Scarff et al v. Comerica Bank-California et al

Plaintiff: Edward L. Scarff, Scarff Sears & Associates, Pentoga Partners and Nancy V. Scarff
Defendant: Comerica Bank-California, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Carol Huang, Kelly Hvegholm, Computing Resources Inc, Intuit Inc., Carol A. Barber, Joan Burtzel, Lisa Ciccotti and Bank of America Corp.
Miscellaneous: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Case Number: 5:2003cv03394
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2010 527 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL OUTSTANDING CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE re 525 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/28/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
January 13, 2010 508 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/13/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
December 18, 2009 467 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PARTIES AND CLAIMS (approving 465 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/18/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 2, 2009 462 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT KELLY HVEGHOLM TO NOTICE HER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR HEARING ON JANUARY 8, 2010 (approving 453 ). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/1/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 30, 2009 459 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANTS INTUIT INC., COMPUTING RESOURCES, INC., AND LISA CICCOTTI TO NOTICE THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR HEARING ON JANUARY 8, 2010 re 446 . Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/24/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 24, 2009 448 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL RE DEFENDANTS' 440 REQUEST FOR A RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarff et al v. Comerica Bank-California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L. Scarff
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarff Sears & Associates
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pentoga Partners
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy V. Scarff
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank-California
Represented By: John W. Easterbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Huang
Represented By: Mani Sheik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Hvegholm
Represented By: Rebecca M. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computing Resources Inc
Represented By: Rebecca M. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol A. Barber
Represented By: Rebecca M. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Burtzel
Represented By: Martin Hoban Kresse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ciccotti
Represented By: Rebecca M. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Represented By: William Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?