Hyundai Electronics, et al v. Rambus, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd and Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH
Defendant: Rambus, Inc.
Movant: Reed Elsevier, Inc., Mosaid Technologies Incorporated, Micron Technology Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics, Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Nanya Technology Corporation and Nanya Technology Corporation U.S.A.
Intervenor: Elpida Memory, Inc. and United States of America
Miscellaneous: NVIDIA Corporation
Case Number: 5:2000cv20905
Filed: August 29, 2000
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 4256 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 4255 of Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 1, 2013 4255 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal re 4254 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 7/1/2013) Modified on 7/23/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2013 4254 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference (Date Filed: 6/10/2013). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/10/2013)
May 28, 2013 4253 [CORRECTED] DECLARATION OF JEFFREY Y. WU SUPPORTING IN PART SK HYNIXS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 AND 79-5(D) AND GENERAL ORDER NO. 62 re 4248 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2013 4252 *** Docketed in Error. Please Disregard. See 4253 *** DECLARATION OF JEFFREY Y. WU SUPPORTING IN PART SK HYNIXS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 AND 79-5(D) AND GENERAL ORDER NO. 62 re 4248 filed by Rambus, Inc. 4251 ) (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2013 4251 BRIEF SUPPORTING IN PART SK HYNIXS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 AND 79-5(D) AND GENERAL ORDER NO. 62 re 4248 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2013 4250 Brief re 4249 Proposed Order, 4244 Order, Rambus Inc.'s Brief In Support Of Its Proposed Final Judgment Submitted Pursuant To The Court's May 8, 2013 Order filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 4249 , 4244 ) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 4249 Proposed Order re 4244 Order, Rambus Inc's [Proposed] Final Judgment by Rambus, Inc.. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 4248 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 AND 79-5(d) AND GENERAL ORDER NO. 62 filed by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Roeder, Susan) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 4247 Statement in Response to Order redacting in part Order dated May 8, 2013 re 4245 by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 4246 Statement Pursuant to Order Redacting In Part Order Issued May 8, 2013 re 4245 by Rambus, Inc. (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 4245 Featured Case ORDER Redacting in Part Order Issued May 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/8/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 4244 Featured Case REDACTED ORDER (1) Denying SK Hynix's Motions for Summary Judgment, For a New Trial or a Stay, and for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply to Rambus's Amended Counterclaim; (2) Granting in Part Rambus's Motion to Amend the Court's FFCL; and (3) Imposing Sanction Against Rambus for Spoliation of Evidence. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/8/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
February 27, 2013 4243 CLERKS NOTICE - COUNSEL IS ADVISED that all pending motions heard on 12/19/2012 - Docket Entries 4164 ; 4165 ; 4166 ; 4174 and 4238 noticed for hearing on 3/1/2013 are hereby submitted on the papers without further oral argument from the parties. The 3/1/2013 hearing date is hereby vacated. /s/ Jackie Lynn Garcia - Court Clerk. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.***(jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 25, 2013 4242 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Delaware Court entry of Judgment from Gregory P. Stone (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Rule 54(b) Judgment in Delaware case, # 2 Exhibit B - Recent docket entries in Delaware case) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 2/25/2013) Modified on 2/26/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2013 4241 OPPOSITION TO SK HYNIXS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF UN-ENFORCEABILITY BASED ON COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL re 4238 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2013 4240 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE TO SK HYNIX'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF UNENFORCEABILITY BASED ON THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF THE JANUARY 2, 2013 DECISION OF THE DELAWARE DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 25, 2013 4239 Letter to Judge Whyte Re Status of Delaware Proceeding from Gregory P. Stone (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1/17/2013 Joint Status Report in Micron v. Rambus, # 2 Exhibit 1/23/2013 Transcript in Micron v. Rambus, # 3 Exhibit 1/24/2013 Order in Micron v. Rambus) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/25/2013) Modified on 1/25/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2013 4238 Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Un-enforceability Based on Collateral Estoppel Effect of January 2, 2013 Decision of Delaware District Court filed by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 2/8/2013. Replies due by 2/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth L. Nissly, # 2 Exhibit A to Nissly Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Nissly Declaration, # 4 (Proposed) Order)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/25/2013) Modified on 1/25/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2013 4237 Letter to Judge Whyte Providing Update on Delware Proceeding from Gregory P. Stone (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A: 1/8/2013 Order in Micron v. Rambus) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/14/2013) Text modified on 1/15/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 4236 BRIEF REGARDING AVAILABILITY OF REEXAMINATION FOR RAMBUSS CLAIMS-IN-SUIT filed by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Kenneth L. Nissly, # 2 Exhibit A - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J - To K. Nissly Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K - To K. Nissly Declaration)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Text modified on 1/14/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 4235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Van Keulen, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/14/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 4234 Supplemental Brief Re Re-examination Proceedings filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/14/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 4233 Declaration of Steven M. Perry in Support of Regarding Redactions to the Sealed Portion of the Transcript of the December 19, 2012 Hearing re 4232 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/14/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 4232 Brief Regarding Redactions to the Sealed Portion of the Transcript of the December 19, 2012 Hearing filed byRambus, Inc. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/14/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 4231 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding enclosure of copies of the demonstratives counsel for SK Hynix used during the December 19, 2012 hearing from Susan van Keulen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A, # 2 Exhibit-B (Underseal))(van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Text modified on 1/11/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 4230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Van Keulen In Support Of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , # 2 (Proposed) Order granting Administrative Motion) (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Text modified on 1/11/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2013 4229 Letter to Judge Whyte Re Judge Robinson's Decision from Kenneth L. Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/2/2013) Modified on 1/3/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2012 4228 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Following Up on Hearing Held on December 19, 2012 from Gregory P. Stone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A: Slides re Hynix's Motions, # 2 Exhibit-B: Slides re Sanctions and RAND Issue)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/26/2012) Modified on 1/2/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2012 4227 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/19/2012, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2013. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 19, 2012 4226 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2012 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 12/19/2012) re 4164 MOTION for Summary Judgment Or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Collateral Estoppel Effect of Reexaminations of Rambus's Patents; Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support Thereof, 4166 MOTION for New Trial , OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, 4174 MOTION to Amend/Correct 4160 Order Rambus Inc.'s Motion to Amend Findings Under F.R.C.P. 52(b) filed by Rambus, Inc., 4165 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 4225 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4223 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Hammer) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 12/18/2012) Modified on 12/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2012 4224 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4198 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Regarding the Court's Determination of a RAND Rate Pursuant to its 9/21/2012 Order. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 4223 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 4222 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4217 Motion for Entry of Equipment in the Courtroom. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 17, 2012 4221 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding December 14, 2012 Order from Steven M. Perry (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 12/17/2012) Modified on 12/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2012 4220 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 4221 . *** Letter to Judge Whyte in Response to December 14, 2012 Order from Steven M. Perry (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 12/17/2012) Modified on 12/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/18/2012 (wv, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2012 4219 Letter to Judge Whyte re Court's Request of December 14, 2012 filed by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc(fka Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc), SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 12/17/2012) Modified on 12/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2012 4218 Featured Case ORDER Re: Hearing to be Conducted on 12/19/2012. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/14/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 4217 Administrative Request for Entry of Equipment in the Courtroom filed by Rambus, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 12/28/2012. Replies due by 1/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/14/2012) Modified on 12/14/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2012 4216 Letter to Judge Whyte in response to Mr. Nissly's Dec. 10, 2012 letter from Gregory P. Stone (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/11/2012) Modified on 12/11/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2012 4215 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Scheduling Proposal Related to Hearing on December 19, 2012 from Kenneth L. Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/10/2012) Modified on 12/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2012 4214 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING THE COURTS DETERMINATION OF A RAND RATE PURSUANT TO ITS SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 ORDER re 4198 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 12/10/2012) Text modified on 12/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2012 4213 THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF: (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF REEXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MOTION TO STAY re 4164 , 4196 , 4165 filed bySK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 12/10/2012) Modified on 12/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2012 4212 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF: (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF REEXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MOTION TO STAY re 4164 , 4166 , [4165 ] filed by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth L. Nissly in Support of Second Supplemental Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A to Nissly Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Nissly Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Nissly Declaration) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/10/2012) Modified on 12/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2012 4211 Response to Hynix's Objections to the Declaration of Brian M. Hammer (re 4184 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 12/10/2012) Modified on 12/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2012 4210 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4206 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/10/2012) Modified on 12/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2012 4209 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4204 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by SK Hynix Deutschland GmbH, SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix U.K. Limited, SK Hynix, Inc. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/6/2012) Modified on 12/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2012 4208 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4205 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 12/6/2012) Modified on 12/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2012 Remarks:Clerk made changes re plaintiffs and Caption Title as to Order 4203 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 5, 2012 4207 CLERKS NOTICE - COUNSEL ARE ADVISED that on September 21, 2012, the court directed the parties to submit supplemental briefing with respect to the appropriate sanction for Rambus's spoliation of evidence. The court indicated that it would advise the parties whether the matter would be set for hearing or submitted on the briefs. The matter is hereby set for hearing on December 19, 2012 at 2:00 pm. /s/ Jackie Lynn Garcia (CourtStaff). Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 5, 2012 4206 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4191 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 5, 2012 4205 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4177 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 5, 2012 4204 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 5, 2012 4203 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4161 Motion to Modify Case Caption to Reflect Corporate Name Changes. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 5, 2012 4202 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4192 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Rambus's Brief Regarding the Court's Determination of a RAND Rate Pusuant to its 9/21/2012 Order. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 4, 2012 4201 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF REEXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MOTION TO STAY re 4164 , 4165 filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice) (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2012 4200 HYNIXS CONSOLIDATED REPLY ON (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF REEXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR STAY; AND (3) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO RAMBUSS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM re 4164 , 4166], , 4165 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2012 4199 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO AMEND FINDINGS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 52(b) (re 4174 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/4/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2012 4198 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Regarding the Court's Determination of a Rand Rate Pursuant to Its September 21, 2012 Order filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 (Proposed) Order) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 11/30/2012) Modified on 12/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2012 4197 RESPONSE TO RAMBUSS OPPOSITION TO SK HYNIXS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY TO RAMBUSS BRIEF REGARDING THE COURTS DETERMINATION OF A RAND RATE PURSUANT TO ITS SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 ORDER re 4192 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/27/2012) Modified on 11/28/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2012 4196 OPPOSITION TO HYNIXS APPLICATION UNDER L.R. 7-11 FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ADDITIONAL BRIEF ON RAND ISSUES re 4192 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A: Declaration of Rollin Ransom, # 2 (Proposed) Order Denying Hynix's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Additional Brief)(Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/26/2012) Modified on 11/27/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 4195 OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. HAMMER IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUSS BRIEF REGARDING THE COURTS DETERMINATION OF A RAND RATE PURSUANT TO ITS SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 ORDER re 4184 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/20/2012) Modified on 11/26/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 4194 DECLARATION OF JEFFREY Y. WU IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS INC.S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO (1) HYNIXS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF REEXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) HYNIXS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR STAY; (3) HYNIXS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re 4193 Support of Consolidated Opposition to Hynix Motions filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through I, # 2 Exhibits J through O, # 3 Exhibits P through T, # 4 Exhibits U through DD)((Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/20/2012) Modified on 11/26/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 4193 RAMBUS INC.S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO (1) HYNIXS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF REEXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) HYNIXS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR STAY; (3) HYNIXS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re 4164 , 4166 , 4165 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 11/20/2012) Modified on 11/26/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 4192 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY TO RAMBUSS BRIEF REGARDING THE COURTS DETERMINATION OF A RAND RATE PURSUANT TO ITS SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 ORDER filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Exhibit A to Administrative Motion for Leave to File Reply - # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/20/2012) Modified on 11/26/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 4191 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Roeder in Support of Motion to File Under Seal Document, # 2 (Proposed) Order)( Roeder, Susan) (Filed on 11/20/2012) Modified on 11/26/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 4190 OPPOSITION TO RAMBUS INC.S MOTION TO AMEND FINDINGS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 52(b) re 4174 filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/20/2012) Modified on 11/26/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 4189 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 4188 Permitting a Consolidated Opposition to Hynix's Motions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/20/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 16, 2012 4188 STIPULATION and (ROPOSED) ORDER Permitting a Consolidated Opposition toHynix's Motions re 4187 , 4164 , 4166 , 4165 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/16/2012) Modified on 11/19/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2012 4187 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Adjusting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date re 4173 Adjusting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4165 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF , 4164 MOTION for Summary Judgment r, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Collateral Estoppel Effect of Reexaminations of Rambus's Patents; Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support Thereof 4166 MOTION for New Trial OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/15/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012) Modified on 11/16/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2012 4186 PROOF OF SERVICE BY EMAIL re 4182 Brief, 4183 Declaration in Support, 4184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Rambus, Inc (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 11/14/2012) Modified on 11/14/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2012 4185 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MESSENGER re 4182 Brief, 4183 Declaration in Support, 4184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Rambus, Inc (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 11/14/2012) Modified on 11/14/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2012 4184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven M. Perry ISO Rambus's Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2012) Text modified on 11/14/2012; Clerk sealed Declaration of Steven M. Perry Pursuant to General Order 62 - Electronic Filing of Documents Under Seal (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2012 4183 DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. PERRY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUSS BRIEF REGARDING THE COURTS DETERMINATION OF A RAND RATE PURSUANT TO ITS SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 ORDER re 4182 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibits B - J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit L (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit M (Part 1 of 2), # 7 Exhibit M (Part 2 of 2), # 8 Exhibit N) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2012) Modified on 11/14/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2012 4182 BRIEF REGARDING THE COURT'S DETERMINATION OF A RAND RATE PURSUANT TO ITS SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 ORDER re 4160 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2012) Modified on 11/14/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 4181 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF RE-EXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MOTION TO STAY re 4180 4179 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. ]) (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 4180 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF THEODORE G. BROWN III IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF RE-EXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR STAY re 4168 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 46-48) ((Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 4179 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF RE-EXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUSS PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR STAY re 4164 , 4166 , 4165 filed b yHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2012 4178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Under Seal Declaration of Roy Weinstein In Support of Hynix's Brief Regarding Sanctions for Rambus's Spoliation by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/30/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2012 4177 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5(b) and 7-11) filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III, # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/30/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2012 4176 Redacted Brief Regarding Sanctions For Rambus's Spoliation re 4160 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Susan Roeder In Support, # 2 Exhibit-A to S. Roeder Declaration, # 3 Exhibit-B to S. Roeder Declaration, # 4 Exhibit-C to S. Roeder Declaration) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/30/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2012 4175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant To L.R. 7-11 And 79-5(d) And General Order No. 62 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Susan Roeder In Support, # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Roeder, Susan) (Filed on 10/30/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2012 4174 Motion to Amend Findings Under F.R.C.P. 52(b) re 4160 filed by Rambus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 11/20/2012. Replies due by 12/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 10/29/2012) Text modified on 11/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 4173 STIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER Adjusting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date re 4164 4166 , 4165 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified on 10/29/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2012 4172 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER 4170 Regarding Dissemination and Use of Samsung and Elipida Agreements. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 4171 Featured Case REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER 4162 , 4170 Modifying the Schedule for Supplemental Briefing on Remedy. