Digital Envoy Inc., v. Google Inc., Featured Case

Plaintiff: Digital Envoy,Inc.,
Defendant: Google Inc.,
Counter-defendant: Digital Envoy,Inc.,
Counter-claimant: Google Inc.,
Case Number: 5:2004cv01497
Filed: April 16, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2006 443 Opinion or Order of the Court
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE***

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2006 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/27/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006) Modified on 4/27/2006 (rssec, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2006 442 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/24/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 20, 2006 440
MOTION and Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 4/20/2006) Modified on 4/21/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2006 435 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg finding as moot 428 Motion to Seal Document, granting 434 Motion to Seal Document. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2006)
April 13, 2006 426 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 420 Motion to Seal Document. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2006)
April 12, 2006 425
MOTION to Seal Document 420 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Under Seal, Pursuant To Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, The Declarations Of Andrew Linder, Robert B. Friedman and Robert J. Waddell, And All Exhibits Thereto, And Digital Envoy's, 421 Declaration in Support, Manual Filing Notification Of Declaration Of Robert J. Waddell, Jr. and Exhibits A-S Thereto Filed I/S/O Digital Envoy's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Digital Envoy,Inc.,, Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Anderson, Brian) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 11, 2006 418
STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Re: Amending Scheduling Order by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 4/11/2006)
April 6, 2006 417
Minute Entry: Further Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/6/2006 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 4/6/2006). (Court Reporter not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2006)
March 31, 2006 416
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Digital Envoy's Claim for Injunctive Relief by Digital Envoy,Inc., (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 28, 2006 415 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 408 Motion to Dismiss, Denying Motion for Entry of Judgment, Denying Motion to Compel, and Setting Further Dates. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2006)
March 22, 2006 414
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/22/2006 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 3/22/2006). (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2006)
March 8, 2006 413
Digital Envoy's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Google's Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim and Motion for Entry of Judgment 408 filed by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 3/8/2006) Modified on 3/9/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2006 412
Memorandum in Opposition to Digital Envoy's Motion to Dismiss Google's Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim and Motion for Entry of Judgment re 408 > filed by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 3/1/2006) Modified on 3/2/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2006 411 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Setting Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/16/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2006)
February 15, 2006 410
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Amending Scheduling Order by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/15/2006)
February 10, 2006 407
Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 2/10/2006). (Court Reporter not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2006)
January 25, 2006 406 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE ON GOOGLE'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/8/2006 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/25/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2006)
January 24, 2006 404
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant, Google, Inc., against Plaintiff, Digital Envoy, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/24/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 20, 2006 402
STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order re: Amending Scheduling Order by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 1/20/2006) Modified on 1/23/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2006 401
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/12/2006 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/12/2006). (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2006)
January 6, 2006 400
ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 1/6/2006)
December 16, 2005 398 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 388 Motion for Hearing. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2005)
December 13, 2005 396
Minute Entry: A Settlement Conference was held; the case did not settle. The parties were invited to contact Magistrate Judge Spero if they wish to have a further settlement conference. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2005)
December 9, 2005 395
Reply to Opposition re 383 MOTION for Reconsideration Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/9/2005)
December 7, 2005 394
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digital Envoy,Inc., re Received Document (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2005 387 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 381 Digital Envoy, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
December 1, 2005 386 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying Request [Docket No. 380] to continue Settlement Conference currently scheduled for 12/13/2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/1/2005. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2005)
November 30, 2005 383
MOTION for Reconsideration Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 11/30/2005)
November 29, 2005 382
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., re 381 MOTION for Leave to File For Reconsideration (Anderson, Brian) (Filed on 11/29/2005)
November 28, 2005 380
Letter from David L. Lansky in re Request Continuance of Settlement Conference. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 11/28/2005)
November 22, 2005 379 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 370 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2005)
