Bell v. Vasquez, et al

Petitioner: Ronald L. Bell
Respondent: Jeanne S. Woodford and Michael Martel
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 5:1999cv20615
Filed: April 12, 1991
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Referring Judge: DPLC VG
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2014 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PROVIDE COPIES OF PETITIONER'S MEDICAL AND PSYCHIATIC RECORDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/28/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
February 18, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate. Case is Referred to Magistrate Judge Beeler for a Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/18/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
September 30, 2013 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The parties are directed to file within 45 days a joint statement outlining how the case should be handled. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/30/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 28, 2012 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 207 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply With Court's Orders. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
June 19, 2012 215 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 212 Re: Petitioner's Administrative Motion to File and Maintain Exhibit D to Counsel's Declaration in Support of Petitioner's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dimsiss Under Seal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/19/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
February 14, 2012 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Time for Filing Opposition and Reply i Relation to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute. Motion Hearing set or 3/9/2012 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/10/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Vasquez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald L. Bell
Represented By: Roger William Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne S. Woodford
Represented By: Ronald Stephen Matthias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Martel
Represented By: Ronald Stephen Matthias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?