Johnson v. Runnels

Case Number: 5:2002cv04632
Filed: September 25, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
July 1, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/1/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
January 22, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Terminating 95 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
October 12, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 88 Request for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/11/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
September 24, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 9, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
June 5, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
November 30, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 40 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Traverse. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting in Part and Denying in Part 30 Motion to Dismiss; Further Scheduling Order. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
March 25, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 23, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
January 5, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
September 8, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CASE by Judge Ronald M. Whyte ORDER Re-Opening Case 23 . (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?