Litmon v. Santa Clara County, et al

Case Number: 5:2000cv20345
Filed: March 28, 2000
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2010 168 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 167 for Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/14/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
August 11, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 158 Continuing Further Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/11/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
January 15, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Counsel and Setting Case Management Conference: Attorney Catherine B. Tyler for David Litmon, Jr added. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2009 10:30 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due 3/6/2009. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/13/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
October 20, 2008 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to Federal Pro Bono Project; Instructions to Clerk. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
September 30, 2008 138 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/29/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 23, 2008 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 135 Excusing Defendants From Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/23/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008) Modified text on 9/25/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Litmon v. Santa Clara County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?