November 21, 2005 375
Declaration of Brian R. Blackman in Support of 374 MOTION to Seal Administrative Request To File Under Seal Reply Brief And Supplemental Declaration Of Robert J. Waddell, Jr., In Support Of Digital Envoy's Motion to Compel filed byDigital Envoy,Inc.,. (Related document(s)374) (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 11/21/2005)
November 17, 2005 370
MOTION for Leave to File Google Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File for Reconsideration and for Further Ruling filed by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 11/17/2005)
November 14, 2005 369
Declaration of Hilary Ware in Support of 367 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Related document(s)367) (Kramer, David) (Filed on 11/14/2005)
November 8, 2005 366 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 261 Motion for Summary Judgment (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2005)
November 3, 2005 365
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, at the joint request of counsel, from 11/17/2005 until 12/13/2005, at 9:30 a.m. Settlement Conference Statements are to be lodged with Chambers no later than 11/29/2005. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
November 2, 2005 360 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 352 Stipulation filed by Digital Envoy, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/2/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2005)
October 31, 2005 358
Appendix re 353 MOTION to Compel Further Responses To Digital Envoy's Interrogatories, Requests For Production of Documents, and 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices Certificate of Service filed byDigital Envoy,Inc.,. (Related document(s)353) (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 10/31/2005)
October 21, 2005 351 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 350 Stipulation filed by Digital Envoy, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2005)
October 20, 2005 350
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Amending Scheduling Order by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 10/20/2005)
October 14, 2005 347 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 344 Motion to File Documents under Seal. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2005)
October 13, 2005 346
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc.,, Google Inc., (Kramer, David) (Filed on 10/13/2005)
October 5, 2005 335
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digital Envoy,Inc., re Received Document, Received Document, (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2005 330
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, at the joint request of counsel, from 10/12/2005 until 11/17/2005, at 9:30 a.m. Settlement Conference Statements are to be lodged with Chambers (NOT electronically filed) no later than 11/3/2005. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2005)
September 21, 2005 328 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 322 Motion to File Document Under Seal. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2005)
September 20, 2005 325
Memorandum in Opposition re 324 MOTION For Leave To File The Supplemental Declaration Of Robert J. Waddell, Jr. In Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Digital Envoy, Inc.'s, Damages Claims filed byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/20/2005)
September 9, 2005 315 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELEIF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 304 Motion sealing (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2005)
September 8, 2005 314
Reply Memorandum re 261 MOTION for Summary Judgment Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Digital Envoy, Inc.'s Damages Claims; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/8/2005)
September 2, 2005 298 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 296 Motion to Seal Document. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2005)
September 1, 2005 297
Declaration of Brian R. Blackman in Support of 296 MOTION to Seal Document 294 Memorandum in Opposition,, 295 Declaration in Support, Exhibits A, B, C, M, and N filed byDigital Envoy,Inc.,. (Related document(s)296) (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 9/1/2005)
August 31, 2005 290 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 289 Stipulation filed by Digital Envoy,Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/31/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2005)
August 30, 2005 289
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend the Time to File Opposition and Reply Papers for Google's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Burton, Kendall) (Filed on 8/30/2005)
August 23, 2005 276 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 269 Motion to Seal Document. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2005)
August 17, 2005 274
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digital Envoy,Inc., re [268] Received Document and Reply Brief i/s/o Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Contract Issues, Filed Under Seal on 8/17/05 (Burton, Kendall) (Filed on 8/17/2005)
August 10, 2005 260
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc.,, Google Inc., (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/10/2005)
July 28, 2005 254 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re 253: Discovery due by 12/21/2005. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/28/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2005)
July 22, 2005 252 Opinion or Order of the Court
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. A Settlement Conference has been set for 10/12/2005, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom A, 15th Floor. Settlement Conference Statements are to be lodged with Chambers (NOT electronically filed) no later than 9/28/2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/22/2005. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2005)
July 19, 2005 247
NOTICE by Digital Envoy,Inc., re 227 MOTION for Protective Order Digital Envoy's Motion for New Protective Order Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for New Protective Order (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 7/19/2005)
July 15, 2005 245 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/15/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2005)
July 14, 2005 240
NOTICE by Digital Envoy,Inc., re 227 MOTION for Protective Order Digital Envoy's Motion for New Protective Order, 218 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Contract Issues Notice of Continuance of Hearings on Digital Envoy's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Contract Issues and Motion for New Protective Order (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2005)
