Pacific Shinfu Tech, et al v. Pinnacle Research, et al

Plaintiff: Pacific Shinfu Technologies Co., LTD. and Ultracap Technologies Corporation
Defendant: Pinnacle Research Institute, Inc., Pridtronics, Inc. and K. C. Tsai
Case Number: 5:2000cv21034
Filed: July 18, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 70 Motion for Attorney Fees.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2009)
December 15, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE on 70 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/15/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
October 22, 2008 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FINDING DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT OF COURT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/14/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Shinfu Tech, et al v. Pinnacle Research, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Shinfu Technologies Co., LTD.
Represented By: James Barton Nebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultracap Technologies Corporation
Represented By: John H. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Research Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Helge Russow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pridtronics, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Helge Russow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. C. Tsai
Represented By: Frank Helge Russow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?