Melonzi v. Hubbard
Case Number: 5:2001cv20631
Filed: July 9, 2001
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED JUDGMENT correcting a typographical error. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/29/2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012) Modified on 11/29/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/28/2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting Writ of Habeas Corpus issued Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/15/12. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Requesting Briefing. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/5/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melonzi v. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?