2000 89 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by defendant Santa Clara Co. in opposition to motion for protective order [81-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2000 88 SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION by defendant City of San Jose to motion for protective order [81-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2000 87 OPPOSITION by defendant City of Gilroy to motion for protective order [81-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2000 86 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by defendant Almason, defendant M. Lane, defendant H. Langley, defendant Cahill, defendant Lofvendahl, defendant Keith Lowry, defendant Patrice Cardott in opposition to motion for protective order [81-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 16, 2000 84 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff of motion for protective order [81-1] - 83 & proposed order [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 16, 2000 83 DECLARATION by Karen L. Snell on behalf of Plaintiff re motion for protective order [81-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 16, 2000 82 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff in support of motion for protective order [81-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 16, 2000 81 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull by Plaintiff for protective order [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2000 80 Featured Case ORDER by Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part motion to compel production of documents [66-1] ( Date Entered: 8/17/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 10, 2000 85 Featured Case INTERIM ORDER by Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull setting hearing on memorandum [74-1] 11:00 a.m. on 9/12/00, setting hearing on memorandum [73-1] 11:00 a.m. 9/12/00 setting hearing on motion for protective order [81-1] 11:00 a.m. on 9/12/00; Plaintiffs may submit a reply brief no later than 9/5/00. ( Date Entered: (8/23/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (mmr, COURT STAFF)
August 8, 2000 79 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams : for protective order (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 8, 2000 78 OPPOSITION by defendant, City of San Jose to motion for protective order [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 8, 2000 77 OPPOSITION by defendant re: protective order [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 8, 2000 76 OPPOSITION by defendant, Santa Clara Co. to mtoion re: protective order & joinder in opposing points of other defendants [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 8, 2000 75 REPLY by defendant's FBI to motion re: protective order [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 7, 2000 74 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff in support of memorandum [73-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 7, 2000 73 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff in support of protective order [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 2, 2000 72 DECLARATION by Lt. J. Kirby on behalf of defendant Santa Clara Co. re opposition [69-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 2, 2000 71 DECLARATION by Sgt. K. Jensen on behalf of defendant Santa Clara Co. re opposition [69-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 2, 2000 70 DECLARATION by Lt. E. Smedlund on behalf of defendant Santa Clara Co. re opposition [69-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 2, 2000 69 OPPOSITION by defendant Santa Clara Co. to motion to compel production of documents [66-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2000 68 DECLARATION by Karen L. Snell on behalf of Plaintiff re motion to compel production of documents [66-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2000 67 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff in support of motion to compel production of documents [66-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2000 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull by Plaintiff to compel production of documents [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
June 29, 2000 65 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams : amending 3nd amended complaint re: paragraph 80 (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2000 64 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams Status conference set for 2:00 - 4:00 by telephone on 10/19/00 ; ( Date Entered: 6/26/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
May 10, 2000 63 ANSWER by defendant A. Zigon, defendant Santa Clara Police, defendant Coffman, defendant R. Keyarts, defendant F. Saunders to THIRD AMENDED complaint [54-1]; jury demand [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
March 9, 2000 62 NOTICE by defendant's of reassignment of attorney [5:99-cv-20022] (cm, COURT STAFF)
March 2, 2000 61 ANSWER by defendant Agent Gaztambide, defendant Agent Crkovich, defendant Sung Agent Maeng, defendant R. Martinez, defendant P. Stokes, defendant D. Amrhein, defendant M. LaPlant, defendant Tuan Payton, defendant FBI Alvarez to; jury demand [5:99-cv-20022] (cm, COURT STAFF)
February 29, 2000 60 ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT by defendant Byers, defendant Thomas, defendant Almason, defendant M. Lane, defendant H. Langley, defendant Cahill, defendant Charles Gillingham [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
February 17, 2000 59 ANSWER TO 3ND AMENDED COMPLAINT by defendant J. Officer Kropp, defendant Dan Bouchet to; jury demand [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
February 17, 2000 58 ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT by defendant City of Gilroy to; jury demand [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2000 57 ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT by defendants to complaint [54-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2000 56 ANSWER to 3RD AMENDED complaint [54-1]; jury demand [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
