Paulsen et al v. CNF, Inc et al

Case Number: 5:2003cv03960
Filed: August 28, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2011 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
June 23, 2011 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DUPLICATE ENTRY*** ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING Motions due by 7/11/2011, Oppositions due by 7/25/11 and replies due by 8/1/11. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/21/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2011 330 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 328 Stipulation, filed by Thomas A. Paulsen, Lloyd Michael O'Connell, III, Robert Newell, Robert M. Bowden, Chester Madison. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/9/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 21, 2011 327 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Re Filing of Motion of Preliminary Settlement Approval and Setting Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Class Settelment re 326 Stipulation. Due to the Court's impending relocation of chambers from San Jose to San Francisco, the Court cannot accommodate the parties' request for a May 2, 2011 hearing date. Instead, the Court sets June 20, 2011 at 9 a.m. as the new hearing date for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. On or before May 6, 2011, the parties shall file their Joint Motion along with all the necessary papers for the Court's evaluation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 325 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Terminating Motions re Trial and Dispositive and Expert Motions Hearing and Setting Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Settlement re 324 Stipulation. The Court sets April 25, 2011 at 9 a.m. for a Hear ing on Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. Becausethe Court must maintain its docket, all pending Motions are deemed as "withdrawn" and shall be terminated by the Clerk of Court. The parties may renotice their Motions should the set tlement not be finalized. Motions terminated: 286 MOTION Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Defendants' Proposed Expert, Kim Nicholl, and Strike Ms. Nicholl's Supplemental Report filed by Thomas A. Paulsen, Lloyd Michael O'Connell, I II, Robert Newell, Robert M. Bowden, Chester Madison, Edward L. Frazee, 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Susan Allison in Support Thereof filed by Towers Perrin Forster & Crosby Inc, [28 0] MOTION Notice and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Ian H. Altman; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Towers Perrin Forster & Crosby Inc, 288 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Thomas A. Paulsen, Lloyd Michael O'Connell, III, Robert Newell, Robert M. Bowden, Chester Madison, Edward L. Frazee. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 28, 2011 313 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT for Brief Continuance of Trial Commencement Date re 312 Stipulation. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 6/7/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2011 01:00 PM - 6/10/2011 01:00 PM; 6/14/2011 01:00 PM - 6/17/2011 01:00 PM; 6/21/2011 01:00 PM - for 6/24/2011 01:00 PM; 6/28/2011 01:00 PM - 7/1/2011 01:00 PM; Jury Deliberations set for 7/5/2011 - 7/8/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
January 28, 2011 279 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Dipsositive and Expert Motions Hearing re 278 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 278 Stipulation : Opening briefs due 2/7/2011. Opposition briefs due by 2/18/2011. Reply Briefs due by 3/7/2011. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
November 16, 2010 272 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 254 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel or, In the Alternative, for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/16/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 12, 2010 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 270 Amended Joint Proposal for Dissemination of Class Notice. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 4, 2010 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING JOINT PROPOSAL FOR DISSEMINATION OF CLASS NOTICE AS MODIFIED 265 Proposed Order. On or before November 12, 2010, the parties shall file an Amended Joint Proposal for Dissemination of Class Notice consistent with this Order for the Court's approval. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 22, 2010 263 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Class Counsel re 262 Stipulation. The Motion for Clarification 261 is found as MOOT. Motions terminated: 261 MOTION Clarification of Order of October 7, 2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
August 31, 2010 244 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 240 Deposition Schedule. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
July 26, 2010 223 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION re 220 Stipulation filed by Towers Perrin Forster & Crosby Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 26, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 13, 2010 222 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE re 221 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery due by 9/20/2010. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 8/20/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 9/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. No further extensions will be permitted. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
May 20, 2010 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 218 Parties' Proposed Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/20/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
April 28, 2010 217 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Expert Disclosure Deadlines re 216 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 30, 2010 215 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REGARDING CLASS BRIEFING AND SCHEDULING DEALDLINES re 213 Stipulation. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 8/20/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Close of All Discovery due by 9/20/2010. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 9/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2010. Please see the Court's order for further modifications. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
February 17, 2010 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 211 Stipulation. The deadline to complete mediation is set for the presumptive 90 day deadline. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
October 15, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 10/19/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING FOR DEFENDANT'SANTICIPATED MOTION TO DISMISS re 196 Joint Case Management Statement. On or before 11/2/2009, Defendant shall make its Initial Disclosures. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
August 31, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. On or before 9/4/2009, Defendant shall disclose to Plaintiffs any agreement, or the fact that there is no such agreement, regarding services provided by Defendant for the CFC Pension Plan. supplemental c omplaint due by 9/18/2009. Answer due 10/26/2009, Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/31/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 2/1/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTHCIRCUIT MANDATE re 177 USCA Mandate. Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 8/21/2009. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 6, 2009 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 172 USCA Memorandum. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 5/22/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulsen et al v. CNF, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?