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 4170 LETTER ENCLOSING REVISED STIPULATION RE SCHEDULE AND STIPULATION RE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order, # 2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 3 (Proposed) Order) (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 10/22/2012) Modified on 10/23/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 4169 Declaration of David L. Taylor in Support of: (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF RE-EXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUS'S PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MOTION TO STAY re 4164 filed b yHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 25, # 25 Exhibit 26, # 26 Exhibit 27, # 27 Exhibit 28, # 28 Exhibit 29, # 29 Exhibit 30-1, # 30 Exhibit 30-2, # 31 Exhibit 31-1, # 32 Exhibit 31-2, # 33 Exhibit 31-3, # 34 Exhibit 31-4, # 35 Exhibit 31-5, # 36 Exhibit 32-1, # 37 Exhibit 32-2, # 38 Exhibit 33, # 39 Exhibit 34, # 40 Exhibit 35, # 41 Exhibit 36, # 42 Exhibit 37, # 43 Exhibit 38, # 44 Exhibit 39, # 45 Exhibit 40, # 46 Exhibit 41, # 47 Exhibit 42, # 48 Exhibit 43, # 49 Exhibit 44, # 50 Exhibit 45-1, # 51 Exhibit 45-2) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 4168 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III in Support of: (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF RE-EXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUS'S PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MOTION TO STAY re 4164 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 4167 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL EFFECT OF RE-EXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUS'S PATENTS; (2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF RAMBUS INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MOTION TO STAY filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Text modified on 10/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 4166 NOtice of Motion and Motion for New Trial OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. Responses due by 10/31/2012. Replies due by 11/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 4165 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Reply to Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Rambus, Inc.'s Amended Counterclaim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suipport filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 4164 Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Collateral Estoppel Effect of Reexaminations of Rambus's Patents; Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. Responses due by 10/31/2012. Replies due by 11/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2012 4163 Statement REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON REMEDY by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Van Keulen, # 2 Exhibit-A, # 3 Exhibit-B) (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/12/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/15/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2012 4162 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding briefing schedule with attached stipulation and [proposed] order modifying the schedule for supplemental brief on remedy filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 10/10/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 4161 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 TO MODIFY CASE CAPTION TO REFLECT CORPORATE NAME CHANGES filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Van Keulen , # 2 Exhibit-A, # 3 Exhibit-B, # 4 (Proposed) Order) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified on 10/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2012 4160 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON SPOLIATION AND THE UNCLEAN HANDS DEFENSE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/21/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 10, 2012 4159 Letter to Judge Whyte in response to Mr. Nissly's letter of 9/4/2012 re 4158 from Gregory P. Stone (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 9/10/2012) Modified on 9/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 4158 Letter to Judge Whyte in Response to Rambus' Letter of August 29, 2012 from Kenneth L. Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2012 4157 Letter to Judge Whyte in response to Kenneth Nissly's letter of August 24, 2012 from Gregory P. Stone (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 8/29/2012) Modified on 8/29/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 4156 Correcred Letter to Judge White re Federal Circuit opinion In re Rambus No. 2011-1247 (Fed. Cir. August 15, 2012) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 4155 from Ken Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified on 8/28/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 4155 Letter to Judge Whyte re Federal Circuit opinion In re Rambus No. 2011-1247 (Fed. Cir. August 15, 2012) from Ken Nissly Text modified on 8/28/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2012 4154 Letter to Judge Whyte in Response to Mr. Nissly's Letter of August 21, 2012 from from Gregory P. Stone. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 8/22/2012) Modified on 8/23/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 4153 Letter to Judge Whyte re ITC 337-TA-753 public version of the Commission Opinion from Ken Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 4152 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding the ITC 753 Investigation Affirming the Initial Determination from Ken Nissly. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/27/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 4151 Letter to Judge Whyte Submitting Notice of Commission Determination from Gregory P. Stone (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Commission Determination) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified on 7/26/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/26/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2012 4150 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Administrartive Law Judge Essex's Initial Determination in the Matter of Certain Semiconductor Chips and Products containing same, from Ken Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/18/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2012 4149 Letter to Judge Whyte from Kenneth L. Nissly re ITC No. 337-TA-753 (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/3/2012) Modified on 7/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2012 4148 Letter to Judge Whyte in response to Mr. Stone's letter of June 12, 2012 regarding from Kenneth L. Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/13/2012) Text modified on 6/14/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2012 4147 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Submitting of Recent Briefs Filed in ITC Investigation from Gregory P. Stone (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Submission of ITC Staff, # 2 Exhibit Rambus's Resonse to ITC Notice to Review) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 6/12/2012) Modified on 6/13/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2012 4146 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Follow-up Letter to the Court Dated June1, 2012 4145 from Kenneth L. Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/6/2012) Modified on 6/7/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2012 4145 Letter to Judge Whyte Submitting Staff Response to Notice of Commission Determination in ITC Investigation from Gregory P. Stone (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A: Staff Response to Notice of Commission Determination)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 6/1/2012) Text modified on 6/4/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2012 4143 Letter to Judge Whyte following up on letters dated April 11, 2012 and April 17, 2012 from Gregory P. Stone (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - ITC Notice of Determination)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2012 4142 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 4126 HYNIX'S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF ESCROW FUNDS. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/25/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 19, 2012 4141 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Andrew W. Song as Counsel of Record for Rambus Inc. (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 4/19/2012) Modified on 4/19/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2012 4140 Letter to Judge Whyte Following Up on Letter of April 11, 2012 from Gregory Stone to Judge Whyte (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ITC Staff's Response to Petitions for Review, # 2 Exhibit Excerpt of Rambus's Response to Petitions for Review) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/17/2012) Modified on 4/19/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2012 4139 Letter to Judge Whyte following up on letter dated March 22, 2012 from Gregory P. Stone . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2012 4138 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HYNIXS MOTION TO RELEASE ESCROW ACCOUNT (re 4126 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Allen, Gary) (Filed on 3/29/2012) Modified on 3/30/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2012 4137 Letter from Kenneth L. Nissly in response to Gregory Stone's letter of March 22, 2012 ( 4135 ). . (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/26/2012) Modified text to add linkage on 3/27/2012 (srm, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2012 4136 Opposition to Hynix's Motion to Release Escrow Account re 4126 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 3/22/2012) Text modified on 3/23/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2012 4135 Letter to The Honorable Ronald M. Whyte in response to Kevin Nissly's letter of March 16, 2012 from Gregory P. Stone (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 3/22/2012) Text modified on 3/23/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2012 4134 Featured Case ORDER TAXING COSTS OF PREMIUMS INCURRED BY HYNIX TO MAINTAIN SUPERSEDEAS BOND. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/21/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 4133 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4131 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 3/21/2012) Modified on 3/22/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2012 4132 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4130 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 3/21/2012) Text modified on 3/22/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2012 4131 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 4127 HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/20/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 4130 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 4123 HYNIX'S MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/20/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 16, 2012 4129 Letter to Judge Whyte following-up regarding letter to the Court dated 3/7/2012 from KENNETH L. NISSLY TO HON. RONALD M. WHYTE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 of 5, # 2 Exhibit 2 of 5, # 3 Exhibit 3 of 5, # 4 Exhibit 4 of 5, # 5 Exhibit 5 of 5)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/16/2012) Text modified on 3/20/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2012 4128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Submitted Under Seal Exhibt 1 to the Declaration of G. Ross Allen ISO Hynix's Motion to Release Escrow Account re 4126 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Allen, Gary) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 3/9/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2012 4127 Administrative Request to File Under Seal filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of G. Ross Allen ISO Hynix's Admin Request to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Allen, Gary) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 3/9/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2012 4126 MOTION for Release of Funds filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 3/22/2012. Replies due by 3/29/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of G. Ross Allen In Support of Hynix's Motion to Release Escrow Account, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Submission Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Decl of Allen, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Decl of Allen, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Decl of Allen, # 6 Proposed Order)(Allen, Gary) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 3/9/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2012 4125 Letter to Judge Whyte Regarding reports in the public press on Friday, March 3,2012 Kenneth L. Nissly regarding Spoliation issue and International Trade Commission's Initial Determination in Investigation No. 337-TA-753 . (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/7/2012) Modified on 3/8/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2012 4124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re Submitted Under Seal Exhibit 32 to the Fourth Supplemental Declaratinon of Roh ISO Hynix's Third Supplemental Bill of Costs re 4122 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 3/5/2012) Modified on 3/6/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2012 4123 Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Under Seal filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III ISO Hynix's Administrative Motion, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 3/5/2012) Modified on 3/6/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2012 4122 Third Supplemental Bills of Costs by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Fourth Supplemental Declaration of Yoo Ho Roh ISO Hynix's Third Supplemental Bill of Costs)(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 3/5/2012) Modified on 3/6/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF
March 5, 2012 4121 Submission in Response to Order Taxing Costs Pursuant to Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 39(e) re 4115 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 3/5/2012) Modified on 3/6/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2012 4120 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 4116 Regarding Discharge of Supersedeas Bond Posted by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/24/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 21, 2012 4119 Letter to Judge Whyte from Theodore G. Brown, III (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 2/21/2012) Modified on 3/2/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2012 4118 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Supreme Court's Order dated 2/21/2012 from Peter A. Detre (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Detre, Peter) (Filed on 2/21/2012) Modified on 3/2/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2012 4117 STIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER REGARDING DISCHARGE OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND POSTED BY HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC. filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 2/9/2012) Modified on 2/9/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2012 4116 STIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER EGARDING DISCHARGE OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND POSTED BY HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 2/3/2012) Modified on 2/6/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2012 4115 Featured Case ORDER TAXING COSTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 39(e); LIFTING HYNIX'S OBLIGATION TO MAINTAIN SUPERSEDEAS BOND; AND DECLINING TO LIFT HYNIX'S OBLIGATION TO MAINTAIN ESCROW ACCOUNT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/11/2012. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 9, 2012 4114 Rambus's Response to Hynix's Request for Release of Bond and Escrow re 4109 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/9/2012) Text modified on 1/11/2012; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2012 4113 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4111 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Exhibits 29-31 to the Third Supplemental Declaration of Yoo Ho Roh ISO Hynix's 2nd Supplemental Bill of Costs) by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 4111 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 4098 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, in support of 4102 .(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 4110 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF HYNIXS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BILL OF COSTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE Procedure 39 re 4096 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 1/5/2012) Modified on 1/12/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2011 4109 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING RAMBUS TO FILE BRIEF RE HYNIX'S REQUEST TO TERMINATE APPELLATE BOND AND ESCROW ACCOUNT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/28/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 23, 2011 4108 Letter to Judge Whyte in Response to Kenneth L. Nissly Dec. 21 2011 Letter from Gregory P. Stone . (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/23/2011) Modified on 12/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2011 4107 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 4108 . *** Letter from Gregory P. Stone to Judge Whyte in Response to Kenneth L. Nissly's Letter of Dec. 21 2011. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/23/2011) Modified on 12/27/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2011 4106 Opposition to Hynix's Second Supplemental Bill of Costs re 4096 by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/23/2011) Modified on 12/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2011 4105 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding the remand issues discussed a the hearing on 12/16/11 from Kenneth L. Nissly (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/21/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 4104 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING RAMBUS INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST RE ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on December 14, 2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 13, 2011 4103 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on December 13, 2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 4102 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING HYNIXS MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on December 13, 2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 4101 MOTION Rambus's Administrative Request for Entry of Equipment in the Courtroom filed by Rambus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 12, 2011 4100 Miscellaneous Administrative Request For Entry of Equipment into Courtroom filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(van Keulen, Susan) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2011 4099 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 4096 Bill of Costs, by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 12/9/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2011 4098 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III ISO Hynix's Admin Motion, # 2 9Proposed Order) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 12/9/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2011 4097 Supplemental Response In Support of Hynix's Bill of Costs and Supplemental Bill of Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 39) re 4095 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 12/9/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2011 4096 Second Supplemental BILL OF COSTS by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Third Supplemental Declaration of Yoo Ho Roh ISO Hynix's Second Supplemental Bill of Costs)(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 12/9/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2011 4095 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing on the Following Motions: Hearing on the Remand Issue; Hearing on Bill of Cost; Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 2:00 PM. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 4094 Notice of intent to submit Motion on Papers by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation U.S.A. re 4081 (Proposed ) Order, 4080 (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/8/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 4093 Declaration of Jeffrey Y. Wu in Support of Response Brief in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re 4088 , 4091 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A, # 2 Exhibit-B, # 3 Exhibit-C) (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 4092 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re 4083 , by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 4091 Supplemental Proposed Findings and Conclusions of Law by Rambus, Inc. < (Attachments: # 1 Rambus Supplemental Proposed Findings and Conclusions (Non-Annotated), # 2 Rambus Supp. Proposed Findings and Conclusions (Comparison with Court's Prior Order), # 3 Rambus Supp. Proposed Findings and Conclusions (Comparison with Rambus Nov. 14 2011 Proposed Findings)) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 4090 Additional Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Spoliation by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd re [ 4082] (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 4089 RESPONSE to Rambus's Brief in Support of its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Roeder in Support of Response, # 2 Exhibit A to Roeder Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Roeder Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Roeder Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Roeder Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Roeder Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Roeder Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Roeder Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Roeder Declaration)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 4088 Response Brief in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re 4082 , 4084 f, 4083 (Proposed) Findings of Fact filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 4087 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief re 4080 filed by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation U.S.A. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2011 4086 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Julie Jinsook Han (Han, Julie) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 4085 OPPOSITION OF RAMBUS INC. TO NANYA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF re 4080 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 11/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2011 4084 Brief in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re 4083 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2011 4083 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Annotated Proposed Findings and Conclusions, # 2 Non-Annotated Proposed Findings and Conclusions)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2011 4082 Opening Pre-Hearing Brief on Remand filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Hynix's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Spoliation, # 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Findings of Fact and Law, # 3 Declaration of Susan Roeder in Support of Hynix's Propsed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Roeder, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Roeder, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Roeder, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Roeder, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Roeder, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Roeder, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Roeder, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Roeder, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Roeder, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Roeder, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Roeder, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Roeder, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Roeder, # 17 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Roeder, # 18 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Roeder, # 19 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Roeder, # 20 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Roeder, # 21 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Roeder, # 22 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Roeder, # 23 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Roeder, # 24 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Roeder, # 25 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Roeder, # 26 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Roeder, # 27 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Roeder, # 28 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Roeder, # 29 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Roeder, # 30 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Roeder, # 31 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Roeder, # 32 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Roeder, # 33 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Roeder, # 34 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Roeder, # 35 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Roeder, # 36 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Roeder, # 37 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Roeder, # 38 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of Roeder, # 39 Exhibit 36 to Declaration of Roeder, # 40 Exhibit 37 to Declaration of Roeder, # 41 Exhibit 38 to Declaration of Roeder, # 42 Exhibit 39 to Declaration of Roeder, # 43 Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Roeder, # 44 Exhibit 41 to Declaration of Roeder, # 45 Exhibit 42 to Declaration of Roeder)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2011 4081 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Briefre 4080 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief re 4080 by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation U.S.A. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 11/11/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2011 4080 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation U.S.A.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Replies due by 12/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Angell, Jason) (Filed on 11/11/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 4079 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/21/2011 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 10/21/2011). Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 4078 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/21/2011, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2012. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 4077 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 4053 Extending Schedule for Briefing With Regard to Hynix's Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 14, 2011 4076 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4073 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Hynix's Response In Support of Suppl. Bill of Costs) by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Roh ISO Hynix's Response, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10 (Part 1 of 2), # 13 Exhibit 10 (Part 2 of 2), # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16 (Part 1 of 2), # 20 Exhibit 16 (Part 2 of 2), # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit 23, # 28 Exhibit 24, # 29 Exhibit 25, # 30 Exhibit 26, # 31 Exhibit 27, # 32 Exhibit 3 to TGB Decl ISO Response (Part 1 of 6), # 33 Exhibit 3 to TGB Decl ISO Response (Part 2 of 6), # 34 Exhibit 3 to TGB Decl ISO Response (Part 3 of 6), # 35 Exhibit 3 to TGB Decl ISO Response (Part 4 of 6), # 36 Exhibit 3 to TGB Decl ISO Response (Part 5 of 6), # 37 Exhibit 3 to TGB Decl ISO Response (Part 6 of 6))(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 4075 RESPONSE to Rambus's Brief on Remand Proceedings re 4065 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Hynix's Response to Brief, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Hynix's Response to Brief, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Hynix's Response to Brief) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/14/2011) Modified on 10/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2011 4074 Answering Brief on Remand Proceedings re 4066 filed by Rambus, Inc . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (ITC Letter)) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 10/14/2011) Modified on 10/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2011 4073 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 4067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 3, 2011 4072 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: (1) YNIXS RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF HYNIXS BILL OF COSTS AND SUPPLEMENTAL BILL OF COSTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 39 SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL. (2) EXHIBIT 3 TO DECLARATION OF BROWN ISO HYNIXS RESPONSE SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL; (3) SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF YOO HO ROH IN SUPPORT OF HYNIXS SUPPLEMENTAL BILL OF COSTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 39 EXHIBITS 1-27 SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 4071 Joint Statement of Disputed Costs by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 4070 Declaration of Brian M. Hodges filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 4069 Declaration of Do Youn filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 4068 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III In Support of Hynix's Response In Support of Hynix's Bill of Costs and Supplemental Bill of Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 39 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 4067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2011 4066 Opening Brief Regarding Proceedings on Remand filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C to Hynix Opening Brief)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/30/2011) Modified on 10/3/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2011 4065 Brief on Remand Proceedings filed by Rambus, Inc. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 9/30/2011) Modified on 10/3/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2011 4064 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4061 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Exhibits 26-28 to the Supplemental Declaration of Yoo Ho Roh in Support of Hynix's Supplemental Bill of Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 39) by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 4063 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 4062 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Hynix's Bill of Costs and Supplemental Bill of Costs by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of E. Allen Jacobs in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Hynix's Bill of Costs and Supplemental Bill of Costs, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey Y. Wu in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Hynix's Bill of Costs, # 3 Exhibit A-C to Declaration of Jeffrey Y. Wu, # 4 Exhibit D-H to Declaration of Jeffrey Y. Wu)(Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 4062 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 4054 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 4059 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 4061 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 4047 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 4060 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 4053 Extending Schedule for Briefing with Regard to Hynix's Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/29/2011. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 23, 2011 4059 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 4054 4055 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Roeder in Support Of Hynix's Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 (Proposed) Order Granting Hynix's Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/23/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2011 4058 Rambus's Counsel's Notice of Change of Firm Name by Rambus, Inc(Hubert, Pierre) (Filed on 9/23/2011) Modified on 9/26/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2011 4056 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding connection with Rambus's Opposition to Hynix's Bill of Costs by Rambus, Inc. (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/19/2011) Modified on 9/20/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2011 4055 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Y, Wu in Opposition to Hynix's Bill of Costs (Exhibits A through H Lodged Under Seal re 4032 , filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through H Lodged Under Seal) (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/19/2011) Modified on 9/20/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2011 4054 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/19/2011) Modified on 9/20/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2011 4053 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Extending Schedule for Briefing with Regard to Hynix's Bill of Costs re 4042 by Rambus, Inc. (Rowley, Fred) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified on 9/19/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2011 4052 NOTICE of Change of Address by Theodore G. Brown, III (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 9/7/2011) (Address changed for attorneys on DAR re Notice of Change of Address) Modified on 9/8/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 4051 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/02/2011, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2011. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 29, 2011 4050 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Rambus, Inc. (Rowley, Fred) (Filed on 8/29/2011) Text modified on 9/1/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2011 4049 CLERKS NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2011. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 24, 2011 4048 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Supplemental Declartion of Roh Iso Supplemental Bill of Costs Exhibits 26-28 submitted Under Seal re 4046 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 8/24/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2011 4047 Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2(Proposed) Order)(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 8/24/2011) Modified on 8/24/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2011 4046 Supplemental Bill of Costs by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Yoo Ho Roh ISO Hynix's Supplemental Bill of Costs) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 8/24/2011) Modified on 8/24/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2011 4045 United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Notice of Entry of Judgment. This Cause having been heard and considered, it is Order and Adjudged: AFFIRMED-IN-PART, VACATED-PART, AND REMANDED (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 12, 2011 4044 Letter to Judge Whyte re: Status Report from Kenneth R. O'Rourke (O'Rourke, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/12/2011) Modified on 8/12/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2011 4043 Letter to Judge Whyte Regarding Status Conference from Gregory P. Stone . (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 8/11/2011) Modified on 8/12/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2011 4042 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 4041 Regarding Schedule for Briefing With Regard to Hynix's Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 10, 2011 4041 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING WITH REGARD TO HYNIX'S BILL OF COSTS re 4032 by Rambus, Inc. (Rowley, Fred) (Filed on 6/10/2011) Modified on 6/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2011 4040 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 4033 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 4039 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/03/2011, before Judge Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2011. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 3, 2011 4038 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 6/3/2011 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 6/3/2011). (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 4037 Declaration of Peter A. Detre in Support of MOTION to Extend Time for Objections to Bill of Costs and for the Court to Hear the Bill of Costs in the First Instance re 4036 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 6/2/2011) Modified on 6/3/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2011 4036 MOTION to Extend Time for Objections to Bill of Costs and for the Court to Hear the Bill of Costs in the First Instance (Local Rule 6-3) filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 6/2/2011) Modified on 6/3/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2011 4035 Proof of Service re ( 4032 ) by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/27/2011) Modified on 5/31/2011 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2011 4034 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Detre, Peter) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 4033 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth L. Nissly in Support of Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/27/2011) Modified on 5/31/2011 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2011 4032 BILL OF COSTS Pursuant to Fed. R. App. Proc.39(e) by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Yoo Ho Roh in Support of Hynix's Bill of Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/27/2011) Modified on 5/31/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2011 4031 United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Notice of Entry of Judgment Accompanied by Opinion. The District Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law regarding Spoliation are vacated, as is the district court's Final Judgment, and the case is hereby remanded for reconsideration of the spoliation issue under the Framework set forth in Micron II. The district court's decision on waiver and estoppel, its claim construction order, its order denying Hynix's motion for judgment as a matter of law or for a new trial on the basis of written description, and its order denying Hynix's motion for a new trial on the basis of obviousness, are affirmed. This court also affirms the district court's grant of Hynix's motion for summary judgment for the claims at issue in Rambus' cross-appeal. AFFIRMED-IN-PART, VACATED-PART, AND REMANDED re 3938 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Rambus, Inc. 3922 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 19, 2011 4030 CLERKS NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2011. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 13, 2011 4029 Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Federal Circuit Rulings from Peter A. Detre (Attachments: # 1 Hynix Ruling, # 2 Micron Ruling)(Detre, Peter) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/13/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2011 4028 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Joseph A. Greco as Counsel of Record by Julie Jinsook Han (Han, Julie) (Filed on 3/23/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2011 4027 Notice of Withdrawal of Jordan Trent Jones as Counsel of Recordby Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Jones, Jordan) (Filed on 3/9/2011) Modified on 3/10/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2011 4026 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ANDREA WEISS JEFFRIES AND JENNIFER L. POLSE AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR RAMBUS INC. by Rambus, Inc (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 2/17/2011) Modified on 2/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2010 4025 Notice of Withdrawal of David C. Yang as Counsel of Record for Rambus, Inc by Rambus, Inc. (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 12/15/2010) Modified on 12/16/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2010 4024 Plaintiffs' Supersedeas Bond by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
September 28, 2010 4023 NOTICE of Removal of Attorney Daniel J. Furniss from Case & CM/ECF Notifications by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 9/28/2010) Modified on 9/28/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 4022 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2010 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/17/2010) re 4009 MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment filed by Rambus, Inc. (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 4021 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 4009 Motion for Reconsideration (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 3, 2010 4020 Declaration of Jeffrey Y. Wu in Support of Rambus's Reply in Suport of Motion for Reconsidertion of Bond Order re 4019 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1Exhibits A - E) (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/3/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2010 4019 Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Bond Order re ( 4009 ) filed by Rambus, Inc. (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/3/2010) Modified text to add linkage on 9/7/2010 (srm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/16/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 4018 DECLARATION of Yoo Ho Roh in Opposition to Opposition to Rambus's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 26, 2009 Bond Order 4009 MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D) (Han, Julie) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 4017 DECLARATION of Theodore G. Brown, III in Opposition to Rambus's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 26, 2009 Bond Order 4009 MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) ) (Han, Julie) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 4016 Opposition to Rambus's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 26, 2009 Bond Order re 4009 , re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Han, Julie) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2010 4015 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 4008 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 16, 2010 4014 Declaration of Jeffrey Y. Wu Pursuant to the Court's Order re Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal re 4008 filed by Rambus, Inc. (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/16/2010) Modified on 8/17/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2010 4013 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on 4009 MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Opposition papers shall be filed and served on or before 8/27/10; reply papers shall be served on or before 9/3/10. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/10/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 6, 2010 4012 Featured Case ORDER re 4008 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Rambus, Inc. Parties shall have ten days to file additional support for the sealing request. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/6/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 3, 2010 4011 Proof of Service re (1) Motion for Leave to seek Reconsideration of Bond Order and for Reconsideration to Bond Order; (2) Declaration of Jeffrey y. Wu in Support of Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration of Bond Order; and for Reconsideration of Bond Order by Rambus, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 4010 Proof of Service re Declaration of Jeffrey Wu in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal by Rambus, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 2, 2010 4009 MOTION for Reconsideration re 3965 Order Granting Hynix's Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment filed by Rambus, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibits Part I, # 3 Exhibits Part II, # 4 Exhibits Part III, # 5 (Proposed) Order)(Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2010 4008 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
June 29, 2010 4006 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 3997 Motion to Seal (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
April 30, 2010 4005 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4004 Ex Parte Application for Order Respecting Maximum Amount Secured by Hynix Factory Kun-Mortgage. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 28, 2010 4004 Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER RESPECTING MAXIMUM AMOUNT SECURED BY HYNIX FACTORY KUN-MORTGAGE filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER RESPECTING MAXIMUM AMOUNT SECURED BY HYNIX FACTORY KUN-MORTGAGE)(Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 8, 2010 4003 Featured Case ORDER TAXING COSTS re 3926 Bill of Costs, filed by Rambus, Inc., 3942 Objection filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Costs are awarded to Rambus in the amount of $764,839.93. Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/8/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 8, 2010 4002 Featured Case *****FILED IN ERROR, SEE CORRECTED ORDER TAXING COSTS 4003 BELOW*****ORDER TAXING COSTS re 3926 Bill of Costs, filed by Rambus, Inc., and 3942 Objection filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Costs are taxed and awarded to Rambus in the amount of $764,839.93. Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/8/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2009 4001 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 4000 Regarding Escrow Accounts for Ongoing Royalties. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/24/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 20, 2009 4000 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ESCROW ACCOUNTS FOR ONGOING ROYALTIES by Rambus, Inc.. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
October 27, 2009 4007 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #4006 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 3999 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3986(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 3998 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd re 3996 Notice (Other), 3997 MOTION to Seal Declaration of Yoo Ho Roh Re Existing Encumbrances on Hynix Cheungju Fab 3 in Support of Hynix's Notice of Compliance with the Court's May 14, 2009 Order (Han, Julie) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 3997 MOTION to Seal Declaration of Yoo Ho Roh Re Existing Encumbrances on Hynix Cheungju Fab 3 in Support of Hynix's Notice of Compliance with the Court's May 14, 2009 Order filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Julie J. Han, # 2 Proposed Order)(Han, Julie) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 3996 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd of Compliance with the Court's May 14, 2009 Order (Han, Julie) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 22, 2009 3988 Featured Case SEALING ORDER 3928 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 3987 Featured Case SEALING ORDER 3917 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 29, 2009 3986 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3886 Motion to Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting 2008 Motion to Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting 3152 Motion to Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; Granting 1800 Motion to Seal in case 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
July 27, 2009 3985 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte denying without prejudice 3967 and 3974 Motion for Protective Order, and denying without prejudice 3970 Motion to Seal Document. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 10, 2009 3984 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rambus, Inc. re 3983 Declaration in Support, 3982 Response in Support,, PROOF OF SERVICE (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 3983 Declaration in Support of 3982 Response in Support,, DECLARATION OF KEITH R.D. HAMILTON IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS AND (2) MOTION TO SEAL MATERIALS FROM THE UNCLEAN HANDS TRIAL RECORD filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Related document(s) 3982 ) (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 3982 RESPONSE in Support re 3970 MOTION to Seal Document RAMBUS INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS IN THE HYNIX UNCLEAN HANDS TRIAL RECORD, 3967 MOTION for Protective Order RAMBUS INC.'S MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS RAMBUS INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS AND (2) MOTION TO SEAL MATERIALS FROM TEH UNCLEAN HANDS TRIAL RECORD filed byRambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 6, 2009 Received Exhibit 2 DOCUMENT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 3981 MOTION to Seal (Hynix's Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal Per LR 79-5 & 7-11 re Exhibit 2 to Brown Decl ISO Hynix's Opp) filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brown ISO Hynix's Admin Req to File Docs Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 3980 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III in Support of 3979 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 3979 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 3979 Memorandum in Opposition re 3970 MOTION to Seal Document RAMBUS INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS IN THE HYNIX UNCLEAN HANDS TRIAL RECORD, 3967 MOTION for Protective Order RAMBUS INC.'S MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS, 3974 MOTION for Protective Order RAMBUS INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS (Hynix's Opposition to Rambus's (1) Motion for a Modification of Protective Order and (2) Motion to Seal Materials in the Unclean Hands Trial Record filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 26, 2009 3978 Supersedeas Bond filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 23, 2009 3977 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing schedule re 3967 MOTION for Protective Order, 3970 MOTION to Seal Document, and 3974 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/23/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2009)
June 22, 2009 3976 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rambus, Inc. re 3975 Stipulation, 3974 MOTION for Protective Order RAMBUS INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 3975 STIPULATION re 3974 MOTION for Protective Order RAMBUS INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR RAMBUS'S MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 3974 MOTION for Protective Order RAMBUS INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS filed by Rambus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 8, 2009 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 8, 2009 3973 OBJECTIONS to re 3968 Declaration in Support, 3967 MOTION for Protective Order RAMBUS INC.'S MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS, 3969 Proposed Order HYNIX'S OBJECTION TO RAMBUS'S FILING OF MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 5, 2009 3972 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rambus, Inc. Regarding Confidential Version of Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 3971 Proposed Order re 3970 MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS AND TESTIMONY FROM HYNIX UNCLEAN HANDS TRIAL by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/5/2009) Modified on 6/13/2009, counsel failed to link entry to document #3970 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2009 3970 MOTION to Seal Document RAMBUS INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS IN THE HYNIX UNCLEAN HANDS TRIAL RECORD filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 3969 Proposed Order re 3967 Motion for Modification of June 20, 2001 Protective Order by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/5/2009) Modified on 6/13/2009, counsel failed to link entry to document #3967 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2009 3968 Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke in Support of 3967 Rambus Inc.'s Motion for a Modification of Protective Order Governing Rambus's Privileged Materials (Exh. E filed under seal) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E to Declaration)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/5/2009) Modified on 6/13/2009, counsel failed to link entry to document #3967 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2009 3967 MOTION for Protective Order RAMBUS INC.'S MOTION FOR A MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING RAMBUS'S PRIVILEGED MATERIALS filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 2, 2009 ***Deadline terminated. Hearing re Bill of Costs vacated (see Order 3966 ). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
