Reed, et al v. Vazquez, et al

Plaintiff: George Reed, III
Defendant: The Estate of Officer E. Romans
Case Number: 5:2001cv20070
Filed: October 8, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 152 for Deposition of Plaintiff George Reed. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/8/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
August 6, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 136 Motion to Substitute Party. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
April 21, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 133 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/21/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
March 5, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 128 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/5/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
January 15, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Counsel and Setting Case Management Conference: Attorney Gregory D. Hull for George Reed, III, Sarah Elizabeth Barrows for George Reed, III, Jessica Lynn Yarnall for George Reed, III added. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2009 10:30 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due 3/6/2009. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/13/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
October 20, 2008 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to Federal Pro Bono Project; On Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed, et al v. Vazquez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Officer E. Romans
Represented By: Randolph W. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Reed, III
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?