First National Mortgage Company v. Federal Realty Investment Trust

Plaintiff: First National Mortgage Company
Defendant: Federal Realty Investment Trust
Case Number: 5:2003cv02013
Filed: August 11, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2009 755 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 724 MOTION FOR EXPENSES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 37(c)(2); and denying 726 MOTION FOR PARTIAL EXPERT WITNESS FEES UNDER CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 998. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/8/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 11, 2009 741 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 735 Regarding Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/11/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
June 10, 2009 715 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 709 Regarding Amount of Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/10/09. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009) Modified on 6/17/2009 (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2009 695 Opinion or Order of the Court CLARIFICATION OF RESPONSE DEADLINES IN TENTATIVE FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (DAMAGES PHASE). Signed by Judge Whyte on 04/24/2009. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 22, 2009 692 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (DAMAGES PHASE. Signed by Judge Whyte on 04/22/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
March 27, 2009 690 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying without prejudice to the evidentiary rulings made at trial or inconnection with findings of fact and conclusions of law certain limine motions 607 , 610 , 613 , 616 and 621 and granting administrative request 665 . (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
September 30, 2008 688 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 563 Motion for Leave to File; terminating 563 Motion for Reconsideration. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First National Mortgage Company v. Federal Realty Investment Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Mortgage Company
Represented By: John Caleb Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Realty Investment Trust
Represented By: William W. Huckins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?