June 2, 2009 3966 Featured Case ORDER vacating June 5, 2009 hearing and submitting bill of costs and objections for decision without oral argument. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/2/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
May 26, 2009 3965 Featured Case Redacted version of 3963 ORDER granting 3912 Hynix's motion to stay execution of judgment, signed by Judge Whyte on 5/14/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 3964 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part Hynix's request to redact portions of order granting motion to stay execution of judgment. Signed by Judge Whyte on 5/22/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 14, 2009 3963 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte FILED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3962 RESPONSE in Support RAMBUS INC.S RESPONSES TO HYNIXS OBJECTIONS TO RAMBUSS BILL OF COSTS filed byRambus, Inc.. (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3961 EXHIBITS re 3956 Declaration in Support [Exh. 5 to Song Decl.] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3956 ) (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3960 EXHIBITS re 3956 Declaration in Support [Exh. 4 to Song Decl.] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3956 ) (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3959 EXHIBITS re 3956 Declaration in Support [Exh. 3 to Song Decl.] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3956 ) (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3958 EXHIBITS re 3956 Declaration in Support [Exh. 2 to Song Decl.] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3956 ) (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3957 EXHIBITS re 3956 Declaration in Support [Exh. 1 to Song Decl.] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3956 ) (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3956 Declaration of Andrew Song IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S RESPONSES TO HYNIX'S OBJECTIONS TO RAMBUS INC.S BILL OF COSTS filed byRambus, Inc.. (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3955 Statement re 3953 Statement Exh. 2 to Joint Statement of Disputed Costs by Rambus, Inc.. (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3954 Statement re 3953 Statement Exh. 1 to Joint Statement of Disputed Costs by Rambus, Inc.. (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 3953 Statement Joint Statement of Disputed Costs by Rambus, Inc.. (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 8, 2009 3952 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 3950 Regarding Schedule for Briefing and Hearing With Regard to Rambus's Bill of Costs: Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/8/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 3951 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/8/2009 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 5/8/2009) re 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2009)
May 7, 2009 3950 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Schedule for Briefing and Hearing With Regard to Rambus's Bill of Costs by Rambus, Inc.. (Song, Andrew) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 6, 2009 3949 Featured Case ORDER 3946 Granting Plaintiff's Request Re: Equipment in Courtroom. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/6/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
May 5, 2009 3948 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 3944 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 3946 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request re Equipment in Courtroom by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 4, 2009 Received Motion SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 4, 2009 3947 Transmission of 3938 Notice of Cross-Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Attorney List)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 1, 2009 3945 MOTION administrative relief to file documents under seal re 3944 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Hynix's Motion for Stay of Execution of Money Judgment and for Permission to Post Alternative Security filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. in support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 3944 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Hynix's Motion for Stay of Execution of Money Judgment and for Permission to Post Alternative Security filed by Rambus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - redacted Surreply, # 2 Exhibit B - redacted Jacobs Decl., # 3 Exhibit C - Wu Decl., # 4 Exhibit A-G to Wu Decl., # 5 Proposed Order)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 30, 2009 3943 Declaration of Julie J. Han in Support of 3942 Objection by Hynix to Rambus's Bill of Costs filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3942 ) (Han, Julie) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 3942 OBJECTIONS to re 3926 Bill of Costs, by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Han, Julie) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 24, 2009 Attorney Jared Bobrow removed from docket as counsel for Hynix. Attorney Bobrow's name began to appear on the docket as counsel for Hynix on 1/28/2008 when counsel posted an entry and selected Hynix as the document filer (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Attorney Linda Jane Brewer removed from docket as counsel for Hynix. Attorney Brewer's name began to appear on the docket as counsel for Hynix on 1/28/2008 when a document was posted by counsel using Hynix as the document filer. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Attorney Aaron Bennett Craig removed from docket as counsel for Hynix. Attorney Craig's name began to appear on the docket as counsel for Hynix on 1/18/2008 when he posted an entry and selected Hynix as the document filer. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Attorney Robert Jason Becher removed from docket as counsel for Hynix. Attorney Becher's name began to appear on the docket as counsel for Hynix on 3/12/2008 when he posted an entry and selected Hynix as the document filer. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 John D. Beynon removed from docket as counsel for Hynix. Attorney Beynon's name began to appear on docket as counsel for Hynix on 2/28/2008 when he posted a document and selected Hynix as the filer. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 21, 2009 3941 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH re 3939 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 3940 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 3938 Notice of Cross Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Attorney List)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 3939 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2009 02:00 PM. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 20, 2009 3937 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rambus, Inc. re 3927 Memorandum in Opposition, AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 20, 2009 Received Supplemental Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 17, 2009 3938 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to 3911 Final Judgment, 726 Order, 621 Claim Construction Order, 729 Order, 1440 Order, 1485 Further Order by Rambus, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 455., receipt #54611005108 Appeal Record due by 5/18/2009. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 3936 Proposed Order re 3934 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 3935 Declaration of TOMOMI HARKEY in Support of 3934 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 DECLARATION OF TOMOMI HARKEY IN SUPPORT OF HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Related document(s) 3934 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 3934 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 3933 Declaration of YOO HO ROH in Support of 3931 Reply Memorandum, SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF YOO HO ROH IN SUPPORT OF HYNIX'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Related document(s) 3931 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 3932 Declaration of TOMOMI HARKEY in Support of 3931 Reply Memorandum, DECLARATION OF TOMOMI HARKEY IN SUPPORT OF HYNIX'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 3931 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 3931 Reply Memorandum re 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF HYNIX'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 13, 2009 3992 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3988 POSTED ON 10/22/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 3991 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3988 POSTED ON 10/22/2009(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 3990 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3988 POSTED ON 10/22/2009(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 3989 Brief in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3988 POSTED ON 10/22/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 3930 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rambus, Inc re sealed documents submitted. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Received Brief SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 3929 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. re 3927 Memorandum in Opposition, NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 3928 MOTION to Seal / Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Wu Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 3927 Memorandum in Opposition re 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Wu Declaration, # 2 Exhibits A - O to Wu Declaration, # 3 Chung Declaration, # 4 Dwyer Declaration, # 5 Jacobs Declaration, # 6 Kwon Declaration)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 9, 2009 3926 BILL OF COSTS by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James M. Berry, # 2 Schedule A, # 3 Schedule B - Part 1, # 4 Schedule B - Part 2, # 5 Schedule B - Part 3, # 6 Schedule B - Part 4, # 7 Schedule B - Part 5, # 8 Schedule B - Part 6, # 9 Schedule B - Part 7, # 10 Schedule B - Part 8, # 11 Schedule C, # 12 Schedule D, # 13 Schedule E, # 14 Schedule F, # 15 Schedule G)(Song, Andrew) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 9, 2009 3925 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc. NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 7, 2009 3924 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 3922 Notice of Appeal, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2009: # 1 Party List) (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2009 3923 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH re 3922 Notice of Appeal, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 3922 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 3911 Judgment and all orders and ruling encompassed in the final judgment by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Filing fee $ 455., receipt #54611005035 Appeal Record due by 5/6/2009. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 25, 2009 3995 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3987 POSTED ON 10/22/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 3994 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3987 POSTED ON 10/22/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 3993 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3987 POSTED ON 10/22/2009. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Received Notice of Motion and Motion SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 3921 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH re 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 24, 2009 3920 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc. re 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 3919 Proposed Order re 3917 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 3918 Declaration of SUSAN ROEDER in Support of 3916 Declaration in Support, 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF DECLARATION OF SUSAN ROEDER IN SUPPORT OF HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) 3916 , 3912 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 3917 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 3916 Declaration in Support of 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 3912 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 3915 Declaration of CHANG WEON RHEE in Support of 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) 3912 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 3914 Declaration of TAEKJIN SA in Support of 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) 3912 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 3913 Declaration of JAE PARK in Support of 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) 3912 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 3912 MOTION to Stay HYNIX'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMISSION TO POST ALTERNATIVE SECURITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 10, 2009 3911 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/10/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 3910 Featured Case ORDER regarding entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/10/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 9, 2009 3909 Declaration of Jeffrey Y. Wu in Support of 3908 Statement Addressing Form of [Proposed] Final Judgment filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Finisar Bond Motion, # 2 Exhibit Finisar Escrow Opposition, # 3 Exhibit Finisar Escrow Order, # 4 Exhibit Paice Stipulation)(Related document(s) 3908 ) (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 3908 Statement Addressing Form of [Proposed] Final Judgment by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Form of Judgment with Issues in Dispute, # 2 Exhibit Rambus's Proposed Form of Judgment)(Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 3907 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III in Support of 3906 Statement, by Hynix Regarding its Proposed Form and Terms for the Final Judgment filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 3906 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 3906 Statement by Hynix Regarding its Proposed Form and Terms for the Final Judgment by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 4, 2009 3905 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/09, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2009. (las, ) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 3, 2009 3904 PHASE III (CONDUCT TRIAL) FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/3/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 3903 Proposed Order re Joint Memorandum Submitting and Explaining the Current Form of [Proposed] Final Judgment by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 24, 2009 3901 Featured Case ORDER memorializing compulsory license negotiation guidelines. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/24/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 23, 2009 3902 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Rambus's Motion for Post-Verdict Relief. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/23/2009. FILED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 3900 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte ruling on 3663 request for post-verdict relief; finding as moot 3719 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 3721 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 3723 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 3745 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 3747 Motion to Strike. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 3899 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. of Decision (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 10, 2009 3898 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Entry of Judgment in Micron Delaware Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delaware Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Delware Order)(Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 3, 2009 3897 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 3879 Motion for Summary Judgment. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 3896 Featured Case ORDER regarding status of proceedings. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 28, 2009 3895 Declaration of THEODORE G. BROWN, III in Support of 3894 Reply Memorandum,,, DECLARATION OF THEODORE G. BROWN, III IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HYNIX'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 3894 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 3894 Reply Memorandum re 3879 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF HYNIX FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF HYNIX FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HYNIXS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 3893 Letter from Gregory P. Stone re Order from Delaware Court. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 27, 2009 Received Confidential Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 3892 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 2067 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/27/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 3891 Letter from Gregory P. Stone to the Hon. Ronald M. Whyte re Jan 9, 2009 Delaware Opinion & Order. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 3890 EXHIBITS re 3888 MOTION TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMITATIONS re 3885 Memorandum in Opposition, MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMITATIONS MOTION TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMITATIONS re 3885 Memorandum in Opposition, MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMITATIONS -- Exhibit A to the Declaration of Rosemarie T. Ring -- filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3888 ) (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 3889 Memorandum in Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Take Judicial Notice and to Re-Open the Record of the Unclean Hands September Trial Solely to Admit Evidence Related to Collateral Estoppel, and to Hynixs Request for Judicial Notice of Joinder in Samsungs Motion to Take Judicial Notice filed byRambus, Inc.. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 3888 MOTION TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMITATIONS re 3885 Memorandum in Opposition, MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMITATIONS filed by Rambus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit OF ROSEMARIE T. RING ISO RAMBUS INC.'S MOTION FOR ADMIN RELIEF etc., # 2 Proposed Order GRANTING RAMBUS INC.'S MOTION FOR ADMIN RELIEF etc.)(Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 3887 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. re 3886 MOTION to Seal / Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), 3885 Memorandum in Opposition, NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING (Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 3886 MOTION to Seal / Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Wu Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wu, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 3885 Memorandum in Opposition / Rambus Inc.'s Consolidated Opposition To Motions Of Manufacturers For Summary Judgment Based Upon Collateral Estoppel filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Wu Declaration, # 2 Exhibits A & B to Wu Declaration, # 3 Exhibits C - K to Wu Declaration, # 4 Confidential Wu Declaration (Exhibit 1 attached))(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 26, 2009 3884 Letter from Greg Stone to Judge Whyte re: Trial Procedures. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 3883 OBJECTIONS to / Rambus Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Susan Roeder, John Beynon, Kristin Cornuelle, and Steven Cherensky Submitted in Support of Manufacturers' Motions for Summary Judgment and/or for Application of Issue Precludsion by Rambus, Inc.. (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 3882 Request for Judicial Notice HYNIX'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND NOTICE OF JOINDER IN SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G PART 1, # 8 Exhibit G PART 2, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M PART 1, # 15 Exhibit M PART 2, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 19, 2009 3881 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc. re 3876 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11, 3879 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF HYNIX FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF HYNIX FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND, 3880 Declaration in Support,,, 3878 Proposed Order, 3877 Declaration in Support, (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 19, 2009 3880 Declaration of SUSAN ROEDER in Support of 3879 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF HYNIX FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF HYNIX FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E Part 1, # 6 Exhibit E Part 2, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K Manual Filing Notification, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 3879 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 19, 2009 3879 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF HYNIX FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNCLEAN HANDS, FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER UNDER FRCP 60(b), FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b), AND FOR STAY OF REMAINING PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 19, 2009 3878 Proposed Order re 3876 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 19, 2009 3877 Declaration of SUSAN ROEDER in Support of 3876 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) 3876 ) (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 19, 2009 3876 MOTION to Seal HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5 AND 7-11 filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 16, 2009 3875 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 2087 MOTION to Strike; DENYING 2073 MOTION for New Trial filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., and GRANTING 2954 MOTION For Administrative Relief to File Hynix's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for New Trial on Invalidity Due to Prior Art (Civil L.R. 7-11) filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/16/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 13, 2009 3874 Letter from KENNETH L. NISSLY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 9, 2009 3873 Letter from Jared Bobrow to Honorable Ronald M. Whyte. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Order)(Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 30, 2008 3872 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kenneth Lee Nissly NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 2, 2008 3871 Featured Case ORDER denying motions docket numbers 2068 2069 2070 2071 for judgment as a matter of law. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/2/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008) Modified on 12/10/2008 (sp, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2008 3870 Featured Case ************FILED IN ERROR - SEE CORRECT DOC ENTRY 3871 ************ORDER denying motions 2068 2069 2070 2071 for judgment as a matter of law. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/2/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008) Modified on 12/2/2008: (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/10/2008 (sp, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2008 3869 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Lee Nissly NOTICE OF CHANGE OF AFFILIATION OF COUNSEL (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 19, 2008 3868 Featured Case Supplemental STIPULATION AND ORDER 3867 Designating Certain Rambus Documents "Confidential - Outside Counsel Only". Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
October 31, 2008 3867 Proposed Order SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATED [PROPOSED] ORDER DESIGNATING CERTAIN RAMBUS DOCUMENTS "CONFIDENTIAL - OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY" by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 3866 SIDE AGREEMENT TO JUNE 2001 PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PURPOSES OF PARTICULAR DOCUMENTS CONTAINING ELPIDIA CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/31/2008) Modified on 11/4/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2008 3865 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byRambus, Inc.. (Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 5, 2008 3864 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/5/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/5/2008) re 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 3863 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 3843 Motion for relief from damages. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
August 29, 2008 3862 Request for Judicial Notice HYNIX'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL OFFICE ACTIONS IN THE REEXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUS INC.'S PATENTS filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit B-1)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 24, 2008 3861 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying (3858) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; denying (1408) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; denying (2023) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; denying (1004) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2008)
August 15, 2008 3860 Reply Memorandum re 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 11, 2008 3859 Memorandum in Opposition re 3858 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 filed byNVIDIA Corporation. (Ricketson, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 7, 2008 3858 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hubert, Pierre) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 3857 Memorandum in Opposition re 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) filed byRambus, Inc.. (Hubert, Pierre) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
July 24, 2008 3856 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying (3640) Motion for New Trial in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; denying (1279) Motion for New Trial in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; denying (1678) Motion for New Trial in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW, i.e., the motions for new trial arising from the conduct trial phase. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2008).
