Norse v. City of Santa Cruz et al

Case Number: 5:2002cv01479
Filed: March 26, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 225 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 224 for Correction of Reporter's Transcript and Clerk's Record. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
June 13, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 210 Motion for New Trial.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
March 21, 2013 208 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 207 to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for New Trial and for Filing Opposition to the Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/21/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norse v. City of Santa Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?