July 13, 2005 235
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: Amending Scheduling Order by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Cardon, P.) (Filed on 7/13/2005)
July 11, 2005 234 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 225 Motion to Seal Document. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2005)
July 8, 2005 230
Memorandum in Opposition re 223 MOTION for Leave to File Digital Envoy's Motion for Reconsideration filed byGoogle Inc.,. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 7/8/2005)
July 6, 2005 229
Declaration of Robert Friedman in Support of 227 MOTION for Protective Order Digital Envoy's Motion for New Protective Order filed byDigital Envoy,Inc.,. (Related document(s)227) (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 7/6/2005)
July 5, 2005 217
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc.,, Google Inc., (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/5/2005)
June 29, 2005 208 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 207 Stipulation filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/28/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2005)
June 28, 2005 207
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to File Supplemental Briefs by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/28/2005)
June 23, 2005 206 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 162 Motion to Compel. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2005)
June 22, 2005 205
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2005 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 6/22/2005). (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2005)
June 21, 2005 204
MEMORANDUM in Oppostion re 189 Reply to Opposition, 190 Declaration in Support,, 192 Declaration in Support,, 200 Objection Digital Envoy's Response Brief in Opposition to Goolge's Objections and Motion to Strike Parts of Digital Envoy's Reply Brief and Evidence filed byDigital Envoy,Inc.,. (Related document(s)189, 190, 192, 200) (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 6/21/2005)
June 16, 2005 203 Opinion or Order of the Court
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER DENYING GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TRADE SECRET CLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/16/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2005)
June 15, 2005 202
STIPULATION Of Authenticity As To Certain Documents by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 6/15/2005)
June 7, 2005 186 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 181 Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/7/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2005)
June 6, 2005 185
Brief Digital Envoy's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDigital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 3, 2005 184
Brief Google Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/3/2005)
June 1, 2005 183
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc.,, Google Inc., (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/1/2005)
May 23, 2005 167 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 166 GRANTING GOOGLE'S REQUEST TO RE-BRIEF ISSUE IN LIGHT OF COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/23/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2005)
May 20, 2005 165 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DENYING GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on May 20, 2005. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2005)
May 13, 2005 158
OBJECTIONS to Google Inc.'s Objection and Motion to Strike "Supplemental" Brief Submitted in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 5/13/2005)
May 5, 2005 154
OBJECTIONS to re 147 Declaration in Opposition,,,, 152 Declaration in Opposition,, Supplemental Evidence Submitted in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Google Inc.,. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 5/5/2005)
May 4, 2005 153
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2005 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 5/4/2005). (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2005)
May 2, 2005 150
Proposed Order re 146 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. CIv. P. 56(f) [Proposed] Order Granting Rule 56(f) Motion by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 5/2/2005)
April 29, 2005 145
Proposed Order re 143 MOTION for Sanctions by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 4/29/2005)
April 25, 2005 138
OBJECTIONS to re 108 Declaration in Support, 109 Declaration in Support, 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgement on Counts II, III, IV and V of the Amended Complaint by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 4/25/2005)
April 22, 2005 137
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digital Envoy,Inc.,, Digital Envoy,Inc., [Declaration of Andrew Lindner In Support of Digital Envoy's Opposition to Google's Second Motion for Summary Judgment] (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 12, 2005 135 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2005)
April 1, 2005 134
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Amending Scheduling Order by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 4/1/2005)
March 21, 2005 124 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 119 Request to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/21/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2005)
March 16, 2005 121
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc.,, Google Inc., (Kramer, David) (Filed on 3/16/2005)
March 9, 2005 114
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digital Envoy,Inc., re 107 Memorandum in Opposition,, 108 Declaration in Support (originals filed under seal) (Burton, Kendall) (Filed on 3/9/2005)
March 2, 2005 106
Reply Memorandum re 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgement on Counts II, III, IV and V of the Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 3/2/2005)
March 1, 2005 103 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 84 Request to File Documents under Seal filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/1/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2005)
February 23, 2005 99
Declaration of Susan Wojcicki in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/23/2005)
February 14, 2005 87
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 76 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, Answer to Amended Counterclaims byDigital Envoy,Inc.,, Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 2/14/2005)
February 7, 2005 86
