Richard Taylor v. United States Of America et al

Plaintiff: Richard Taylor
Defendant: United States of America and United States Air Force
Mediator: William Whitcom Faulkner
Case Number: 5:2003cv00604
Filed: February 12, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 118 DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/24/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 14, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER re 115 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/14/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
February 6, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) extending briefing and hearing re government's motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's opposition due 2/8/2008. Government's reply due 2/15/2008. Motion hearing set for 3/4/2008, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/6/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Taylor v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor
Represented By: William Walter Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Claire T. Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: William Whitcom Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?