Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. Cordis Corporation
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corporation and Target Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant: Cordis Corporation and Cordis Neurovascular, Inc.,
Movant: The Regents of the University of California
Miscellaneous: Rainer Schulz
Case Number: 5:2002cv01474
Filed: March 26, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN BSC AND CORDIS Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)91)(ii) and 41(c) re 1372 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 MODIFIED FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - JURY TRIAL. Jury Selection set for 3/3/2009 09:00AM, Conference re Jury Instructions set for 3/3/2009 01:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 3/4/2009 08:30 AM. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Shorten Time for Briefing and to Set Hearings for Plaintiffs' Motions to Join the Regents of the University of California as Nominal Plaintiff and to Strike Defenses based on 35 U.S.C. § 112 re 1342 Stipulation Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2009 09:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 ORDER STIPULATED MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re 1309 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Extent Time To File Oppositions To Motions In Limine re 1263 Stipulation. Deadline to file was 1/26/2009. Deadline has been met. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 1185 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Extend Time To File Deposition Designations re 1209 Stipulation. Deadline to file deposition designation due 1/16/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ORDER VACATING INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 1183 Joint Case Management Statement. The Court DENIES Cordis' request to continue the current trial for 30-60 days due to the parties' on-going discovery disputes. The parties are enco uraged to work in good faith to prepare for the 2/24/2009 trial. As previously set, the parties shall appear at the Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2009 03:00 PM. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. Cordis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Robert Donald Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Target Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Donald Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Hugh A. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Neurovascular, Inc.,
Represented By: Robert D. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Rainer Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?