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc.,, Google Inc., (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/7/2005)
January 28, 2005 79 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 70 Motion to Seal Documents. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005)
January 26, 2005 77
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/26/2005 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/26/2005). (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2005)
January 25, 2005 76
Answer to Amended Complaint of Digital Envoy and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM for Breach of Contract, Declaratory Judgment, and Trade Secret Misappropriation against Digital Envoy,Inc.,, Digital Envoy,Inc., byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/25/2005)
January 24, 2005 75
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digital Envoy,Inc.,, Digital Envoy,Inc., re 74 Declaration in Support,, 70 MOTION to Seal Document /File Document Under Seal, 71 Declaration in Support,, 72 Notice (Other), 73 Reply to Opposition, (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 1/24/2005)
January 21, 2005 69 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 50 Google's Motion to Amend its Counterclaims. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2005)
January 20, 2005 67
Statement of Non-Opposition re 50 MOTION to Amend/Correct Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend its Counterclaims and for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed byDigital Envoy,Inc.,, Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Related document(s)50) (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 1/20/2005)
January 19, 2005 62
Declaration of Stephen C. Holmes in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time on the Hearing of its Motion for a Protective Order filed byGoogle Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/19/2005)
January 11, 2005 57
Letter from David H. Kramer. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/11/2005)
January 10, 2005 56
Letter Brief re 55 Letter Brief of Google and Objections Thereto filed byDigital Envoy,Inc.,. (Related document(s)55) (Cardon, P.) (Filed on 1/10/2005)
January 5, 2005 53
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/5/2005 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/5/2005). (Court Reporter not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/5/2005)
December 29, 2004 52
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/29/2004)
December 15, 2004 49 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 48 Stipulation filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/15/04. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2004)
December 14, 2004 48
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Amending Scheduling Order Regarding the Mediation Date by Google Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Holmes, Stephen) (Filed on 12/14/2004)
November 3, 2004 47
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM S OF GOOGLE, INC., AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 11/3/2004)
September 23, 2004 45
AMENDED COMPLAINT of Digital Envoy, Inc. [Demand for Jury Trial] against all defendants. Filed by Digital Envoy,Inc.,, Google Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 9/23/2004)
September 20, 2004 44 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 40 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2004)
September 15, 2004 43
Statement of Non-Opposition re 40 Digital Envoy's Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint and Relief From Case Management Schedule filed by Google Inc.,. (Related document(s)40) (Holmes, Stephen) (Filed on 9/15/2004)
August 27, 2004 42
Proposed Order re 40, 41 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 8/27/2004)
August 19, 2004 31
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality by Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/19/2004)
August 18, 2004 30
Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/18/2004 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/18/2004). (Court Reporter not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2004)
August 12, 2004 24
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting ADR Process by Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/12/2004)
August 9, 2004 23
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/9/2004)
June 28, 2004 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER REALIGNING PARTIES AND WITHDRAWING MOTION TO TRANSFER AND/OR STAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on June 28, 2004. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2004)
June 24, 2004 21
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Realigning Parties and Withdrawing Motion to Transfer and/or Stay by Google Inc.,. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 6/24/2004)
June 21, 2004 20
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Digital Envoy's Counterclaim by Google Inc.,. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/21/2004)
May 28, 2004 12
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digital Envoy,Inc., Applications and [Proposed] Orders Granting Application for Admission of Attorneys Pro Hac Vice for (1) John A. Lockett, III, (2) Luke Anderson, and (3) Timothy H. Kratz (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 5/28/2004)
May 19, 2004 11
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Digital Envoy,Inc.,.. (Cardon, P.) (Filed on 5/19/2004)
May 18, 2004 10
NOTICE by Digital Envoy,Inc., re 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Stay Re Continuing Hearing Date to July 14, 2004 (Blackman, Brian) (Filed on 5/18/2004)
May 12, 2004 9
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.,.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 5/12/2004)
May 10, 2004 8
Proposed Order re 7 Motion to Dimiss For Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Stay by Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (Cardon, P.) (Filed on 5/10/2004)
April 22, 2004 4
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google Inc.,. Digital Envoy,Inc., served on 4/20/2004, answer due 5/10/2004. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 4/22/2004)
April 16, 2004 5
Summons Issued as to Digital Envoy,Inc.,. (lrd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2004 (lrd, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Envoy Inc., v. Google Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Digital Envoy,Inc.,
Represented By: Patrick J. Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Google Inc.,
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.,
Represented By: Colleen Bal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Envoy,Inc.,
Represented By: Robert J. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?