Hewlett Packard Co, et al v. ACE Property & Cas, et al

Plaintiff: Hewlett-Packard Company
Defendant: Cigna Property & Casualty Insurance Company and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Special_master: Peter G. Stone
Case Number: 5:1999cv20207
Filed: March 10, 1999
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2011 674 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUPERSEDEAS BOND No. 2435106 to Stay of enforcement of December 15, 2010 Judgment against HP pending appeal re 670 Docket Annotation filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
November 12, 2010 647 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT SETTING JOINT HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR REIMBURSEMENT re 646 Stipulation. Opposition due by 11/22/2010. Reply due by 11/29/2010. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
August 19, 2010 635 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Upon review of the parties' Thirteenth Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement, the Court finds that a conference is not necessary at this time. The Court will issue a judgment consistent with the Ninth Circuit remand pending the resolution of Defendant's Motion. The parties shall comply with the Civil Local Rules of Court in briefing Defendant's Motion. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the August 24 Case Management Conference. *** CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/18/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
July 16, 2010 626 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 625 USCA Memorandum. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2010. The Statement shall include, among other things, the parties' position with respect to the next stage of the litigation in light of the remand, and a proposed schedule to advance the case. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
November 25, 2008 612 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ENFORCEMENT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION re 611 Stipulation, 610 Motion to Quash. The enforcement of the Writ is STAYED untilafter the entry of an Order by the Court granting or denying HPs motion to quash the Writ. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewlett Packard Co, et al v. ACE Property & Cas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan E. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven H. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Peter G. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: David A. Gauntlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?