Ailemen v. United States Of America

Case Number: 5:2004cv00823
Filed: February 27, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion for Sentence Reduction; Denying Motion for Relief for Post Rehabilitation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/13/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
February 12, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE. Response due 3/13/2015. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/12/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
March 28, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 71 Motion to Unseal Document. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 6, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 53 Motion for Reconsideration ; Denying 54 Motion for Discovery; Denying 55 Motion for Discovery ; Granting 56 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
December 30, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification ; denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion Seeking Denial of 46 the Government's December 7, 2007 pleading and renewed request; denying 49 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting the Court to Grant 26 ; denying 26 Request Court to Issue Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/29/08. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ailemen v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?