July 21, 2008 3855 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Nathanael M. Cousins (for intervenor, USA) (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 15, 2008 3854 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Rambus's remitted Patent Damages. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
July 9, 2008 3853 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc. HYNIX'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF OFFICE ACTIONS IN THE REEXAMINATIONS OF RAMBUS INC.'S PATENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit C-1, # 6 Exhibit C-2)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 8, 2008 Received Exhibit SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 Received Exhibits SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 Received Motion SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 7, 2008 3852 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH re 3849 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11 re 3843, 3845, 3846 & 3847 (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3851 Proposed Order re 3849 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11 re 3843, 3845, 3846 & 3847 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3850 Declaration of Nitin Gupta in Support of 3849 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11 re 3843, 3845, 3846 & 3847 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3849 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3849 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11 re 3843, 3845, 3846 & 3847 filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3848 Declaration of Graham Allan in Support of 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 3843 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3847 Declaration of J.G. Nam in Support of 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Manual Filing Notification)(Related document(s) 3843 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3846 Declaration of Roy Weinstein in Support of 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Manual Filing Notification)(Related document(s) 3843 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3845 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III in Support of 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Manual Filing Notification, # 2 Exhibit B - Manual Filing Notification, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F - Manual Filing Notification, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 3843 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3844 Proposed Order re 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 3843 MOTION Hynix's Motion for Relief from Rambus's Remitted Patent Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and 59(e) filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 1, 2008 3832 Transcript of Proceedings before Judge 06/24/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2008. (las, ) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 3831 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/27/08, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2008. (las, ) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 3830 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/23/08, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2008. (las, ) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
June 25, 2008 3798 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3787 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
June 24, 2008 3829 Opposition to Motion FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3798 POSTED ON 6/25/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 3826 Supplemental Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3795 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 3810 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 6/24/2008) re 3719 MOTION to Strike 3664 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF MOTION to Strike 3664 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc., 3788 Emergency MOTION to Seal Third Party Elpida Memory Inc.'s Emergency Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of Elpida Memory, Inc.'s Confidential Information filed by Elpida Memory, Inc., 3723 MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 3797 **DOCUMENT POSTED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Documents Submitted Under Seal by Rambus, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 3796 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Document Submitted Under Seal by Rambus, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Received Opposition SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 3795 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3740 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 3794 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3725 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 3793 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3666 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 3792 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3639 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 23, 2008 3791 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elpida Memory, Inc. re 3790 Declaration in Support, 3788 Emergency MOTION to Seal Third Party Elpida Memory Inc.'s Emergency Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of Elpida Memory, Inc.'s Confidential Information, 3789 Declaration in Support,, (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 3790 Declaration of Kenji Morimoto in Support of 3788 Emergency MOTION to Seal Third Party Elpida Memory Inc.'s Emergency Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of Elpida Memory, Inc.'s Confidential Information filed byElpida Memory, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attestation)(Related document(s) 3788 ) (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 3789 Declaration in Support of 3788 Emergency MOTION to Seal Third Party Elpida Memory Inc.'s Emergency Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of Elpida Memory, Inc.'s Confidential Information Declaration of Isabelle Young in Support of Third Party Elpida Memory Inc.'s Emergency Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of Elpida Memory, Inc.'s Confidential Information filed byElpida Memory, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Attestation)(Related document(s) 3788 ) (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 3788 Emergency MOTION to Seal Third Party Elpida Memory Inc.'s Emergency Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of Elpida Memory, Inc.'s Confidential Information filed by Elpida Memory, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 3787 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) re 3786 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Keith R. D. Hamilton in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), # 2 Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 3786 Memorandum in Opposition re 3745 MOTION to Strike 3736 Declaration in Support,, HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF MOTION to Strike 3736 Declaration in Support,, HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed byRambus, Inc.. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 3785 Memorandum in Opposition to 3747 Hynix's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 2-71 of Reply Declaration of David J. Teece and Sections III(C) and (D) of Rambus's Reply Brief filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 6/23/2008) Modified on 6/29/2008 linking entry to document #3747 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2008 3773 Featured Case ORDER 3743 Granting Permission to Bring Equipment into the Courtroom for 6/24/2008 Hearing. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/19/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3772 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3540) Motion to FIle Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (1182) Motion to FIle Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1578) Motion to FIle Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3771 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal (1155 in 5:06-cv-00244-RMW); (3513 in 5:00-cv-20905-RMW); (1549 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/19/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3770 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3497 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3769 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3494 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3768 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3461) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (1104) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1499) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3767 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3458) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (1155) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1549) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3766 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3440 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3765 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3455 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3764 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3400) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (1050) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1443) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3763 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3403) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (1052) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1446) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3762 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3348 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3761 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3152) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (801) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1189) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3760 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3150) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (799) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1187) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3759 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3160 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3758 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3131) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (780) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1162) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 3757 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3154) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (803) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1191) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 18, 2008 3756 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3111) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 3755 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3124 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 3754 Featured Case SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/18/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 3753 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3099 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 3752 Featured Case SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/18/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 3751 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3064) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (717) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1092) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 3750 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 2991 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 3749 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (2961) Motion To File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (624) Motion To File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (990) Motion To File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 17, 2008 3748 Proposed Order re 3747 HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS 2-71 OF REPLY DECLARATION OF DAVID J. TEECE IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF AND MOTION TO STRIKE SECTIONS III(C) AND (D) OF RAMBUS'S REPLY BRIEF by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/17/2008) Modified on 6/18/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2008 3747 MOTION to Strike 3737 Declaration in Support, HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS 2-71 OF REPLY DECLARATION OF DAVID J. TEECE IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF AND MOTION TO STRIKE SECTIONS III(C) AND (D) OF RAMBUS'S REPLY BRIEF filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 3746 Proposed Order re 3745 MOTION to Strike 3736 Declaration in Support,, HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF MOTION to Strike 3736 Declaration in Support,, HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND RULING ON OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 3745 MOTION to Strike 3736 Declaration in Support,, HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 3744 REPLY to Response to Motion re 3723 MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT HYNIX'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV P.62 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 3743 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST RE EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 9, 2008 3828 Opposition to Motion FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3795 POSTED ON 6/24/2008. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 3827 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3795 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 3825 Reply FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3795 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 3741 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding documents submitted under seal by Rambus, Inc. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received Opposition SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received Supplemental Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received Reply SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 7, 2008 3740 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Keith R.D. Hamilton in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11))(Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 6/7/2008)
June 6, 2008 3739 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing Regarding (1) Reply in Support of Request of Rambus for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief; and (2) Rambus's Opposition to Hynix's Motion to Stay Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62 (Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 3738 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment And Permanent Injunction by Rambus, Inc.. (Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 3737 Declaration of David J. Teece in Support of 3735 Reply Memorandum / Declaration of David J. Teece in Support of Rambus's Request for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief [Exhibits A - C attached] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3735 ) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 3736 Declaration of Sharon Holt in Support of 3735 Reply Memorandum Supplemental Declaration of Sharon Holt in Support of Rambus's Request for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief (Public Redacted Version) filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, part 1, # 9 Exhibit H, part 2, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 3735 ) (Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 3735 Reply Memorandum / Rambus's Reply in Support of ( 3663 ) Request of Rambus for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief [Exhibits A & B attached] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 6/6/2008) Modified text to add linkage on 6/9/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2008 3734 Memorandum in Opposition re 3721 MOTION to Strike 3665 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF MOTION to Strike 3665 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF Rambus's Opposition to Hynix's Motion to Strike and Objections to the Declaration of Sharon Holt in Support of Rambus's Request for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief filed byRambus, Inc.. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 3733 OBJECTIONS to re 3714 Declaration in Support, 3717 Declaration in Support, 3713 Declaration in Support,, 3716 Declaration in Support, Rambus's Objections to Hynix's Declarations Filed in Opposition to Rambus's Request for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief by Rambus, Inc.. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 3732 Memorandum in Opposition re 3723 MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed byRambus, Inc.. (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 3731 Memorandum in Opposition re 3719 MOTION to Strike 3664 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF MOTION to Strike 3664 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed byRambus, Inc.. (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
May 30, 2008 3730 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. / Notice of Entry of Order Granting Rambus Inc.'s Motion to Recapture Privileged Document (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 27, 2008 3824 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3794 POSTED ON 6/24/2008. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 3823 MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3794 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 3822 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3794 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 3821 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3794 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 3820 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3794 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 3819 MEMORANDUM in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3794 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 3742 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2008 Re: Closing Arguments on Equitable Claims and Defenses before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 5/27/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Received Declaration, SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Received Memorandum, SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Received Motion, SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 3729 ERRATA re 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 23, 2008 3728 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 5/23/2008) re 3640 MOTION for New Trial filed by Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3727 Proposed Order re 3725 MOTION re 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5(d) AND 7-11 MOTION re 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5(d) AND 7-11 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING HYNIX'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5(d) AND 7-11 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3726 Declaration of SUSAN van KEULEN in Support of 3725 MOTION re 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5(d) AND 7-11 MOTION re 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5(d) AND 7-11 DECLARATION OF SUSAN van KEULEN IN SUPPORT OF HYNIX'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5(d) AND 7-11 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3725 ) (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3725 MOTION re 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, HYNIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5(d) AND 7-11 filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3724 Proposed Order re 3723 MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3723 MOTION to Stay re 3663 Brief HYNIX'S MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P62 AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3722 Proposed Order re 3721 MOTION to Strike 3665 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF MOTION to Strike 3665 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND RULING ON OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3721 MOTION to Strike 3665 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON HOLT IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3720 Proposed Order re 3719 MOTION to Strike 3664 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF MOTION to Strike 3664 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3719 MOTION to Strike 3664 Declaration in Support HYNIX'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3718 Proposed Order re 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING RAMBUS'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3717 Declaration of JAE H. PARK DECLARATION OF JAE H. PARK IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO RAMBUS'S MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3716 Declaration of ROY WEINSTEIN in Support of 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, DECLARATION OF ROY WEINSTEIN CONCERNING EQUITABLE RELIEF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3711 ) (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3715 EXHIBITS re 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, 3710 Request for Judicial Notice, 3712 Exhibits, Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits 12-17 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 16, # 5 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 3711 , 3710 , 3712 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3714 Declaration of KENNEITH L. NISSLY in Support of 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, DECLARATION OF KENNETH L. NISSLY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO RAMBUS'S MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3711 ) (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3713 Declaration of SUSAN van KEULEN in Support of 3711 Memorandum in Opposition, DECLARATION OF SUSAN van KEULEN IN SUPPORT OF HYNIX'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS IN AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO REQUEST OF RAMBUS FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 3711 ) (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3712 EXHIBITS re 3710 Request for Judicial Notice, of Papers from the Reexaminataions of Rambus Inc.'s Patents filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 3710 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3711 Memorandum in Opposition HYNIX'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO REQUEST OF RAMBUS FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3710 Request for Judicial Notice of Papers From the Reexaminations of Rambus Inc.'s Patents filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 3709 Featured Case ORDER [3708 in 5:00-cv-20905-RMW], [1776 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW], [1334 in 5:06-cv-00244-RMW] Granting Joint Request for Permission to Bring Equipment to the 5/27/2008 Hearing and to Use Loading Dock. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/23/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 22, 2008 3708 Proposed Order Granting Joint Request For Permission To Bring Equipment To Hearing And To Use Loading Dock by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Rambus, Inc.. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 21, 2008 3707 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 3704 to Exceed Page Limits for Opposition and Reply to Request of Rambus for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/21/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 19, 2008 3706 Reply Memorandum re 3659 MOTION / Rambus Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Recapture Privileged Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byRambus, Inc.. (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 16, 2008 3705 Reply Memorandum Re: Third Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Motion for New Trial on Invalidity Due to Prior Art filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 3704 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO REQUEST OF RAMBUS FOR ADDITIONAL DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 15, 2008 3669 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 3659 Rambus's Motion to Recapture Privileged Document filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Yost, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/15/2008) Modified on 5/18/2008 linking entry to document #3659 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2008 3668 STIPULATION STIPULATED MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER DESIGNATING CERTAIN RAMBUS DOCUMENTS "CONFIDENTIAL - OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY" by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 13, 2008 3703 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/27/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3702 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/26/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3701 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/25/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3700 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/24/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3699 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/20/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3698 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/19/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3697 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/18/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3696 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/17/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3695 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/14/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3694 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/13/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3693 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/12/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3692 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/11/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3691 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/10/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3690 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/5/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3689 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/4/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3688 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/3/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3687 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/28/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3686 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/27/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3685 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/26/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3684 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/25/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3683 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/22/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3682 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/21/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3681 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/20/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3680 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/19/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3679 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/14/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3678 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/13/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3677 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/12/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3676 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/11/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3675 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/6/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3674 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/5/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3673 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/4/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3672 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/31/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3671 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/30/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 3670 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/29/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 12, 2008 3818 MEMORANDUM FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3793 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
