Technology Licensing Corporation v. Videotek, Inc.

Case Number: 5:2004cv00604
Filed: February 12, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
January 28, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/8/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
December 11, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 1/28/2008 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/11/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technology Licensing Corporation v. Videotek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?