Google Inc. v. American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Google Inc. seeks declaratory judgment that its policy regarding the sale of keyword-triggering advertising does not constitute trademark infringement.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Google Inc.
Counter-claimant: American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.
3rd Party Defendant: Earthlink, Inc. and Ask Jeeves, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2003cv05340
Filed: November 26, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2007 335 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/5/07. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007)
August 31, 2007 334
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; [PROPOSED] ORDER by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 8/31/2007)
August 29, 2007 333 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE re 328 Stipulation filed by Google Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2007 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/27/07. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 8, 2007 329
Declaration of Ajay S. Krishnan in Support of 328 Stipulation to Request Briefing Schedule filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)328) (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 8/8/2007)
July 5, 2007 326 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 320 Motion to Seal. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2007)
June 28, 2007 325
Proposed Order re 320 MOTION to Seal Notice of Motion and Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking an Order Sealing Documents for Filing in Relation to Google's Response to ABWF's Four Declarations, 323 Declaration in Support,, by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Plater, Caroline) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
June 27, 2007 324 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 238 MOTION for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/27/07. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
June 1, 2007 323
Responsive Declaration of Caroline C. Plater Regarding Google, Inc's Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking an Order Sealing Documents for Filing in Relation to Google's Response to ABWF's Four Declarations Regarding ABWF's Alleged Preservation, Collection, and Production of Materials in Response to April 27, 2007 Court Order re of 320 filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Related document(s)320) (Plater, Caroline) (Filed on 6/1/2007) Text modified on 6/5/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2007 322
Declaration of Ajay S. Krishnan in Support of Google's Response to ABWF's Four Declarations Regarding ABWF's Alleged Preservation, Collection, and Production of Materials in Response to April 27, 2007 Court Order 318 filed by Google Inc. (Related document(s)318) (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 5/25/2007) Text modified on 5/29/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2007 317
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/11/2007 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/11/2007). Jury Trial set for 11/9/2007 01:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2007 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2007)
May 8, 2007 312 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE 308 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 05/08/2007. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007)
April 27, 2007 311 Opinion or Order of the Court
CORRECTED ORDER RE FURTHER EVIDENTIARY SUBMISSIONS re 309. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/27/07. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007)
April 18, 2007 308 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part 230 Motion for Summary Judgment (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 4, 2007 307
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2007 is continued to 5/11/2007 10:30 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
March 14, 2007 306
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2007 before Judge Richard Seeborg. Matter is taken under submission (Date Filed: 3/14/2007). (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/14/2007)
March 12, 2007 305 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 299 Motion for Leave to File (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2007 (jflc1, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2007 302 Opinion or Order of the Court
STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Statement of Recent Decision filed byGoogle Inc., Google Inc.. (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
February 16, 2007 295
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2007 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/16/2007) re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The motion is taken under submission. The trial dates are vacated. Case is set for further case management conference on 4/6/07 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/27/2007 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2007 294
NOTICE by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc., American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc. NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE TO BE RELIED 263 UPON AT ORAL ARGUMENT (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 2/15/2007) Modified on 2/16/2007 (gm, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2007 292
RESPONSE in Support RESPONSE TO GOOGLE'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING, EVIDENTIARY, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE filed byAmerican Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc., American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2007)
February 12, 2007 290
CLERK'S NOTICE. Motion Hearing re 238 set for 3/14/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 9, 2007 288 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re 268 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/9/07. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2007)
February 7, 2007 286 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re 260. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/5/07. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
February 5, 2007 283
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., Google Inc. re 277 Memorandum in Opposition,, 279 Declaration in Support, 281 Declaration in Support, 275 Reply to Opposition, 276 Objection, 280 MOTION to Seal Document Notice of Motion and Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking an Order Sealing Documents for Filing in Relation to Google's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, 278 Declaration in Support (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 2/5/2007)
February 2, 2007 281
Declaration of Klaus H. Hamm In Support of Google's 280 Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking an Order Sealing Documents filed byGoogle Inc., Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 2/2/2007) Modified on 2/5/2007 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2007 269
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc., American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc. Re Documents Filed Under Seal (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
January 26, 2007 268
NOTICE by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc., American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc. CORRECTED 260 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF SEEKING AN ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS FOR FILING (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2007) Modified on 1/29/2007 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2007 253 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILED DOCUMENTS RELATED TO GOOGLE'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION re 231 MOTION to Seal Document 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking an Order Sealing Documents for Filing in Relation to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/10/07. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2007)
January 5, 2007 250 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER clarifying motion hearing date. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 5, 2007. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
December 29, 2006 247