May 12, 2008 Received Memorandum of Points and Authorities SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
May 9, 2008 3667 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Request of Rambus for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 3666 MOTION Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Keith R.D. Hamilton in Support of Motion, # 2 [Proposed] Order)(Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 3665 Declaration of Sharon Holt in Support of 3663 Brief Rambus's Request for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3663 ) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 3664 Declaration of Robert J. Murphy in Support of 3663 Brief Rambus's Request for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3663 ) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 3663 Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Request of Rambus for Additional Damages and Equitable Relief (Public Redacted Version) filed byRambus, Inc.. (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 3662 Declaration of Peter A. Detre in Support of 3661 Brief Rambus's Response to Hynix's Third Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for New Trial on Invalidity Due to Prior Art filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 3661 ) (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 3661 Brief re 3653 Brief, Rambus's Response to Hynix's Third Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion For New Trial on Invalidity Due to Prior Art filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3653 ) (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 7, 2008 3659 MOTION / Rambus Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Recapture Privileged Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Rambus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2008 01:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rollin Ransom in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion to Recapture Privileged Document [Exhibits A - N attached], # 2 Declaration of Neil Steinberg in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion to Recapture Privileged Document)(Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 6, 2008 3658 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/1/2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge (original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW).(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2008)
May 1, 2008 3660 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 5/1/2008) re (3595 in 5:00-cv-20905-RMW) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law / Rambus's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(A) filed by Rambus, Inc., (1633 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law / Rambus's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(A) filed by Rambus Inc.,, (1237 in 5:06-cv-00244-RMW) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law / Rambus's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(A) filed by Rambus Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2008)
April 30, 2008 3657 Reply Memorandum re 3640 MOTION for New Trial [with Corrected Table of Authorities] filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics U.K., Ltd, Hyundai Electronics Deutschland GmbH. (McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 3656 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. RAMBUS'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF FEDERAL CIRCUIT OPINION IN SAMSUNG APPEAL (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 25, 2008 3655 EXHIBITS re 3654 Declaration in Support,, Hynix's Third Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for New Trial on Invalidity Due to Prior Art filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit M, # 5 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 3654 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 25, 2008 3654 Declaration of Theodore G. Brown, III in Support of 3653 Brief, Third Supplemental in Support of Its Motion for New Trial on Invalidity Due to Prior Art filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 3653 ) (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 25, 2008 3653 Brief Third Supplemental in Support of Its Motion for New Trial on Invalidity Due to Prior Art filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 24, 2008 3652 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 3657 . *** Reply Memorandum In Support of 3640 Manufacturers' Rule 59 Motion for New Trial filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reply Brief)(Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 4/24/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 linking entry to document #3640(dhm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/5/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2008 3651 Reply Memorandum In support of Manufacturers' Brief re Equitable Defenses filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
April 24, 2008 3650 Manufacturers' Reply In Support of 3636 Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law (FRCP 50(b)) filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 4/24/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 linking entry to document #3636 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2008 3649 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of D.C. Circuit Opinion in FTC Appeal (Attachments: # 1 D.C. Circuit Opinion)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 17, 2008 3648 Memorandum in Opposition re 3640 MOTION for New Trial Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven M. Perry in Support of Opposition to Motion for a New Trial, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Steven M. Perry)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 4/17/2008)
April 17, 2008 3647 Response to 3637 Manufacturers' Brief re: Equitable Defenses filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3637 ) (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/17/2008) Modified on 4/18/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2008 3646 Memorandum in Opposition to 3636 Manufacturers' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 50(b)) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/17/2008) Modified on 4/18/2008 Counsel failed to link entry to document #3636 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2008 3645 RESPONSE to re 3643 Letter From Hynix Regarding Recent Federal Circuit Opinion by Rambus, Inc.. (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
April 14, 2008 3644 RESPONSE to re 3627 Order Requesting Information About Jury Questionnaires by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 3643 Letter from Theodore G. Brown, III re PowerOasis judicial opinion relevant to JMOL re New Trial. (Brown, Theodore) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 11, 2008 3817 MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3792 POSTED ON 6/24/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 Received Exhibits SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 3642 Featured Case 2ND AMENDED ORDER DIRECTING JURY COMMISSIONER TO FURNISH DAILY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/11/08. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 3641 Declaration of Aaron Craig in Support of 3640 MOTION for New Trial filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit X, # 24 Exhibit Y, # 25 Exhibit Z, # 26 Exhibit AA, # 27 Exhibit BB, # 28 Exhibit CC, # 29 Exhibit DD, # 30 Exhibit EE, # 31 Exhibit FF, # 32 Exhibit GG, # 33 Exhibit HH, # 34 Exhibit II, # 35 Exhibit JJ, # 36 Exhibit KK, # 37 Exhibit LL, # 38 Exhibit MM, # 39 Exhibit NN)(Related document(s) 3640 ) (McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 10, 2008 3640 MOTION for New Trial filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 3639 MOTION to Seal Exhibits J, S, U, W, GG, and JJ to the Declaration of Aaron Craig in Support of Manufacturers' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 59 and McCracken Declaration in Support Thereof filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 3638 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits J, S, U, W, GG, and JJ to the Declaration of Aaron Craig in Support of Manufacturers' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 59 (McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 3637 TRIAL BRIEF [Manufacturers' Brief Re: Equitable Defenses] by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 3636 MANUFACTURERS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (FED. R. CIV. PROC. 50(B)) filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Belinda M. Vega In Support of Manufacturers' Rule 50(b) Motion, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 4/10/2008) Modified on 4/18/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2008 3635 Response re 3627 Order REQUESTING INFORMATION ABOUT DISSEMINATION OF JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE byRambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 9, 2008 3634 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting (3628) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; granting (1267) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; granting (1664) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 9, 2008 3633 Proposed Order Denying Manufacturers' Renewed Administrative Request to Exceed Page Limits for Motion for New Trial and Reply by Rambus, Inc.. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 9, 2008 3632 Memorandum in Opposition re 3628 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for New Trial filed byRambus, Inc.. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 8, 2008 3631 Proposed Order re 3630 MOTION to Shorten Time on Renewed Request to Exceed Page Limit by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 3630 MOTION to Shorten Time on 3628 Renewed Request to Exceed Page Limit filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 4/8/2008) Modified on 4/9/2008 linking entry to document #3628 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2008 3629 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Request to Exceed Page Limit by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 3628 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for New Trial filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 3627 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION ABOUT DISSEMINATION OF JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE. All counsel to report to the court within five days. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 3625 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying (3618) Motion to exceed page limits in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; denying (1259) Motion to exceed page limits in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; denying (1656) Motion to exceed page limits in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. The motion is denied without prejudice. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 7, 2008 3626 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Case Management [3617 in 5:00-cv-20905-RMW]; [1655 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW]; [1258 in 5:06-cv-00244-RMW]; [754 in 5:05-cv-02298-RMW] Claims Constructions and Summary Judgment Motions set for 6/4/2008 09:00 AM and 6/5/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose in Case Nos. C-05-00334; C-05-02298; C-06-00244. Hearing on Manufacturers' Renewed Motions Pursuant to FRCP 50 ad 59 set for 5/1/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose in Case Nos. C-00-20905; C-05-00334; C-06-00244. Hearing on Hynix's Motion for a New Trail on Invalidity Due to Prior Art set for 5/23/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose in Case No. C-00-20905. Hearing on Rambus's Request for Supplemental Damages and Further Equitable Relief set for 6/18/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose in Case No. C-00-20905. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 3624 STIPULATION STIPULATION REGARDING COORDINATED CASES EXHIBITS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 3623 Proposed Order re 3622 Memorandum in Opposition, 3618 MOTION To Exceed Page Limit for Motion for New Trial and Reply by Rambus, Inc.. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 3622 Memorandum in Opposition re 3618 MOTION To Exceed Page Limit for Motion for New Trial and Reply filed byRambus, Inc.. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 3621 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER Directing Jury Commissioner to Furnish Daily Refreshments. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/31/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 4, 2008 3620 Proposed Order Regarding 3618 Motion to Exceed Page Limit by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Modified on 4/7/2008 linking entry to document #3618 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 3619 Declaration of Belinda M. Vega In Support of Miscellaneous Adm. Request to Exceed Page Limit filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Modified text on 4/7/2008 to conform with document caption and linked entry to document #3618 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 3618 MOTION To Exceed Page Limit for Motion for New Trial and Reply filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 3617 Proposed Order Regarding Further Case Management by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Rambus, Inc., Micron Technology Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics, Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
March 31, 2008 3616 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte re: 2067 2068 2069 2070 2071 2073 2087 patent trial post-trial motions. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 28, 2008 3615 Jury Notes. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 3614 Exhibit List. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 26, 2008 3613 JURY VERDICT. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 26, 2008 3611 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 3/26/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/26/2008). (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/26/2008)
March 25, 2008 3612 Jury Instructions. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 3610 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/25/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/25/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 3596 OBJECTIONS to Rambus Inc.'s Objections to the Court's [Proposed] Special Verdict Form; Supplemental Objections to the Court's Post-Evidence Jury Instructions by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 24, 2008 3609 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/24/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/24/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2008)
March 24, 2008 3595 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law / Rambus's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(A) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 24, 2008 3594 OBJECTIONS to Manufacturers' Objections To Court's Post-Evidence Jury Instructions by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 24, 2008 3593 Proposed Form of Verdict by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics Indust. Co., Ltd., Hyundai Electronics America, INC. Proposed Verdict Form Pursuant to FRCP 49(a). (Attachments: # 1 Alternative Proposed Verdict Form Pursuant to FRCP 49(a))(McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 24, 2008 3592 OBJECTIONS to Rambus Inc.'s Objections to Manufacturers' Revised [Proposed] Special Verdict Form by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 23, 2008 3591 OBJECTIONS to Rambus's Proposed Verdict Form Pursuant to FRCP 49(a) by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd. (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 3/23/2008)
March 23, 2008 3590 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Manufacturers' Motion for Judgement as a Matter of Law (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 50(a)) filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/23/2008)
March 23, 2008 3589 Proposed Jury Instructions by Rambus, Inc. Rambuss Objection to Manufacturers Proposed Supplemental Jury Instruction Regarding Dates of Litigation; Rambuss Proposed Jury Instruction Regarding Dates of Litigation. (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 3/23/2008)
March 23, 2008 3588 Proposed Jury Instructions by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH Manufacturers' Proposed Supplemental Jury Instruction Regarding Dates of Litigation. (Beynon, John) (Filed on 3/23/2008)
March 22, 2008 3587 OBJECTIONS to re 3583 Proposed Form of Verdict / Rambus Inc.'s Objections to Manufacturers Revised Proposed Verdict Form by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/22/2008)
March 22, 2008 3586 Proposed Jury Instructions by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc. JOINT SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 3/22/2008)
March 21, 2008 3585 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH OF MANUFACTURERS' PROFFER OF JOSEPH MCALEXANDER'S TESTIMONY (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 3584 OBJECTIONS to re 3576 Proposed Jury Instructions, Rambus Inc.'s Objections to the Manufacturers' Revised Proposed Jury Instructions (Post Evidence) by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 3583 Proposed Form of Verdict by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd Manufacturers' Proposed Verdict Form. (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 3582 EXHIBITS Manufacturers' List Of Additional Pages Of Certain Exhibits To Be Adminited filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 3581 MOTION to Exclude Argument Regarding Post-2000 Litigation With Nanya by Rambus, Inc.. (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/21/2008)** Modified on 3/26/2008. Counsel posted document using incorrect event** (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2008 3579 Proposed Form of Verdict by Rambus, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 49(A). (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 20, 2008 3608 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/20/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/20/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2008)
March 20, 2008 3580 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/22/2008 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge (original transcript filed in C00-20905 RMW). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 20, 2008 3578 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of D.S. Chung (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 20, 2008 3577 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Additional Transcripts of Video Testimony of Willibald Meyer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 20, 2008 3576 Proposed Jury Instructions by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH Manufacturers' Revised Proposed Jury Instructions. (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 20, 2008 3575 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Portions of ABA Antitrust Section Model Jury Instructions (2005) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 20, 2008 3574 Proposed Jury Instructions by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Second Revised Proposed Jury Instructions (Post-Evidence). (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 19, 2008 3607 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/19/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/19/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3573 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of John Kelly (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3572 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Brent Keeth (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3571 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Kevin Ryan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3570 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Tyler Lowrey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3569 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Gerald Lane (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3568 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Gordon Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3567 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Jung Bae Lee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3566 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of J.J. Lee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3565 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Gwang Ma Han (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3564 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of C.H. Kim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 19, 2008 3563 OBJECTIONS to re 2992 Proposed Jury Instructions by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 18, 2008 3606 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/18/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/18/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3562 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3559 Trial Brief Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Richard Rapp filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Related document(s) 3559 ) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3561 TRIAL BRIEF / Rambus Inc.'s Submission Regarding Manufacturers' Motion to Admit Into Evidence Additional Pages Referred to By Joseph McAlexander by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3560 Request for Judicial Notice of Filing Date of Northern District Action Between Rambus and Micron filed byRambus, Inc.. (Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3559 MOTION to strike testimony of Dr. Rapp by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support)(Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 3/18/2008)** Modified on 3/24/2008. Counsel posted document using incorrect event** (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2008 3558 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Manufacturers' Notice of Lodging of Testimony of Howard Sussman Played at Trial (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3557 Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 3556 Memorandum in Opposition, to Rambus's Trial Brief Regarding the Manufacturers' McGhee and Kelley Deposition Designations filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 3556 ) (Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3556 Memorandum in Opposition to Rambus's Trial Brief Regarding the Manufacturers' McGhee and Kelley Deposition Designations filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3555 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH re 3554 Declaration in Support,, 3553 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 to Seal Exhibits A, C, & H to the Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of Manufacturers' Opposition to Rambus's Trial Brief Regarding the Manufacturers' McGhee and Kelley Deposition Designations (Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3554 Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 3553 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 to Seal Exhibits A, C, & H to the Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of Manufacturers' Opposition to Rambus's Trial Brief Regarding the Manufacturers' Opposition to Rambus's Trial Brief Regarding the Manufacturers' McGhee and Kelley Deposition Designations filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3553 ) (Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 3553 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 to Seal Exhibits A, C, & H to the Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of Manufacturers' Opposition to Rambus's Trial Brief Regarding the Manufacturers' McGhee and Kelley Deposition Designations filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 17, 2008 3777 EXHIBIT B FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3772 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3605 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/17/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/17/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 Received Trial Brief SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3552 TRIAL BRIEF Rambus's Trial Brief in Support of Objections to the Manufacturers' McGhee and Kelley "Rebuttal" Designations by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3551 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Kenneth McGhee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3550 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of I.S. Hwang (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3549 TRIAL BRIEF Objecting to Rambus Exhibit 6421 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET 3520 ) by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/17/2008) Modified on 3/20/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2008 3548 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH MANUFACTURERS' Notice of Lodging of Designated Trial Testimony of Howard Sussman (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3547 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH MANUFACTURERS' Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Betty Prince (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3546 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics Indust. Co., Ltd., Hyundai Electronics America, INC., Hyundai Electronics Deutschland GmbH Manufacturers' Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Byeong Seok Oh (Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3545 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH MANUFACTURERS' Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Kenneth McGhee (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3544 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH MANUFACTURERS' Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition and Trial Testimony of Gordon Kelley (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 3543 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Opposition To Rambus' Trial Brief Objecting To Improper Rebuttal Designations And Testimony by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 16, 2008 3542 Featured Case ORDER regarding the scope of evidence related to post-Hitachi litigation conduct. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2008)
March 16, 2008 3541 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. re 3537 Trial Brief / Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Rambus's Trial Brief Objecting to Improper Rebuttal Designations and Testimony (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/16/2008)
March 16, 2008 3540 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) re 3537 Trial Brief filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), # 2 Proposed Order)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/16/2008)