January 18, 2000 55 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of Scheduling order Status conference set for 2:00 - 4:00 p.m. by telephone on 1/13/00 ; [51-1], order [51-2] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
January 14, 2000 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff; jury demand terminating defendant D. McCracken, defendant Lou Cobarruviaz, defendant William Lansdowne, Plaintiff Christine Pettigrew [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
January 13, 2000 53 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams granting filing of 3rd amending complaint ( Date Entered: 1/24/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
January 6, 2000 52 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed. [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
January 3, 2000 51 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams : Status conference set for 2:00 - 4:00 p.m. by telephone on 1/13/00 ; (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
December 9, 1999 49 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams Case Management Conference set for 2:00 and 4:00 p.m. by telephone on 1/6/00 ; ( Date Entered: 1/5/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (cm, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 1999 50 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams granting in part and denying in part motion to dismiss action [25-1], granting in part and denying in part motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [24-1], granting in part and denying in part motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [23-1], granting in part and denying in part motion to dismiss partially dismiss action [21-1], granting in part and denying in part motion to dismiss action [16-1] ( Date Entered: 1/5/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (cm, COURT STAFF)
December 2, 1999 48 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams Case Management Conference set for 2:00 p.m. and 4:00 p.m. by telephone on 12/16/99 ; ( Date Entered: 1/5/00) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (cm, COURT STAFF)
November 15, 1999 47 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams Status conference continued at 2:00 - 4:00 p.m. by telephone on 12/8/99 ; ( Date Entered: 12/8/99) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
October 5, 1999 46 MINUTES: ( C/R Roberta Roger (415) 863-4211) ( Hearing Date: 10/5/99) that the motion to dismiss action [25-1] is submitted, that the motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [24-1] is submitted, that the motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [23-1] is submitted, that the motion to dismiss partially dismiss action [21-1] is submitted, that the motion to dismiss action [16-1] is submitted [5:99-cv-20022] (ri, COURT STAFF)
October 4, 1999 45 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams re: plaintiff's submit a chart identifying with particularity what actions were taken by each of the named. ( Date Entered: 10/22/99) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (ri, COURT STAFF)
September 30, 1999 44 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant City of Gilroy of reply [43-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 30, 1999 43 REPLY by defendant City of Gilroy re motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [24-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 30, 1999 Docket Modification (Administrative) to notice [40-1] withdrawing attorney Mark St. Angelo for FBI Alvarez, attorney Mark St. Angelo for Tuan Payton, attorney Mark St. Angelo for M. LaPlant, attorney Mark St. Angelo for R. Martinez, attorney Mark St. Angelo for Sung Agent Maeng, attorney Mark St. Angelo for Agent Crkovich, attorney Mark St. Angelo for Agent Gaztambide and substituting attorney Mary Beth Uitti [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 1999 42 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant City of Gilroy of motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [24-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 1999 41 REPLY by defendants' for the State to plaintiffs' opposition to motion to dismiss or for more definite statement [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 1999 40 NOTICE by defendant re: Lead counsel [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 1999 39 REPLY by defendant re motion to dismiss action [25-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 15, 1999 38 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST by defendant for Judicial notice in support of #37 [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 15, 1999 37 REPLY by defendant re motion to dismiss action [16-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 14, 1999 36 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams setting hearing on motion to dismiss action [25-1] 10:00 10/5/99, setting hearing on motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [24-1] 10:00 10/5/99, setting hearing on motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [23-1] 10:00 10/5/99, setting hearing on motion to dismiss partially dismiss action [21-1] 10:00 10/5/99, setting hearing on motion to dismiss action [16-1] 10:00 10/5/99 ( Date Entered: 9/30/99) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 1999 35 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff of opposition [29-1] - 34 [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 1999 34 DECLARATION by Karen Snell on behalf of Plaintiff re opposition [33-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 1999 33 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff to motion to dismiss action [16-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 1999 32 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff to motion to dismiss partially dismiss action [21-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 1999 31 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff to motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [23-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 1999 30 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff to motion to dismiss action [25-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 1999 29 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff to motion to dismiss 2nd amended complaint [24-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
