Veliz et al v. Cintas Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Paul Veliz, James White, Mark Chainuck, Jeff Jay, Tade L. Wasmer, Aaron M. Zadnick, Bobby C. Hodge, Noel Lloyd, Kelly Smith, Earl C. Woods, Jr., Wayne Edwards, Wilfredo Huertas, Jr., Amber Kelly and Sam Williams
Defendant: Cintas Corporation and Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan
Case Number: 5:2003cv01180
Filed: March 31, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2011 1655 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 6, 2011 1652 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 1651 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/11. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 3, 2011 1650 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
December 8, 2010 1639 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; (1) PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION; (2) GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (3) APPROVING CLASS NOTICE AND MANNER OF DISTRIBUTION; AND (4) SETTING FINAL SETTLEMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
October 14, 2010 1632 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1628 Stipulation filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/14/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 6, 2010 1631 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 1630 PARTIES' JOINT REQUEST TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO FILE OVERSIZED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEROF. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/6/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
March 31, 2010 1622 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT BY 04/23/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/31/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
August 13, 2009 1615 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 1614 FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
July 6, 2009 1587 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE DISCOVERY re 1583 Letter Brief, filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/6/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 1586 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 1583 Letter Brief, filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
April 28, 2009 1570 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/28/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 23, 2009 1565 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 1127 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 1128 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 1161 Motion for Summary Judgment (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
March 5, 2009 1554 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 1553 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 24, 2009 1552 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING COURTROOM MEET AND CONFER SESSION re 1542 Order,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/24/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 19, 2009 1551 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 1158 Motion to Supplement and Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 10, 2009 1542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO APPEAR FOR COURTROOM MEET AND CONFER SESSION re 1469 Letter, filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
January 21, 2009 1280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1277 Stipulation filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/21/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 16, 2009 1272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1271 Stipulation, filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/16/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 9, 2009 1263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 1238 Motion to continue hearing date of 1/27/09 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 30, 2008 1240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Denying Objection to Nondispositive Pretrial Decision 1092 , 1094 (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 24, 2008 1233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg re Administrative Relief 1082 (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 18, 2008 1191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/18/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 17, 2008 1102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1101 Stipulation filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 3, 2008 1081 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1079 Letter filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/3/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 2, 2008 1078 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE PORTION OF DISCOVERY LETTER, AS MODIFIED BY THIS ORDER re 1065 Letter Brief, filed by James White, Bobby C. Hodge, Jeff Jay, Aaron M. Zadnick, Paul Veliz, Tade L. Wasmer, Sam Williams, Wayne Edwards, Noel Lloyd, Earl C. Woods, Jr., Amber Kelly, Kelly Smith, Mark Chainuck, Wilfredo Huertas, Jr.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 25, 2008 1064 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 1040 motion to file documents under seal (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Modified on 12/1/2008 (rssec, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 1050 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DROGIN DEPOSITION re 1037 MOTION to Compel (Letter Brief to Judge Maria-Elena James re: Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Expert to Give Deposition in Response to Subpoena) MOTION to Compel (Letter Brief to Judge Maria-Elena Jame s re: Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Expert to Give Deposition in Response to Subpoena) filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation, 1038 Letter filed by Paul Veliz. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/17/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 13, 2008 1039 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 903 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 910 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 992 Motion to Strike (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 1, 2008 1010 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE TIME RECORDS re 1009 Stipulation filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/1/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 29, 2008 1008 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1007 Stipulation, filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/29/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 23, 2008 1006 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT re 1003 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/23/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 22, 2008 1003 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER re 1002 Letter filed by Paul Veliz. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/22/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 5, 2008 991 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 990 Stipulation filed by Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/5/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 4, 2008 989 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 988 Stipulation filed by Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan, Cintas Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/4/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 2, 2008 957 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 899 OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME RECORDS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/2/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veliz et al v. Cintas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Veliz
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Chainuck
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Jay
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tade L. Wasmer
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron M. Zadnick
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby C. Hodge
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Lloyd
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Smith
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl C. Woods, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Edwards
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Huertas, Jr.
Represented By: James Albert Caputo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Kelly
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Williams
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporation
Represented By: Erinn Mae Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plan Administrator for the Cintas Partners' Plan
Represented By: Erinn Mae Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?