Jones v. Cunningham, et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Wayne Jones
Defendant: J. Cunningham, E. Moore, J.J. Hughes and W. Faulkner
Case Number: 5:1999cv20023
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/22/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER vacating writ/transport order. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/14/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 WRIT of ad testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/17/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT FAULKNER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE A SECOND DEPOSITION by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying 147 Motion to Take Deposition from Rodney Wayne Jones (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE A SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO RULE 30(a)(2)(B) re 159 Stipulation filed by W. Faulkner. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 13, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Appointing Counsel, Attorney Sara T Wickware & Lien Dang for Rodney Wayne Jones added. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Referring Case to Federal Prisoner Pro Bono Project. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/24/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Cunningham, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Wayne Jones
Represented By: Kim-Lien Thi Dang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cunningham
Represented By: Scott John Feudale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Moore
Represented By: Scott John Feudale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.J. Hughes
Represented By: Scott John Feudale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Faulkner
Represented By: Dolores M. Donohoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?