September 7, 1999 28 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of order [27-2] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 1999 27 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams : All motions will be heard by 10:00 9/29/99 ; (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 27, 1999 26 CLERK'S NOTICE All motions re: defendant's motion to dismiss will be heard by 10:00 9/29/99 ; [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 23, 1999 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Senior Judge Spencer Williams by defendant Agent Gaztambide, defendant Agent Crkovich, defendant Sung Agent Maeng, defendant R. Martinez, defendant D. McCracken, defendant M. LaPlant, defendant Tuan Payton, defendant FBI Alvarez to dismiss action with Notice set for 9/29/99 @ 10:00 a.m. [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 20, 1999 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Senior Judge Spencer Williams by defendant City of Gilroy to dismiss 2nd amended complaint with Notice set for 9/29/99 @ 10:00 a.m. [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 1999 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Senior Judge Spencer Williams by defendant J. Officer Kropp, defendant Dan Agent Bouchet to dismiss 2nd amended complaint with Notice set for 9/29/99 @ 10:00 a.m. [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 1999 22 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of memorandum [20-1] & 21 [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 1999 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Senior Judge Spencer Williams by defendant to dismiss partially dismiss action with Notice set for 9/29/99 @ 10:00 a.m. [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 1999 20 MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to dismiss action [16-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 1999 19 REQUEST by defendant for Judicial notice in support of #16 [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 1999 18 DECLARATION by K. Zoglin on behalf of defendant re motion to dismiss action [16-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 1999 17 MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to dismiss action [16-1] [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 1999 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Senior Judge Spencer Williams by defendant to dismiss action & to strike 2nd amended complaint with Notice set for 9/29/99 @ 10:00 a.m. [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
June 29, 1999 15 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams Discovery cutoff (magistrate) 8/2/99 ; Status conference set for 2:00 - 4:00 p.m., by telephone 11/18/99 ; ( Date Entered: 7/8/99) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
June 23, 1999 14 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT [6-1] by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels; jury demand; adding A. Zigon, Detective Ashley [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
June 21, 1999 13 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams : granting amending complaint (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
June 16, 1999 12 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and PROPOSED ORDER filed. [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 1999 11 CERTIFICATION of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff. [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 1999 10 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams : extending time to reply (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 1999 9 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams not relating cases; as to C-99-1512 VRW & C-99-1465 CRB () (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 1999 8 Featured Case AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams Status conference set for 2:00 - 4:00 p.m., by telephone on 6/24/99 ; ( Date Entered: 5/24/99) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 1999 7 LETTER dated 4/9/99 from Karen L. Snell [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 1999 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by Plaintiff; jury demand [5:99-cv-20022] (lmm, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 1999 5 Featured Case ORDER by Senior Judge Spencer Williams re [2-1] re [4-1] unsealing ( Date Entered: 1/15/99) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20022] (ha, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 1999 4 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Senior Judge Spencer Williams by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels, et al to unseal [5:99-cv-20022] (ha, COURT STAFF)
January 11, 1999 3 Featured Case ORDER RE COURT PROCEDURE and SCHEDULE by Senior Judge Spencer Williams : Proof of service to be filed by 2/25/99 ; counsels' case management statement to be filed by 5/3/99 ; initial case management conference will be held 2:00 5/13/99 . (cc: all counsel) (ha, COURT STAFF)
January 11, 1999 2 EX-PARTE APPLICATION by Plaintiff SJ Char Hells Angels, et al to seal [5:99-cv-20022] (ha, COURT STAFF)
January 11, 1999 1 COMPLAINT No Process; Fee status pd entered on 1/11/99 in the amount of $ 150.00 ( Receipt No. 506434); jury demand [5:99-cv-20022] (ha, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SJ Char Hells Angels, et al v. City of San Jose, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?