Proposed Order Re Google's 244 Motion To Maintain The Current Scheule Or Abide By It As Closely As Possible by Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 12/29/2006) Modified on 1/5/2007 (gm, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2006 229 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 227 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 18, 2006 228
Proposed Order re 227 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages STIPULATED MOTION TO GRANT PARTIES ADDITIONAL PAGES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING (STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER) by Google Inc., Google Inc.. (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 12/18/2006)
November 14, 2006 224 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 201 Motion to Seal. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2006)
November 13, 2006 217 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion to Compel. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
October 23, 2006 214 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY ORDER(jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 16, 2006 211
Reply Memorandum Response to American Blind and Wallpaper Factory, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Compelling Deposition of Google Cofounder and President Larry Page filed byGoogle Inc., Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 13, 2006 209
Reply Memorandum Google Inc's Reply In Support of Its Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Compelling Deposition of Google Co-Founder and President LarryPage filed byGoogle Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
October 4, 2006 202
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 10/4/2006)
October 3, 2006 198 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Requesting Response to Objections to Discovery Order 192 filed by Google Inc., (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
September 20, 2006 195
Proposed Order Granting Google Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Compelling Deposition of Google Co-Founder and President Larry Page by Google Inc., Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
September 11, 2006 191 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO ENGAGE IN FURTHER MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS re 185 MOTION to Compel Counter-Plaintiff ABWF To Satisfy Its Outstanding Discovery Obligations filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/11/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 7, 2006 190
NOTICE by Google Inc., Google Inc. of Motion and Motion For Administrative Relief Seeking An Order Sealing Documents For Filing In Relation To Counter-Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion To Compel Counter-Plaintiff ABWF To Satisfy Outstanding Discovery Obligations (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 9/7/2006)
September 6, 2006 182 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion to Compel. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2006)
August 31, 2006 180 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DATES re 176 Stipulation filed by Google Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/31/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006)
August 29, 2006 179 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS re 171 Notice (Other) filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/29/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2006)
August 28, 2006 178
Proposed Order Sealing Documents Filed with Defendants American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Google to Respond to Discovery Timely Served Given the Current Cutoff Date of August 26, 2006 by Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 23, 2006 173
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc. re 169 Reply Memorandum, (Andelman, Ethan) (Filed on 8/23/2006)
August 18, 2006 168
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 8/18/2006)
August 16, 2006 166
Declaration of Klaus H. Hamm In Support of Google's Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking an Order Sealing Documents filed byGoogle Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 8/16/2006)
August 10, 2006 161 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE PRODUCTION OF THIRD PARTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/10/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2006)
August 9, 2006 159
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2006 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/9/2006). (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2006)
August 3, 2006 156 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 140 Motion to Seal. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2006)
July 26, 2006 155
Reply Memorandum re 129 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(a) filed byAmerican Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Andelman, Ethan) (Filed on 7/26/2006)
July 24, 2006 154
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
July 19, 2006 153
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., Google Inc. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 7/19/2006)
July 17, 2006 150 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 146 Motion to Shorten Time. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2006)
July 12, 2006 141
Declaration of Klaus H. Hamm in Support of Google's Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking an Order Sealing Documents filed byGoogle Inc., Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 7/12/2006)
June 23, 2006 134
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/23/2006 before Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/23/2006). (Court Reporter P. Torreano.) (cm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/23/2006)
June 22, 2006 132
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***

CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2006) Modified on 6/22/2006 (rssec, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2006 130
MOTION to Seal - ABWFI's Administrative Motion for a Sealing Order (Civil L.R. 79-5(d) filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc., American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Andelman, Ethan) (Filed on 6/21/2006)
June 20, 2006 123
Declaration of Susan Greenspon in Support of ABWFI's Administrative Motion for a Sealing Order (Civil L.R. 79-5(b) filed byAmerican Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc., American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Andelman, Ethan) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 15, 2006 117
Declaration of MICHAEL H. PAGE In Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to American Blind & Wallpaper, Inc.s [sic] Motion to Amend and Extend Case Management Order filed byGoogle Inc., Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
June 12, 2006 114 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 106 Motion to Shorten Time. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 9, 2006 112
Proposed Order Granting American Blind & Wallpaper, Inc.'s Motion to Amend & Extend Case Management Order Dates by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc., American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 8, 2006 108
Proposed Order re 106 MOTION to Shorten Time on Google's Motion to Compel by Google Inc., Google Inc.. (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
April 27, 2006 101 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/27/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 7, 2006 100
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Dismissing Third-Party Complaint by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 4/7/2006)
April 5, 2006 99
RESPONSE to Kelley Drye & Warren LLP's Administrative Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc. With Respect to The Third-Party Defendants by Compuserve Interactive Services, Inc., Netscape Communications Corporation, America Online, Inc.. (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 4, 2006 98 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re 96 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney With Respect To The Third-Party Defendants filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/4/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
March 31, 2006 97
Declaration of Susan J. Greenspon in Support of 96 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney With Respect To The Third-Party Defendants filed byAmerican Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc., American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Related document(s)96) (Beery, Dawn) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
