Vargas v. Knowles

Petitioner: Eddie M. Vargas, Sr.
Respondent: Mike Knowles
Case Number: 5:2003cv02930
Filed: June 24, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2016 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 240 MOTION TO AMEND PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 10, 2016. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
February 3, 2015 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 2/5/2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE 238 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Mike Knowles. Petitioner shall file, within sixty (60) days of the filing date of this Order, a Motion to Amend the Petition for Writ of Habea s Corpus. Respondent shall file an Opposition to the motion or Statement of Non-Opposition within fifteen (15) days of the filing date of the motion to amend. If Respondent opposes the motion to amend, Petitioner shall file a Reply within seven (7) d ays of the filing date of the opposition. Respondent shall file, within sixty (60) days of the filing date of this Court's order deciding Petitioners motion to amend, a Supplemental Answer responding to any claims newly added to the habeas petit ion by Petitioner's motion to amend. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the filing date of any answer to file a Supplemental Traverse. ***2/5/2015 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
December 4, 2014 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 236 Proposed Joint Request for Status Hearing and Proposed Order. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
July 29, 2014 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE. Since it is unknown when the California Supreme Court will render its decision on Plaintiff's pending habeas petition, the court orders the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. Within 10 days of the fi ling of the California Supreme Court's decision on Plaintiff'shabeas petition, the parties shall file a Joint Notice informing the court of such development and shall request that this matter be reopened and that a Case Management Conference be scheduled. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
May 23, 2014 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference scheduled for 5/30/2014 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 8/1/2014. The parties shall file an updated Joint Status Conference Statement on or before 7/25/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/23/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
August 20, 2012 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re-Setting In Camera Telephone Conference. Conference set for 8/30/2012, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/20/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
June 25, 2012 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 216 Setting In Camera Telephone Conference. Petitioner's counsel to lodge in camera status report (copy to petitioner) by 7/12/2012. In camera telephone conference set for 7/19/2012, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/25/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
January 19, 2012 212 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Second Extension of Time to File Status Statement re 211 STIPULATION. Status Report due by 2/1/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/19/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
November 30, 2011 210 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request an Extension of Time to File Joint Status Statement re 208 Stipulation filed by Eddie M. Vargas, Sr. Status Report due by 1/18/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/30/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
October 31, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT re 198 , 201 In Camera Telephonic Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/31/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 17, 2011 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 198 Setting In Camera Telephone Conference. In camera telephone conference with petitioner and petitioner's counsel set for 10/31/2011, 10:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/17/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
March 28, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DENYING 192 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND (2) REQUESTING SUBMISSION FROM PETITIONER'S COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/28/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
November 18, 2008 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 173 MOTION FOR STAY. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
September 22, 2008 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 180 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE HEARING OF PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY OF THE FEDERAL HABEAS PROCEEDING, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7-7(b)(1). Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/22/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 11, 2008 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 178 Stipulation re Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/10/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eddie M. Vargas, Sr.
Represented By: Jerry Y. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Knowles
Represented By: Robert R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?