Jenkins v. Caplan et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr.
Defendant: Caplan, Thompson, Sandoval, Lamson, Roberts, Flores, Ellenbracht, Lomeli, Ellison, McDonald, Morris, Kulwicki, Sisk, Trexler, Stoneburg, Ahl, Benedetti, Altermeyer, G. Harris, Jill Brown, Dustan, A. Padilla and J. Solis
Case Number: 5:2002cv05603
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 194 Motion for Transcripts. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 157 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Vacating February 9, 2010 Order; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/25/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 142 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/16/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Directing Defendants to Show Cause or File Statement of Non-Opposition. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/13/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 121 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; Denying 132 Motion to Stay. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER of Personal Service. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/8/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Addressing Service. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/2/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and to File Defendants' Dispositive Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Re-Issuing Summons. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 69 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Granting Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement; Directing Defendants to File Motion for Summary Judgment or Notice Regarding Such Motion; Directing Plaintiff to Locate Unserved Defendants. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 64 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Caplan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoval
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamson
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flores
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellenbracht
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellison
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kulwicki
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisk
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trexler
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoneburg
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahl
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benedetti
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altermeyer
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Harris
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Brown
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustan
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Padilla
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Solis
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?