Niva v. United States of America Department of The Interio

Case Number: 5:2003cv00908
Filed: March 3, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 132 OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/18/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
December 30, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 130 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 12/30/2009. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
November 10, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 128 VACATING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 29, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 111 DENYING REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY AND TO PERMIT INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE REGARDING SEATBELT USE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/29/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 22, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 121 GRANTING REQUEST UNDER RULE 7-3(d) FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL PAPERS. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 10, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 109 RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/10/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
June 12, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 103 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference originally set for 7/8/2009 re-scheduled for 8/26/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/12/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
December 5, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 95 Stipulation filed by Eric Austin Niva. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/5/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 22, 2008 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/22/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 12, 2007 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2007 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/12/07. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niva v. United States of America Department of The Interio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?