March 16, 2008 3539 Memorandum in Opposition to 3527 Rambus's Trial Brief to Preclude Cross Examination of Dr. Farmwald re Validity and Ownership filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Craig In Support)(Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 3/16/2008) Modified on 3/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2008 3538 Memorandum in Opposition to Rambus's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena of Laura Stark filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Craig In Support)(Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 3/16/2008)
March 16, 2008 3537 TRIAL BRIEF / Rambus's Trial Brief Objecting to Improper Rebuttal Designations and Testimony [Exhibits A - D attached] by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/16/2008)
March 16, 2008 3536 Manufacturers' Opposition to 3528 Rambus's Trial Brief Seeking to Preclude Use of Stock Sale Demonstative With Mike Farmwald by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/16/2008) Modified on 3/19/2008 linking entry to document #3528 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2008 3535 MEMORANDUM in Opposition / Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief Objecting to Rambus's Demonstratives For Use With Dr. David J. Teece filed byRambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/16/2008)
March 16, 2008 3534 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3530 Trial Brief,, Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Manufacturers' Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Expert Testimony and Improper Articles and Video for Michael Farmwald filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3530 ) (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/16/2008)
March 16, 2008 3533 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3531 Trial Brief, Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Allow Cross-Examination of Dr. David J. Teece Under Rule 608 filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven M. Perry in Support of Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Allow Cross-Examination of Dr. David J. Teece Under Rule 608 [Exhibits A - C attached])(Related document(s) 3531 ) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/16/2008)
March 15, 2008 3532 Opposition to 3450 Rambus's Motion For Judgment As A Matter of Law (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 50(A)) by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/15/2008) Modified on 3/20/2008 linking entry to document #3450 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2008 3604 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/14/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/14/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 3531 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Allow Cross-Examination of Dr. David J. Teece Under Rule 608 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 3530 MOTION to Exclude Undisclosed Expert Testimony and Improper Articles and Video for Michael Farmwald by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics Indust. Co., Ltd., Hyundai Electronics America, INC., Hyundai Electronics U.K., Ltd, Hyundai Electronics Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Craig and Supporting Exhibits)(McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 3/14/2008) Modified on 3/19/2008. Counsel posted document using incorrect event. Document is a motion not a trial brief (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2008 3529 Exhibit List /Hynix's Submission of List of Hynix/Rambus Litigations, Excerpts from Trial Transcript Re: Post January 2000 Litigation Strategy, And Requested Curative Jury Instruction by Hynix Semiconductor Inc... (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 3528 TRIAL BRIEF / Rambus Inc.'s Trial Brief to Preclude Use of Manufacturers' Stock Sales Demonstrative With Mike Farmwald by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 3527 TRIAL BRIEF Rambus Inc.'s Trial Brief to Preclude Questioning of Dr. Farmwald Regarding Issues Relating to Patent Ownership and/or Patent Validity by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 3526 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Howard Kalter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 3525 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Willibald Meyer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 3524 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Farhad Tabrizi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 3523 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena Issued to Laura Stark filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 13, 2008 3603 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/13/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/13/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2008)
March 12, 2008 3778 Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3771 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 3602 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/12/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/12/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 Received Opposition SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 3522 TRIAL BRIEF Rambus's Supplemental Submission Regarding May 1996 JEDEC Training Workshop by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 3521 Declaration of Belinda Vega in Support of 3520 Trial Brief //Manufacturers' Objecting to Exhibit 6421 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 3520 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 3520 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 3549 . *** TRIAL BRIEF //Manufacturers' Trial Brief Objecting To Rambus' Exhibit 6421 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/12/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2008 3519 EXHIBITS re 3511 Declaration in Support, ***Correction*** Exhibit C filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3511 ) (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 3518 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Revised Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of I.S. Hwang (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 3517 Memorandum in Opposition (MOSAID RJN Opposition) filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Craig)(Becher, Robert) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 3516 TRIAL BRIEF / Request by Rambus for Curative Instruction to Address Mr. Rubys Mini-Summation on Validity Issues by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 3515 TRIAL BRIEF / Rambus's Brief in Support of Admission of February 2000 JEDEC Board Minutes and Related Documents by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven M. Perry in Support of Rambus's Brief Regarding Admission of February 2000 JEDEC Minutes and Related Documents, # 2 Exhibit A to Perry Declaration, # 3 Exhibits B & C to Perry Declaration, # 4 Exhibits D, E & F to Perry Declaration, # 5 Exhibit G to Perry Declaration)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 11, 2008 3784 EXHIBIT A FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3767 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3781 EXHIBIT D FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3768 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3780 EXHIBIT B FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3768 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3776 EXHIBIT A, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3769 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3775 TRIAL BRIEF FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3769 POSTED ON 6/19/2008(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3774 EXHIBIT C FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3770 POSTED ON 6/19/2008. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3601 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/11/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/11/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 Received Opposition SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 Received Motion SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 EXHIBIT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 Received Trial Brief (SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3514 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Exhibit 5574 (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3513 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) re 3512 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Polse in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), # 2 Proposed Order)(Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3512 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3491 Trial Brief / Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Exhibit 5574 filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3491 ) (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3511 Declaration of Sven Raz in Support of 3510 Trial Brief, filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 3510 ) (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3510 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Brief to Preclude Admission of February 2000 Board Minutes and Related Documents and Testimony of Kenneth McGhee by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3509 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Opposition to 3470 Rambus, Inc.'s Motion to Strike a Sentence Each from the Testimony of Mr. Weinstein and Dr. Gilbert by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 3/11/2008) Modified on 3/14/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3470(dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2008 3508 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Manufacturers' Notice of Lodging of Deposition Testimony of Gordon Kelley Played at Trial (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3507 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Kenneth McGhee (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3506 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Kenneth Hurley (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3505 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3472 Trial Brief, / Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Further Testimony From Farhad Tabrizi filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3472 ) (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3504 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3479 Trial Brief, / Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Brief to Exclude Demonstratives and Testimony of Richard Rapp filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3479 ) (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3503 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3480 Trial Brief / Rambus Inc.'s Response to Hynix's Trial Brief Objecting to the Presentation of Hynix's Response to Interrogatory No. 1 Relating to Market filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott L. Cole in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Response to Hynix's Trial Brief Objecting to the Presentation of Hynix's Response to Interrogatory No. 1 Relating to Market)(Related document(s) 3480 ) (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3502 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3466 Trial Brief, Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Deposition Testimony of Tyler Lowrey filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3466 ) (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3501 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3474 Trial Brief, Rambus's Opposition to the Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Certain Testimony of Ron Maltiel filed byRambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 3474 ) (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3500 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3468 Trial Brief, Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Deposition Testimony of Jae Jin Lee filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3468 ) (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 3499 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3467 Trial Brief, Rambus's Opposition to the Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude the Deposition Testimony of Gerald Lane filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3467 ) (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 10, 2008 3782 EXHIBIT B FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3765 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3600 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/10/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/10/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3498 Declaration of Sven Raz in Support of 3497 MOTION to Seal Document 3490 Declaration in Support, [Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Exhibit C to the Declaration of Sven Rax in Support of Mfrs' Brief to Preclude Admission of Trial Exhibit 9022] MOTION to Seal Document 3490 Declaration in Support, [Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Exhibit C to the Declaration of Sven Rax in Support of Mfrs' Brief to Preclude Admission of Trial Exhibit 9022] filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3497 ) (Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3497 MOTION to Seal Document 3490 Declaration in Support, [Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Exhibit C to the Declaration of Sven Rax in Support of Mfrs' Brief to Preclude Admission of Trial Exhibit 9022] filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3496 Proposed Order re 3494 Granting Manuf's Motion to File Docs Under Seal by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3495 Declaration of Belinda Vega in support of Manuf's Miscl. Adminstrative Req to File Docs Under Seal filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3494 MOTION to File Under Seal by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008)** Modified on 3/12/2008. COUNSEL POSTED DOCUMENT USING INCORRECT EVENT. DOCUMENT IS A MOTION NOT A TRIAL BRIEF**(dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3493 Declaration in Support of 3491 Trial Brief //ISO of the Manuf's Trial Brief to Exclude Exh 5574 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 3491 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3492 Declaration of Belinda Vega //ISO of Manuf's Miscl. Administrative Req to File Docs Under Seal filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3491 Trial Brief To Exclude Exhibit 5574 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3490 Declaration of Sven Raz in Support of 3488 Trial Brief, [Manufacturers' Brief to Preclude Admission of Trial Exhibit 9022 through Mr. Walther and Related Testimony] filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 3488 ) (Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3489 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Revised Notice of Lodging of Exhibits in Connection with Deposition Testimony of Willi Meyer (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3488 TRIAL BRIEF [Manufacturers' Brief to Preclude Admission of Trial Exhibit 9022 through Mr. Walther and Related Testimony] by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3487 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Revised Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Yun-Ho Choi (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3486 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Revised Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Willi Meyer (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3485 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Revised Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Kevin Kilbuck (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3484 Declaration of Belinda Vega in Support of 3480 Trial Brief filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 3480 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3483 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Revised Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Gwang Ma Han (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3482 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Revised Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of D.S. Chung (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3481 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Revised Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Chang Hyun Kim (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3480 TRIAL BRIEF //Hynix's Trial Brief Objecting to the Presentation of Hynix's Response to Interrogary No. 1 Relating to Market by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3479 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Motion to Exclude Demonstratives and Testimony of Richard Rapp by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics Indust. Co., Ltd., Hyundai Electronics America, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Craig and Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibits B and C, # 3 Exhibits D and E, # 4 Exhibit F)(McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 3/10/2008) ** Modified on 3/12/2008. COUNSEL POSTED DOCUMENT USING INCORRECT EVENT. DOCUMENT IS A MOTION NOT A TRIAL BRIEF** (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3478 Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 3474 Trial Brief, filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 3474 ) (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3477 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Gerald Lane (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3476 Request for Judicial Notice of Micron's Amended Answer in Mosaid Litigation [Exhibits A & B attached] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3475 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Jung-Bae Lee (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3474 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Certain Testimony of Ron Maltiel by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3473 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of John Kelly (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3472 TRIAL BRIEF HYNIX'S TRIAL BRIEF TO PRECLUDE FURTHER TESTIMONY FROM FARHAD TABRIZI by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frenza, Karin) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3471 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of J.J. Lee (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3470 MOTION to Strike Rambus's Motion to Strike One Weinstein Sentence and One Gilbert Sentence from the Trial Transcript filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3469 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of I.S. Hwang (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3468 TRIAL BRIEF MANUFACTURERS' TRIAL BRIEF TO EXCLUDE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF JAE JIN LEE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3467 TRIAL BRIEF MANUFACTURERS' TRIAL BRIEF TO EXCLUDE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GERALD LANE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3466 MOTION to Exclude Deposition Testimony of Tyler Lowrey by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics Indust. Co., Ltd., Hyundai Electronics America, INC., Hyundai Electronics U.K., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Craig and Exhibits A-B)(McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 3/10/2008)** Modified on 3/12/2008, COUNSEL POSTED DOCUMENT USING INCORRECT EVENT. DOCUMENT IS A MOTION NOT A TRIAL BRIEF** (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3465 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3436 Trial Brief Regarding the Timing and Relevance of Evidence Relating to Causation filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics Indust. Co., Ltd., Hyundai Electronics America, INC., Hyundai Electronics Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Craig and Exhibits A-H, # 2 Exhibits I-O)(Related document(s) 3436 ) (McCracken, Rachael) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3464 Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 3463 Brief, [Manufacturers' Trial Brief] To Preclude Rambus From Playing Certain Gordon Kelley Designations and From Offering Trial Exhibits 8294, 8245, 8292, 8304, 6061, And 6069 Into Evidence Through Gordon Kelley filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 3463 ) (Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3463 Brief [Manufacturers' Trial Brief] To Preclude Rambus From Playing Certain Gordon Kelley Designations And From Offering Trial Exhibits 8294, 8245, 8292, 8304, 6061 And 6069 Into Evidence Through Gordon Kelley filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3462 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. / Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Robert Murphy From Testifying Regarding the Mitsubishi Documents and Introduction Dates for Certain Products (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3461 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) re 3449 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Detre in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), # 2 Proposed Order)(Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3460 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus from Playing Certain Gordon Kelley Designations and from Offering Trial Exhibits 8294, 8245, 8292, 8304, 6061, and 6069 into Evidence through Gordon Kelley filed byRambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3459 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. / Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Rambus's Motion for Judgment on Certain of Manufacturers' Claims and Defenses (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 52(c)) (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3458 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) re 3444 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings / Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on Certain of Manufacturers' Claims and Defenses (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 52(c)) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Polse in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), # 2 Proposed Order)(Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3457 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 3455 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH (Beynon, John) (Filed on 3/10/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3456 Declaration of John Beynon in Support of 3455 MOTION to Seal [Miscellaneous Administrative Request] Exhibit B To The Declaration Of John Beynon In Support Of Manufacturers' Trial Brief To Preclude Robert J. Murphy From Testifying Regarding The Mitsubishi Documents And Introduction Dates F MOTION to Seal [Miscellaneous Administrative Request] Exhibit B To The Declaration Of John Beynon In Support Of Manufacturers' Trial Brief To Preclude Robert J. Murphy From Testifying Regarding The Mitsubishi Documents And Introduction Dates F filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3455 ) (Beynon, John) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3455 MOTION to Seal [Miscellaneous Administrative Request] Exhibit B To The Declaration Of John Beynon In Support Of Manufacturers' Trial Brief To Preclude Robert J. Murphy From Testifying Regarding The Mitsubishi Documents And Introduction Dates For Certain Products filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Beynon, John) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3454 Proposed Jury Instruction regarding Litigation Strategy by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/10/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3453 Declaration of John Beynon in Support of 3452 Brief, [Manufacturers' Trial Brief] To Preclude Robert J. Murphy From Testifying Regarding The Mitsubishi Documents And Introduction Dates For Certain Products filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 3452 ) (Beynon, John) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3452 Brief [Manufacturers' Trial Brief] To Preclude Robert J. Murphy From Testifying Regarding The Mitsubishi Documents And Introduction Dates For Certain Products filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Beynon, John) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3451 TRIAL BRIEF Rambus's Revised Trial Brief Regarding Relevance and Timing of Evidence Relating to Causation by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3450 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 50(A)) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3449 Memorandum in Opposition / Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Robert Murphy From Testifying Regarding the Mitsubishi Documents and Introducing Dates for Certain Products filed byRambus, Inc.. (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3446 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3438 Brief, Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Manufacturers' Brief to Preclude Certain Testimony by Mr. Murphy filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3438 ) (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3444 MOTION for Judgment on Certain of Manufacturers' Claims and Defenses (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 52(c)) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/10/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3443 Memorandum in Opposition Manufacturers' Opposition to Rambus' Objections to Counter-designations for Mark Kellogg filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3442 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 3440 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH (Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3441 Declaration of Sven Raz In Support of 3440 Miscellaneous Administrative Request To Seal Document filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 linking entry to document #3440 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 3440 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to the Declaration of Sven Raz In Support of the Manufacturers' Brief To Preclude Certain Testimony By Mr. Murphy filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3439 Declaration of Sven Raz in Support of 3438 Brief, [Manufacturers' Brief] To Preclude Certain Testimony By Mr. Murphy filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 3438 ) (Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3438 Brief [Manufacturers' Brief] To Preclude Certain Testimony By Mr. Murphy filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Raz, Sven) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 10, 2008 3437 Featured Case ORDER regarding trial motions related to Rambus's use of prior testimony at trial. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/9/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 7, 2008 3436 TRIAL BRIEF Rambus's Trial Brief Regarding Relevance and Timing of Evidence Relating to Causation by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 3435 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH MANUFACTURERS' NOTICE OF LODGING OF TRANSCRIPT OF VIDEO TESTIMONY OF DAVID MOORING (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(VanKeulen, Susan) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 3434 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Terry Walther (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 3433 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Kevin Ryan (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 3432 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Keith Weinstock (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 3431 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Gordon Kelley (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 3430 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Brent Keeth (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 6, 2008 3783 Opposition with Exhibit A FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3763 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3779 OPPOSITION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3764 POSTED ON 6/19/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 Received Opposition SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3429 TRIAL BRIEF Rambus's Trial Brief in Support of Its Objection to the Manufacturers' "Beyond the Scope" Designation from Mark Kellogg Testimony by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3428 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Tyler Lowrey (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3427 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Mark Kellogg (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3426 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Gwang Ma Han (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3425 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of D.S. Chung (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3424 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Alan Grossmeier (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3422 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3394) Motion to Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (1042) Motion to Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1436) Motion to Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 6, 2008 3418 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3390) Motion to Seal Document in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (1038) Motion to Seal Document in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1432) Motion to Seal Document in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 5, 2008 3599 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/5/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/5/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3414 Memorandum in Opposition Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Alleged Theft of Alleged Inventions filed byRambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3413 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Seong-Soo Kim (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3412 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Myungho Kim (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3411 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3250) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (898) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1289) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008) Modified on 3/10/2008 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2008 3410 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3266 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3409 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 3230 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3407 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3304) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (953) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1349) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3406 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3273) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (923) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1316) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3405 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3290) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (939) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1334) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3404 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. re 3398 Memorandum in Opposition, / Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus From Playing Certain Testimony of Willie Liu and Offering Exhibit 7356 (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3403 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) re 3398 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Polse in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), # 2 Proposed Order)(Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3402 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting (3316) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:00-cv-20905-RMW; Granting (965) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; Granting (1359) Motion to File Documents Under Seal in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3401 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. re 3397 Memorandum in Opposition, / Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus From Playing Designations From Samsung Witnesses and Admitting Samsung Documents (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3400 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) re 3397 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), # 2 Proposed Order)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3399 Corrected Exhibit B to 3393 the Declaration of John Beynon in Support of 3392 Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus from Playing Designations from Samsung Witnesses and Admitting Samsung Documents filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3393 ) (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3398 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3387 Trial Brief, Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus From Playing Certain Testimony of Willie Liu and Offering Exhibit 7356 filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3387 ) (Polse, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 3397 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3392 Trial Brief, / Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus From Playing Designations From Samsung Witnesses and Admitting Samsung Documents filed byRambus, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3392 ) (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 4, 2008 3598 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/4/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/4/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3448 EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3422 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3447 EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3418 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3445 TRIAL BRIEF FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3418 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 Received Exhibit F SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 Received Exhibit E SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 Received Exhibit D SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 Received Exhibit C SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding documents submitted under seal by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 Received Exhibits SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 Received Trial Brief SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3396 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH re 3392 Trial Brief, (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3395 Declaration of John Beynon in Support of 3394 MOTION to Seal Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 to Seal Exhibits C,D,E & F to the Declaration of John Beynon In Support of Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus From Playing Designations filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3394 ) (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3394 MOTION to Seal Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 to Seal Exhibits C,D,E & F to the Declaration of John Beynon In Support of Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus From Playing Designations From Samsung Witnesses and Admitting Samsung Documents filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3393 Declaration of John Beynon in Support of 3392 Trial Brief, filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2** Exhibit B FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 3399 **, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 3392 ) (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/4/2008) Modified on 3/5/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/6/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2008 3392 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus From Playing Designations From Samsung Witnesses and Admitting Samsung Documents by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3391 Proposed Order Granting Manufacturers' Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Ellard, Jan) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3390 MOTION to Seal Document Manufacturers' Motion for Administrative relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Ellard, Jan) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3389 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude rambus from Playing Certain Testimony of Willie Liu and Offering Exhibit 7356 (Ellard, Jan) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3388 Declaration of Jan E. Ellard in Support of 3387 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus from Playing Certain Testimony of Willie Liu and Offering Exhibit 7356 filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Ellard, Jan) (Filed on 3/4/2008) Modified on 3/5/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3387 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2008 3387 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus from Playing Certain Testimony of Willie Liu and Offering Exhibit 7356 [Redacted Version] by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Ellard, Jan) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3386 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Kye Hyun Kyung (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3385 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Chang Hyun Kim (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3384 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Yun-Ho Choi (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3383 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc. of Lodging of Deposition Testimony of Tate Played in Court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 3382 Opposition to 3368 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Deposition Designations of Edmund Chung [Exhibit A attached] filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/4/2008) Modified on 3/5/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3368 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2008 3381 Opposition to 3375 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Rambus Exhibit 5131H and Demonstrative R129 [Exhibit A attached] filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 3/4/2008) Modified on 3/5/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3375 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2008 3380 Opposition to 3370 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Certain Testimony by Carl Everett [Exhibit A attached] filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Hamilton, Keith) (Filed on 3/4/2008) Modified on 3/5/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3370 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2008 3379 Opposition to 3369 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Certain Testimony by Allen Roberts filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/4/2008) Modified on 3/5/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3369 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2008 3597 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/3/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/3/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3378 Appendix re 3377 Trial Brief //Mfgs' 3/3/08 Chart ISO Motion to Admit Into Evidence Authenticated Exhibits and Add'l Pages of Exhibits Partially In Evidence filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) 3377 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3377 TRIAL BRIEF //Mfgs' March 3, 2008 Trial Brief ISO Motion to Admit Into Evidence Authenticated Exhibits & Add'l Pages of Exhibits Partially In Evidence by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3376 Declaration of Belinda M. Vega in Support of 3375 Trial Brief filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 3375 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3375 TRIAL BRIEF //Mfgs' Trial Brief To Exclude Rambus Exhibit 5131H and Demonstrative R129 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3374 Proposed Order re 3372 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3373 Declaration of Belinda M. Vega in Support of 3372 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) 3372 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3372 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3371 Declaration of Belinda M. Vega in Support of 3369 Trial Brief, 3370 Trial Brief filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 3369 , 3370 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3370 TRIAL BRIEF //Mfgs' Trial Brief to Exclude Certain Testimony By Carl Everett by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3369 TRIAL BRIEF //Mfgs' Trial Brief To Exclude Certain Testimony By Allen Roberts by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3368 TRIAL BRIEF //Mfgs' Trial Brief To Exclude Deposition Designations of Edmund Chung by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3363 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Willie Liu (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3362 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Howard Kalter (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3361 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Ed Chung (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 Received Trial Brief SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 3360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 2, 2008 3359 TRIAL BRIEF MFRS TRIAL BRIEF TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT CONCERNING MANUFACTURERS ALLEGED THEFT OF RAMBUSS ALLEGED INVENTIONS by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/2/2008)
March 2, 2008 3358 Rambus's Opposition to [3346 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus From Playing Certain Designations From Kevin Kilbuck's Deposition and Trial Exhibit 6039A filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2008) Modified on 3/3/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document # 3346 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2008 3357 Rambus's Opposition to 3343 Manufacturers' Motion to Exclude Testimony of and Exhibits For Use With Karlheinz Horninger filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2008) Modified on 3/3/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document # 3343 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2008 3356 Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to 3340 Manufacturers' Trial Brief Regarding Prior Testimony Designations filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/2/2008) Modified on 3/3/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document # 3340 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2008 3355 Rambus's Opposition to 3339 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Expert Testimony by Mark Horowitz [Exhibits A & B attached] filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 3/2/2008) Modified on 3/3/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document # 3339 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2008 3354 Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to 3342 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Exhibits Relating to Horowitz's Awards or Distinctions [Exhibits A & B attached] filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/2/2008) Modified on 3/3/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document # 3342 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2008 3353 Rambus Inc.'s Opposition to 3337 Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Exclude Rambus Exhibits 2122, 3247 and 6044 [Exhibit A attached] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Detre, Peter) (Filed on 3/2/2008) Modified on 3/3/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document # 3337 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2008 3352 Memorandum in Opposition / Rambus's Opposition to Manufacturers' Motion to Exclude Meyer Exhibits and Associated Testimony [Exhibits A & B attached] filed byRambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2008)
March 1, 2008 3351 Declaration of Belinda M. Vega in Support of 3350 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5(d) and 7-11) filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) 3350 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/1/2008)
March 1, 2008 3350 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5(d) and 7-11) filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 3/1/2008)
February 29, 2008 3349 Declaration of John Beynon in Support of 3348 MOTION to Seal Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 to Seal Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus from Playing Certain Designations From Kevin Kilbuck's Deposition and Trial Exhibit 6039 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 3348 ) (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3348 MOTION to Seal Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 to Seal Manufacturers' Trial Brief to Preclude Rambus from Playing Certain Designations From Kevin Kilbuck's Deposition and Trial Exhibit 6039A and Exhibits A, B & C to the Declaration of Jessica L. Davis in Support Thereof filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Miscellaneous Administrative Request)(Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3347 Declaration of Jessica L. Davis in Support of 3346 Trial Brief, to Preclude Rambus From Playing Certain Deignations From Kevin Kilbuck's Deposition and Trial Exhibit 6039A filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 3346 ) (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3346 TRIAL BRIEF to Preclude Rambus From Playing Certain Designations from Kevin Kilbuck's Deposition and Trial Brief by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3345 TRIAL BRIEF Rambus's Supplemental Trial Brief Regarding New and Revised Gilbert Demonstratives by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3344 Declaration of Aaron Craig TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF AND EXHIBITS FOR USE WITH KARLHEINZ HORNINGER filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3343 TRIAL BRIEF TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF AND EXHIBITS FOR USE WITH KARLHEINZ HORNINGER by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3342 TRIAL BRIEF //Mfgs' Trial Brief To Exclude Exhibits Relating To Horowitz's Awards Or Distinctions by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3341 TRIAL BRIEF Manufacturers' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Meyer Exhibits and Associated Testimony by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Tabs A-F)(Angell, Jason) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3340 TRIAL BRIEF //Mfgs' Trial Brief Re Prior Testimony Designations by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3339 TRIAL BRIEF //Mfgs' Trial Brief To Exclude Undisclosed Expert Testimony By Mark Horowitz by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3338 Declaration of Belinda M. Vega in Support of 3337 Trial Brief //Mfgs' Trial Brief To Exclude Rambus Exhibits 2122, 3247 and 6044 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 3337 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3337 TRIAL BRIEF \\Mfgs' Trial Brief to Exclude Rambus Exhibits 2122, 3247 and 6044 by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3336 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Exhibits in Connection with Deposition Testimony of Willi Meyer (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3335 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Exhibits for Karl Horninger (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3334 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Willi Meyer (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3333 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Kevin Kilbuck (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 3332 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. Rambus's Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Karl Horninger (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 28, 2008 3367 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/28/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 2/28/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 3331 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics Indust. Co., Ltd., Hyundai Electronics America, INC., Hyundai Electronics Deutschland GmbH Manufacturers' Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony (Frenza, Karin) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 3330 NOTICE by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc. of Lodging of Deposition Testimony of Crisp Played During Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 27, 2008 3423 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3402 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 3366 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/27/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 2/27/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 3329 Manufacturers' NOTICE OF LODGING of Deposition Testimony of Richard Crisp Played as Trial (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008) Modified on 3/3/2008 (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2008 3326 Declaration of Belinda M. Vega in Support of 3325 Brief \\Hynix's Supp Brief Re Rambus' Objections to Mr. Weinstein's Demonstrative MD 290 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 3325 ) (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 3325 Brief \\Hynix's Supp Brief Re Rambus' Objections to Mr. Weinstein's Demonstrative MD 290 filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 3324 Declaration of Aaron Craig in Support of 3323 Memorandum in Opposition To Rambus's Trial Brief Re Articles Designated For Use With Steve Appleton filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Related document(s) 3323 ) (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 3323 Memorandum in Opposition To 3313 Rambus's Trial Brief Re Articles Designated For Use With Steve Appleton filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/27/2008) Modified on 2/28/2008 linking entry to document #3313 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2008 3322 Manufacturers' Notice of Lodging of Transcript of Video Testimony of Min Kwon Yoo by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH, Hyundai Electronics Indust. Co., Ltd., Hyundai Electronics America, INC., Hyundai Electronics Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Nissly, Kenneth) (Filed on 2/27/2008) Modified on 2/28/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2008 3321 MANUFACTURERS' OPPOSITION TO RAMBUS'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS TO TWO GILBERT DEMONSTRATIVES by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 2/27/2008) Modified on 2/28/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2008 3320 Rambus's Opposition to 3314 Manufacturers Motion to Limit Scope of Cross-Examination of Steve Appleton filed byRambus, Inc.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 2/27/2008) Modified on 2/28/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3314 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2008 3421 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3405 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3420 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3407 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3365 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/26/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 2/26/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3319 TRIAL BRIEF \\Mfgs' Further Supplemental Trial Brief ISO Motion to Admit Into Evidence Authenticated Exhibits and Additional Pages of Exhibits Partially In Evidence by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3318 Featured Case ORDER on two pending trial motions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/26/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3317 NOTICE by Rambus, Inc. / Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Ramubs's Trial Brief in Support of Its Objections to Testimony of, and Articles Designated for Use With, Steve Appleton (Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3316 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11) filed by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rollin A. Ransom in Support of Rambus Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal (Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11), # 2 Proposed Order)(Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3315 Declaration of Aaron Craig in Support of 3314 MOTION to limit scope of cross-examination of Steve Appleton filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Related document(s) 3314 ) (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/26/2008) Modified on 2/27/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2008 3314 MOTION to limit scope of cross-examination of Steve Appleton by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/26/2008) Modified on 2/27/2008. COUNSEL POSTED DOCUMENT USING INCORRECT EVENT (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2008 3313 TRIAL BRIEF / Ramubs's Trial Brief in Support of Its Objections to Testimony of, and Articles Designated for Use With, Steve Appleton by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rollin A. Ransom in Support of Rambus's Trial Brief in Support of Its Objections to Testimony of, and Articles Designated for Use With, Steve Appleton [Exhibits A & B])(Ransom, Rollin) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3312 TRIAL BRIEF Rambus's Supplemental Objections to the Two New Gilbert Demonstratives by Rambus, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 MD321, MD322)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3311 TRIAL BRIEF \\Mfgs' Supp Trial Brief ISO Motion to Admit Into Evidence Authenticated Exhibits and Additional Pages of Exhibits Partially In Evidence by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3310 Hynix's Opposition to 3299 Rambus' Trial Brief ISO Its Objections to Weinstein's Demonstratives filed by Hynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/26/2008) Modified on 2/27/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3299 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2008 3309 Memorandum in Opposition \\\Mfgs' Oppo to Rambus' Trial Brief Seeking to Preclude Testimony From Richard Heye On Certain Matters filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc.. (Vega, Belinda) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3308 MANUFACTURERS' OPPOSITION TO 3301 RAMBUS'S TRIAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS OBJECTIONS TO DR. GILBERT'S DEMONSTRATIVES AND EXHIBITS by Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor U.K. Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 2/26/2008) Modified on 2/27/2008. Counsel failed to link entry to document #3301 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2008 3307 Memorandum in Opposition Response to Rambus's Objections to Kellogg Testimony filed byHynix Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 3306 Memorandum in Opposition to 3300 Rambus's Trial Brief to Exclude Evidence Rambus's Settlement Agreement With Infineon filed byHynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Craig, Aaron) (Filed on 2/26/2008) Modified on 2/27/2008 linking entry to document #3300(dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2008 3419 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #3406 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 3364 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/25/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 2/25/2008). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 3328 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rambus, Inc. regarding document submitted under seal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 3327 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rambus, Inc. regarding document submitted under seal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 Received Declaration SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 3305