February 16, 2006 95
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/3/2006 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/16/2006). The Court extends all case management dates by 4 months. The case is set for jury trial on 3/16/07 at 1:30 p.m., pretrial conference on 3/2/07 at 11:00 a.m. and motion hearing on 12/1/06 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2006)
February 8, 2006 94 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 63 Motion for Discovery, granting 67 Motion to Compel. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2006)
February 3, 2006 93
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2006 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 2/3/2006). (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/3/2006)
January 24, 2006 90 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting Administrative Request to File Exhibits E, F, and G to the Hamm Declaration under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/24/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 20, 2006 88
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report, Case Management Statement and Proposed Case Management Order filed by Google Inc., Earthlink, Inc., Ask Jeeves, Inc., Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 13, 2006 83
Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Exhibit E To The Hamm Declaration Under Seal by Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 1/13/2006)
January 5, 2006 77 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2006)
January 4, 2006 76
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearings Motion Hearings set for 2/3/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006)
January 3, 2006 74
Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Google Inc.'s Administrative Request To File Under Seal by Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 1/3/2006)
November 7, 2005 62 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 61 Stipulation filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/05. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
November 3, 2005 61
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Continuing Case Management Conference by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
September 19, 2005 60 Opinion or Order of the Court
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2005)
August 24, 2005 59
Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order by Google Inc., Google Inc.. (Hamm, Klaus) (Filed on 8/24/2005)
May 16, 2005 58
Corrected Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/13/2005 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/16/2005). (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2005)
April 26, 2005 56
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report, Case Management Statement and Proposed Case Management Order filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 4/26/2005)
April 22, 2005 55 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES re 52 Stipulation filed by America Online, Inc.,, Netscape Communications Corporation,, Compuserve Interactive Services, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/22/05. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 20, 2005 54
Proposed Order re 52 Stipulation Requesting Order Extending Time for Initial Disclosures by Compuserve Interactive Services, Inc., Netscape Communications Corporation, America Online, Inc.. (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 4/20/2005)
April 13, 2005 51
Third-Party Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCompuserve Interactive Services, Inc., Netscape Communications Corporation, America Online, Inc.. (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 4/13/2005)
March 30, 2005 49
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for Friday, 5/13/2005 at 10:30 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2005)
September 20, 2004 44
Minute Entry: Motion to Dismiss hearing held on 9/17/2004 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 9/20/2004). Motion to Dismiss is taken under submission. Case management conference is not held. (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2004)
September 7, 2004 43
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by America Online, Inc., Compuserve Interactive Services, Inc., Netscape Communications Corporation re 41 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third Party Claims (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 9/7/2004)
June 23, 2004 38
Proposed Order re 36 Motion to Dismiss Counterlcaims and Third-Party Claims by Ask Jeeves, Inc., Earthlink, Inc., Google Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2004)
June 21, 2004 35 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/21/04. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2004)
June 17, 2004 34
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Extending Time for Case Management Conference by Ask Jeeves, Inc., Earthlink, Inc., Google Inc.. (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 6/17/2004)
May 25, 2004 33 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to counterclaims and third-party claims. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/24/04. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2004)
May 24, 2004 30
SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. Netscape Communications Corporation served on 5/14/2004, answer due 6/3/2004. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 5/24/2004)
May 21, 2004 27
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS AND THIRD-PARTY CLAIMS by Google Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2004)
May 12, 2004 26
SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. Earthlink, Inc. served on 5/7/2004, answer due 5/27/2004. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 5/12/2004)
May 4, 2004 24
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIMS against Google Inc., THIRD PARTY CLAIMS against Earthlink, Inc., Ask Jeeves, Inc., Compuserve Interactive Services, Inc., Netscape Communications Corporation, America OnLine, Inc. by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Attachments: # Answer and Counterclaims Part 1 (1) Answer and Counterclaims Part 2 (2) Exhibits)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2004)
April 20, 2004 22
Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/19/2004 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 4/20/2004). Continued to 6/14/04 at 10:30 a.m. for further case management conference. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2004)
April 16, 2004 21
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report and Joint Case Management Statement filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 4/16/2004)
April 12, 2004 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 5 Motion to Dismiss or Stay (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2004)
April 8, 2004 19
Certificate of Interested Entities (Certification of Interested Parties) (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 4/8/2004)
April 5, 2004 18
Minute Entry: Motion to Dismiss or Stay hearing held on 4/5/2004 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 4/5/2004). Motion to dismiss or stay is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2004)
March 18, 2004 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/18/04. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2004)
March 12, 2004 12
STIPULATION and [P]roposed Order Re Case Management Conference by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 3/12/2004)
January 30, 2004 7
Renotice motion hearing on Motion to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, To Stay filed by American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2004 09:00 AM. (Phillips, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 6, 2004 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/04. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2004)
December 23, 2003 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Google Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2003)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Ajay Krishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Klaus Hemingway Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan B. Andelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: American Blind & Wallpaper Factory, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Claire Plater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Earthlink, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ask Jeeves, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?