Mullen v. Surtshin et al

Plaintiff: Bartolo Mullen
Defendant: Stephen Surtshin, Carol Ann Kushmak, Chris Echols, Patricia White, Sarah Isadore, Glenna Hepner, John Benham, Julius Fu, Jesus Gallegos, Tom Moraida, Ed Foulk, Catherine Blakemore, Michelle Mudgett and Susan Kessler
Case Number: 5:2003cv03676
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/6/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
September 8, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendant Surtshin; Directing Plaintiff to locate Unserved Defendants. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/4/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 7, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Its Own Motion Granting Plaintiff Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/5/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified text on 8/11/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 103 Motion to Compel Discovery; Granting 105 , 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
March 18, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Address Pending Motions 87 , 95 , 96 , 97 , 98 by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
December 9, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER [56, 58, 67, 76, 77, 79, 81, 82, 85, 86] Addressing Pending Motions by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008 (jg, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 73 Motion to Amend/Correct Without Prejudice; Granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend; Denying 73 Motion to Certify Class; Denying 73 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; Granting 73 Motion for the Court to Hold his Pleadings to a Less Stringent Standard. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullen v. Surtshin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartolo Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Surtshin
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Ann Kushmak
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Echols
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia White
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Isadore
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenna Hepner
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Benham
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Fu
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Gallegos
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Moraida
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Foulk
Represented By: Gregory David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Blakemore
Represented By: Lynn Anne Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Mudgett
Represented By: Lynn Anne Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kessler
Represented By: Lynn Anne Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?