Agnes Suever, et al v. Kathleen Connell, MD, et al

Case Number: 5:2003cv00156
Filed: January 10, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2010 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/9/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 30, 2010 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/30/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 2, 2010 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 315 , 319 , 321 REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/02/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 5, 2010 306 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 305 FOR TIMING AND PAGE LIMITS FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 7/15/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/5/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 19, 2010 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/19/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 7, 2010 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 298 REQUEST TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/07/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 10, 2010 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 296 SETTING HEARING DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/10/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
February 19, 2010 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/19/2010. rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 1, 2008 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Seeborg granting 256 Motion to Seal (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agnes Suever, et al v. Kathleen Connell, MD, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?