Icho et al v. Packetswitch.com, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Icho and Icho Group, Inc.
Defendant: Packetswitch.com, Inc., Worldhit (Mc Hammer), Steven Ristau, Lori Ristau, James Nadir, Hans Von Der Pfordten, Dax Lagaspi, Richard Marshall, Christoph Worschech, Omar Pualuan and TLN
Case Number: 5:2001cv20858
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Edward A. Infante
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 223 Opinion or Order of the Court APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, granting 222 Proposed Order filed by Robert Icho, Icho Group, Inc: Examination set for 11/20/2012 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/2/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 21, 2012 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR MISCELLANEOUS POST-JUDGMENT RELIEF by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 211 Motion MISCELLANEOUS POST-JUDGMENT RELIEF (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
March 15, 2012 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM, re 200 Order to Show Cause, Set Hearings, 199 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam (MC Hammer, aka Stanley Burrell) filed by Robert Icho, Icho Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/15/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
February 29, 2012 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/13/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/29/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
June 17, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re 191 by Mc Hammer. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/15/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
February 5, 2010 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 163 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/5/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
September 3, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND STAYING ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/3/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
June 19, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/19/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
February 4, 2008 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 128 Application for Earnings Withholding filed by Robert Icho, Icho Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/4/2008. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Icho et al v. Packetswitch.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Icho
Represented By: Barry K. Tagawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icho Group, Inc.
Represented By: Barry K. Tagawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packetswitch.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldhit (Mc Hammer)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ristau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Ristau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nadir
Represented By: Perry James Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Von Der Pfordten
Represented By: Theresia C. Sandhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dax Lagaspi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Marshall
Represented By: Dion N. Cominos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christoph Worschech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Pualuan
Represented By: Andrew Winter Olsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLN
Represented By: Andrew Winter Olsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?