Vedatech K.K. et al v. Crystal Decisions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vedatech K.K. and Mani Subramanian
Defendant: Crystal Decisions, Inc., Crystal Decisions (UK) Limited, Susan J. Wolfe, Crystal Decisions (UK) Limited, a United Kingdom Company, Business Objects Americas and Business Objects S.A.
Case Number: 5:2003cv04578
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 193 194 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
May 14, 2009 184 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge Whyte.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
April 28, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 04/28/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
October 22, 2008 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 133 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; taking under advisement 133 Motion for miscellaneous clarification; Vacating hearing dates. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 4, 2008 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 126 Motion for Extension of Time (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vedatech K.K. et al v. Crystal Decisions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vedatech K.K.
Represented By: Gregory Gavin Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mani Subramanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Decisions, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J Kottmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Decisions (UK) Limited
Represented By: Stephen J Kottmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan J. Wolfe
Represented By: Stephen J Kottmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Decisions (UK) Limited, a United Kingdom Company
Represented By: Stephen J Kottmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Objects Americas
Represented By: Stephen J Kottmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Objects S.A.
Represented By: Stephen J Kottmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?