United States of America v. Miscellaneous Firearms, Silencers and Ammunition

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Miscellaneous Firearms, Silencers and Ammunition
Case Number: 5:2003cv01920
Filed: August 22, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte re 117 Motion on Status and Notice of Appeal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
September 7, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FILED MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on September 7, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 6, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; GRANTING MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DESTRUCTION OF CERTAIN FIREARMS AND AMMUNITION by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
April 17, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING FROM MR. DUGAN REGARDING HIS FAILURE TO FILE A VERIFIED CLAIM FORM UNTIL MAY 8, 2012, VACATING THE APRIL 27, 2012 HEARING AND SUBMITTING MOTIONS ON THE PAPERS. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on April 17, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
March 21, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DOCKET ENTRIES. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/21/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 16, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING FROM MR. DUGAN REGARDING HIS FAILURE TO FILE A VERIFIED CLAIM FORM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on March 16, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
September 3, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 67 Motion to Vacate and granting 68 Motion to Stay. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 22, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte TENTATIVELY GRANTING 62 Motion for Default Judgment.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2009)
September 25, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 53 to Continue Case Management Conference: Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/25/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Miscellaneous Firearms, Silencers and Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Firearms, Silencers and Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?