Zamani et al v. Carnes et al

Plaintiff: Michael A Zamani and Nancy Miller-Wallace
Defendant: Jennifer Carnes, Phillip Carnes, H. Gene Carnes, Kevin Schaller and Kathryn Schaller
Movant: J. D. Sullivan
Case Number: 5:2003cv00852
Filed: February 23, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2010 202 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued against Nancy Miller Wallace (formerly Nancy Zamani) in the amount of $174,802.80 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
September 5, 2009 200 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 09/05/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2009)
August 25, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court *** E-FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE ENTRY - SEE DOCKET ENTRY 196 *** ORDER Awarding Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/25/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (jg, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2009 192 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE ORDER by Judge Whyte Awarding Fees and Costs. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
October 15, 2008 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 183 Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs: Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/15/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamani et al v. Carnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: J. D. Sullivan
Represented By: Jay Duncan Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Carnes
Represented By: Steven Patrick Handelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Carnes
Represented By: Steven Patrick Handelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Gene Carnes
Represented By: Steven Patrick Handelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Schaller
Represented By: Steven Patrick Handelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Schaller
Represented By: Steven Patrick Handelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Zamani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Miller-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?