Ramirez v. Warden

Case Number: 5:2003cv01817
Filed: April 24, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 173 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 169 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
November 19, 2014 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 162 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 163 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 160 Objections to Judgment (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
October 21, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; denying 157 Motion for Hearing (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
March 21, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 39 Motion to Dismiss and ordering respondent to answer petition. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
October 18, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 96 Motion for Recusal and denying 96 Motion to Stay. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
September 15, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 86 Motion for Recusal and extending time to respond. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 30, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and vacating 82 Order and 83 Judgment. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 23, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/23/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
June 21, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 74 MOTION for Hearing filed by Anthony Marco Ramirez. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/21/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?